Kifer v. Wright - Gardner Insurance Inc. et al
Maryland District Court | |
Judge: | Stephanie A Gallagher |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01131 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:12101 The Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990 |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 5:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
Blakely Barker
5510 Porterstown Road
Keedeysville, MD 21746 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vanessa Routzhan
12748 Martin Road
Smithsburg, MD 21783 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christian Wright
1149 The Terrace
Hagerstown, MD 21742 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wright - Gardner Insurance Inc.
100 W. Antietam Street
Hagerstown, MD 21740 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrice S Kifer
1301 Carroll Heights Blvd.
Hagerstown, MD 21742 |
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 02 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/2/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
order
Settlement Order
Tue 11/14 4:10 PM
SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 11/14/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
minutes
Settlement Conference
Tue 11/14 4:08 PM
Settlement Conference held on 11/14/2017 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 11/14 4:08 PM
Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to case. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Tue 11/14 9:18 AM
Telephone Conference held on 11/13/2017 before Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order
Thu 09/28 12:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER APPROVING re33 Stipulation filed by Wright - Gardner Insurance Inc., Blakely Barker, Vanessa Routzhan, Christian Wright. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 9/28/2017. (vals, Chambers) |
|
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation
Thu 09/28 11:46 AM
STIPULATION Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Blakely Barker, Vanessa Routzhan, Christian Wright, Wright - Gardner Insurance Inc.(Hinkle, Michael) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/21 3:05 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Blakely Barker.(Hinkle, Michael) |
|
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/21 3:04 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Vanessa Routzhan.(Hinkle, Michael) |
|
30 | 30
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/21 3:03 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Christian Wright.(Hinkle, Michael) |
|
29 | 29
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/21 3:01 PM
AMENDED ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Wright - Gardner Insurance Inc.. (Hinkle, Michael) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Thu 08/03 10:09 AM
ORDER Rescheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 8/3/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Wed 08/02 12:56 PM
ORDER denying11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/2/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
26 | 26
6
pgs
order
Memorandum Opinion
Wed 08/02 12:55 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 8/2/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
corresp
Miscellaneous
Mon 07/31 3:42 PM
Correspondence re: Settlement Conference - New Date (McDermott, Edward) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
corresp
Magistrate Judge - consent to
Mon 07/17 3:01 PM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (Hinkle, Michael) |
|
Saturday, July 15, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
corresp
Magistrate Judge - consent to
Sat 07/15 9:42 AM
Consent to Magistrate Judge (McDermott, Edward) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order for Settlement Conference
Fri 07/14 1:10 PM
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 7/14/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
21 | 21
order
Order
Fri 07/14 1:09 PM
ORDER to Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 7/14/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
20 | 20
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/14 12:06 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 7/14/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order re: Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s)
Fri 07/07 9:01 AM
ORDER directing parties to submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re18 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/7/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 07/07 9:00 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/7/2017. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Thu 07/06 3:36 PM
ORDER transferring the case to a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/6/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
16 | 16
corresp
Status Report Submitted
Thu 07/06 3:10 PM
Status Report Submitted Scheduling Conference by Patrice S Kifer (McDermott, Edward) |
|
Sunday, June 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Sun 06/25 1:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Patrice S Kifer.(McDermott, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/21 2:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/3/2017. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 6/21/2017.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Att: 1 Scheduling Order, | ||
Att: 2 Standing Order on Discovery Procedures | ||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/12 5:09 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wright - Gardner Insurance Inc. (Hinkle, Michael) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/12 5:07 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Counts One Through Four and Six Through Eight by Wright - Gardner Insurance Inc..(Hinkle, Michael) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 06/12 5:04 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Blakely Barker, Vanessa Routzhan, Christian Wright, Wright - Gardner Insurance Inc.(Hinkle, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order
Wed 05/17 4:22 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving8 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond as to Defendants Christian Wright, Blakely Barker and Vanessa Routzhan. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/17/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order
Wed 05/17 4:20 PM
MARGINAL ORDER approving7 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond as to Defendant Wright-Gardner Inc. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/17/2017. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Wed 05/17 12:51 PM
STIPULATION re6 Summons Returned Executed,1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond by Blakely Barker, Vanessa Routzhan, Christian Wright (Hinkle, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Wed 05/17 10:28 AM
STIPULATION re5 Summons Returned Executed,1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond by Wright - Gardner Insurance Inc.(Hinkle, Michael) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 05/15 8:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrice S Kifer. Blakely Barker served on 5/15/2017, answer due 6/5/2017; Vanessa Routzhan served on 5/15/2017, answer due 6/5/2017; Christian Wright served on 5/15/2017, answer due 6/5/2017.(McDermott, Edward) |
|
Saturday, May 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Sat 05/06 10:27 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Patrice S Kifer. Wright - Gardner Insurance Inc. served on 5/1/2017, answer due 5/22/2017.(McDermott, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement
Wed 04/26 8:22 AM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Patrice S Kifer (McDermott, Edward) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 9:33 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Blakely Barker, Vanessa Routzhan, Christian Wright, Wright - Gardner Insurance Inc..(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
2 | 2
notice
QC Notice - Miscellaneous
Tue 04/25 9:33 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Patrice S Kifer was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event selected. Please refile the Corporate Disclosure Statement only using the event under Other Documents -> Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 6:17 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-6623684.), filed by Patrice S Kifer.(McDermott, Edward) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Notice of Right to Sue, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons to Wright-Gardner Insurance Inc., | ||
Att: 4 Summons to Christian Wright, | ||
Att: 5 Summons to Blakely Barker, | ||
Att: 6 Summons to Vanessa Routzhan, | ||
Att: 7 Disclosure of Corporate Interest |