Seepersaud v. Kelly et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02428 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 01, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 6:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
James B Comey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John F Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lori Scialabba
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff Sessions
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dilmattie Seepersaud
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment - Clerk
Tue 08/01 12:50 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: An Order of Honorable Frederic Block, United States District Judge, having been filed on July 31, 2017, dismissing the action with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and ordering that each party to bear its own costs, fees, including attorneys fees, and disbursements; it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that the action is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; and that each party is to bear its own costs, fees, including attorneys fees, and disbursements. Ordered by J. Hamilton Deputy Clerk of Court on 8/1/2017. (Basnight, Jasmine) |
|
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 08/01 10:10 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry6 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 8/1/2017. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/31 10:23 AM
STIPULATION and Order of Dismissal for the Court's review and signature by John F Kelly (Kish, Ronald) |
|
Att: 1 over Letter | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/27 4:54 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's complaint from July 31, 2017, to August 18, 2017 by John F Kelly. (Kish, Ronald) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/27 5:03 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant's letter application5 dated 7/27/17 is GRANTED. By August 18, 2017 the defendant will serve and file their answer to the complaint. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 7/27/2017. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 05/18 2:53 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's complaint from June 23, 2017, to July 31, 2017 by John F Kelly. (Kish, Ronald) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 05/18 3:53 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The defendant's letter application4 dated 5/18/17 with the consent of the plaintiff is GRANTED. By July 31, 2017 the defendant will serve and file their answer to the complaint. Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 5/18/2017. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/25 12:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald W. Kish on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Kish, Ronald) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 2:31 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 2:29 PM
COMPLAINT against James B Comey, John F Kelly, Lori Scialabba, Jeff Sessions, filed by Dilmattie Seepersaud. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 04/24 2:30 PM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653114045 (Davis, Kimberly) |