Mehra v. HSBC Bank USA, NA et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | I Leo Glasser |
Referred: | Robert M Levy |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02436 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 03, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Equifax Information Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HSBC Bank USA, NA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trans Union LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Satish Mehra
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Thu 04/05 12:06 PM
Order: Party Equifax Information Services, LLC is terminated. Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), Plaintiff and Defendant EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC hereby agree and stipulate that the within action may be dismissed in its entiretywith prejudice as against Equifax, without costs or fees to any party. So Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 4/3/2018. (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
39 | 39
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 04/03 8:47 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal against Equifax Information Services, LLC by Satish Mehra (Mallon, Kevin) |
|
order
~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 04/05 12:08 PM
Civil Case Terminated. All Defendants have been terminated. (Almonte, Giselle) |
||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Thu 03/22 5:17 PM
Order: Party HSBC Bank USA, NA is terminated. So Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 3/20/2018. (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 03/20 2:17 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by HSBC Bank USA, NA (Carrera, Dana) |
|
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 02/01 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Daniel Klein on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Klein, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 01/29 1:02 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Telephone Conference set for 02/08/18 is adjourned to 04/06/2018 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy at (718) 613-2340. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/29/2018. (Marino, Janine) |
||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
order
Order(Other)
Mon 01/22 12:50 PM
ORDER granting the request34 for 30 days to finalize the settlement agreement before filing a stipulation of dismissal. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 1/22/2018. (Kessler, Stanley) |
|
Saturday, January 20, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Settlement
Sat 01/20 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Settlement with HSBC Bank USA, NA by Satish Mehra (Mallon, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/17 7:43 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. only by Satish Mehra (Mallon, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 01/03 3:23 PM
ORDER granting32 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Proposed Revised Discovery Schedule by Satish Mehra. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/3/2018. (Marino, Janine) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 01/03 3:24 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 1/3/2018. (Marino, Janine) |
||
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 01/02 2:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and Proposed Revised Discovery Schedule by Satish Mehra. (Mallon, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, December 23, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Sat 12/23 6:22 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Satish Mehra. (Mallon, Kevin) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Mon 12/18 6:24 PM
Order Dismissing Parties, ORDERED that all claims of Plaintiff Satish Mehra against Defendant Trans Union, LLC are dismissed, with prejudice. Plaintiff Satish Mehra and Defendant Trans Union, LLC shall each bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Party Trans Union LLC terminated. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 12/13/2017. (Layne, Monique) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 12/12 3:14 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal against Trans Union, LLC only by Satish Mehra (Mallon, Kevin) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Parties
Mon 12/11 12:39 PM
Order Dismissing Parties, Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), Plaintiff and Defendant EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC agree and stipulate that the within action may be dismissed in its entirety with prejudice as against Experian only. Party Experian Information Solutions, Inc. terminated. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 12/11/2017. (Layne, Monique) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 12/08 5:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. only by Satish Mehra (Mallon, Kevin) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 11/13 12:39 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiff's application is GRANTED. The deadline for plaintiff to file a stipulation of dismissal as to Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is extended to 12/11/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/13/2017. (Baran, Hugh) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
Mon 11/13 12:41 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal. Plaintiff's application is GRANTED. The deadline for plaintiff to file a stipulation of dismissal as to Defendant Trans Union LLC is extended to 12/11/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/13/2017. (Baran, Hugh) |
||
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Fri 11/10 1:28 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal against Trans Union, LLC by Satish Mehra. (Mallon, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 11/09 3:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal against Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by Satish Mehra. (Mallon, Kevin) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 10/05 12:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER, endorsed on Initial Conf. Questionnnaire. Approved. Date for completion of automatic disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) due by 10/10/2017. (See attached for details). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/3/2017. (Layne, Monique) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Tue 10/03 4:14 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Kevin Mallon, plaintiff; Nola Bencze, Equifax; Dana M. Carrera, HSBC. Scheduling order approved. Discovery deadline 2/2/18. Next conference 2/8/18 at 2:00 (tel)(close of discovery).Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/3/2017 (Levy, Robert) |
||
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter
Mon 10/02 3:53 PM
Letter Regarding Notice Of Settlement by Trans Union LLC (Nicodemus, Camille) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 10/02 5:48 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Adjourn 10/3/17 Conference, as counsel report this case has settled. A Stipulation of Dismissal shall be filed by 11/10/17. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/2/2017. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/27 12:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nola R. Bencze on behalf of Equifax Information Services, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Bencze, Nola) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 09/27 10:02 AM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference /to excuse counsel from attending the initial conference by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Dollinger, Amanda) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/08 4:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by HSBC Bank USA, NA. (Carrera, Dana) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/11 2:56 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Dollinger, Amanda) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/11 2:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda L. Dollinger on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Dollinger, Amanda) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/08 3:31 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer HSBC Bank USA, NA answer due 9/11/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/8/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 08/04 11:02 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HSBC Bank USA, NA identifying Corporate Parent HSBC USA, INC., Corporate Parent HSBC Bank USA, NA, Corporate Parent HSBC North American Holdings, Inc. for HSBC Bank USA, NA. (Carrera, Dana) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/01 10:49 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by HSBC Bank USA, NA. (Carrera, Dana) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/25 12:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/3/2017 at 4:00 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/25/2017. (Marino, Janine) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 07/14 7:05 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer HSBC Bank USA, NA answer due 8/11/2017.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 7/14/2017. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/12 4:18 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, And Affirmative Defenses by Trans Union LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/12 1:25 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by HSBC Bank USA, NA. (Carrera, Dana) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/12 9:33 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Richman, Steven) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/12 9:32 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Richman, Steven) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 07/07 2:33 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion of defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. for Extension of Time to Answer to 8/11/2017. Ordered by Judge I. Leo Glasser on 7/7/2017. (Kessler, Stanley) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/07 9:53 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Lopata, Chris) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 07/07 9:51 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Lopata, Chris) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/07 9:48 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chris J. Lopata on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Lopata, Chris) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/26 1:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion, Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Advent International Corp., Other Affiliate GS Capital Partners for Trans Union LLC. (Nicodemus, Camille) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/26 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Renee Nicodemus on behalf of Trans Union LLC (aty to be noticed) (Nicodemus, Camille) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 4:37 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 4:34 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 4:33 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 1:44 PM
COMPLAINT against Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., HSBC Bank USA, NA, Trans Union LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9471978 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Satish Mehra. (Mallon, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 4:33 PM
Case Assigned to Judge I. Leo Glasser and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |