Samrat v. United Collection Bureau, Inc.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Frederic Block |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02441 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 5:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
United Collection Bureau, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Mohammad Samrat
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 04/27 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mohammad Samrat (Cohen, Daniel) |
|
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 04/27 12:29 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER DISMISSING CASE: See entry5 . Ordered by Judge Frederic Block on 4/27/2017. (Innelli, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 11:42 AM
Summons Issued as to United Collection Bureau, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/25 11:40 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/25 11:34 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/25 11:34 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Frederic Block and Magistrate Judge James Orenstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 3:57 PM
COMPLAINT against United Collection Bureau, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9472859 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Mohammad Samrat. (Cohen, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |