Wisdom v. The City of New York et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02443 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 6:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Paul Dawkins
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teddy Duroc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Police Officer Brian Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Khalid Wisdom
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago |
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 02/26 1:32 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Proposed Stipulation and Order of Dismissal by Paul Dawkins, Teddy Duroc, Brian Ramirez, The City of New York (McKinney, Morgan) |
|
26 | 26
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 02/26 1:30 PM
NOTICE by Paul Dawkins, Teddy Duroc, Brian Ramirez, The City of New York Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (McKinney, Morgan) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Mon 02/26 11:10 AM
ORDER: Parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal or a status report on settlement by 3/2/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 2/26/2018. (Strong, Ardis) |
||
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 02/26 1:39 PM
Terminated Scheduling Order: The 4/18/2018 Final Pre-trial Conference previously scheduled before Magistrate Judge Reyes is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/26/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 02/26 1:57 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The27 Stipulation of Dismissal is So Ordered. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 2/26/2018. (Hess, Alexandra) |
||
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 01/31 5:36 PM
ORDER: In light of the parties' settlement of this matter, the parties are encouraged to consent to having the Honorable Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. conduct all future proceedings in this matter, including entering the order of final judgment. Should the parties agree, attached herein is the consent form that should be filled out, signed, and electronically filed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 1/31/2018. (Hess, Alexandra) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 01/19 5:27 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Telephone Settlement Conference held on 1/19/2018. Appearances by Amy Robinson, Esq. for the Plaintiff and Morgan McKinney, Esq. for the Defendants. Discussions held off the record. Case settled. Stipulation of Dismissal due in 30 days. (Strong, Ardis) |
||
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 01/17 3:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Status Conference held on 1/17/2018. Case called. Appearances and discussions held on the record. The parties' oral request to extend discovery is GRANTED. Discovery is extended until 4/18/2018. Experts Reports are due 3/2/2018; Rebuttal Reports are due 4/6/2018. The 3/6/2018 Final Pretrial Conference is adjourned to 4/18/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. (FTR Log #3:13:05-3:30:33.) (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 01/17 3:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Settlement Conference set for 1/19/2018 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call then dial in chambers (718)613-2120 once all parties are on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/17/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 01/03 8:26 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion to Adjourn 1/9/2018 Conference. Status Conference rescheduled for 1/17/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/3/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 01/02 7:14 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Paul Dawkins, Teddy Duroc, Brian Ramirez, The City of New York. (McKinney, Morgan) |
|
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Protective Order
Tue 11/28 11:22 AM
MOTION for Protective Order Upon Stipulation of the Parties by Paul Dawkins, Teddy Duroc, Brian Ramirez, The City of New York. (McKinney, Morgan) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference Order on Motion for Protective Order
Tue 11/28 4:03 PM
Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Order granting23 Motion for Protective Order. Telephone Conference held on 11/28/2017. Appearances by Amy Robinson, Esq. for the Plaintiff and Morgan McKinney, Esq. for the Defendants. Discussions held. Case management plan to proceed as scheduled. Parties should contact chambers promptly if a settlement conference is needed. (FTR Log #3:31:24-3:41:15 (208N)) (Strong, Ardis) |
||
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 11/13 12:41 PM
Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference due to scheduling conflict by Khalid Wisdom. (Robinson, Amy) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Mon 11/13 12:51 PM
ORDER granting22 Motion to Adjourn 11/17/2017 Conference. Telephone Conference is adjourned to 11/28/2017 at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/13/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
order
~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 11/09 2:12 PM
Set/Reset Hearing Time: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar the 11/17/2017 Telephone Conference will commence at 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/9/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 10/24 12:55 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint, by Paul Dawkins, Teddy Duroc, Brian Ramirez, The City of New York. (McKinney, Morgan) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/11 3:57 PM
Summons Issued as to Brian Ramirez. (Basnight, Jasmine) |
|
19 | 19
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/11 3:50 PM
Summons Issued as to Teddy Duroc. (Basnight, Jasmine) |
|
18 | 18
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/11 3:29 PM
Summons Issued as to Paul Dawkins. (Basnight, Jasmine) |
|
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Wed 10/11 12:12 PM
Summons Issued as to The City of New York. (Basnight, Jasmine) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 10/10 3:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Khalid Wisdom against Paul Dawkins, Teddy Duroc, Brian Ramirez, The City of New York, filed by Khalid Wisdom. (Robinson, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons | ||
order
Order(Other)
Tue 10/10 8:59 AM
ORDER: The parties' Case Management Statement13 was approved by Court on 09/12/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 09/12/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Wed 09/13 1:05 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Discovery. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 9/13/2017. (Naidich, Zachary) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Discovery
Tue 09/12 5:54 PM
MOTION for Discovery Proposed Order, Unsealing of Grand Jury Minutes by Paul Dawkins, Teddy Duroc, Brian Ramirez, The City of New York. (McKinney, Morgan) |
|
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 09/12 10:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr.: Telephone Conference held on 9/12/2017. Appearances: Amy Robinson, Esq., for Plaintiff; Morgan Chmiel McKinney, Esq., for Defendants. Discussions held. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/6/2018 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Status Conference set for 1/9/2018 at 12:00 PM. Telephone Conference set for 11/17/2017 at 10:30 AM, plaintiff to initiate the call and contact chambers once all parties are on the line. Discovery set to close on 3/2/2018. (FTR Log #10:07:02-10:28:20 (208N)) (Naidich, Zachary) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
order
~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings
Mon 09/11 12:28 PM
ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar the 9/12/17 conference is converted to a Telephone Initial Conference set for 9/12/2017 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call and dial in chambers at (718) 613-2120 once all parties are on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/11/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 09/06 3:48 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Robinson, Amy) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/06 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Robinson on behalf of Khalid Wisdom (aty to be noticed) (Robinson, Amy) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/01 2:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Paul Dawkins, Teddy Duroc, Brian Ramirez, The City of New York. (McKinney, Morgan) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/24 11:04 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See attach blank document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 9/7/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/24/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
Sunday, July 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Sun 07/16 11:06 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Khalid Wisdom. Teddy Duroc waiver sent on 7/5/2017, answer due 9/4/2017. (Stoll, Andrew) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 07/05 2:14 PM
ORDER8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The application is granted as to the City of New York only. The City of New York and Defendants Officers Teddy Duroc, Paul Dawkins, and Brian Ramirez must answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by August 29, 2017. In light of the extensive delay occasioned by the latter ruling, I impose certain additional obligations on both parties that will avoid needlessly delaying the proceedings even further: (a) no later than July 12, 2017, the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff for execution a release pursuant to N.Y.C.P.L. Sec. 160.50 with respect to the arrest at issue in the litigation, as well as a release authorizing the disclosure of relevant medical records if the plaintiff is seeking damages for any physical or mental injury; (b) no later than July 19, 2017, the plaintiff must execute any such release and (c) no later than August 31, 2017 the City's counsel must provide to the plaintiff the names, shield numbers, and proper service addresses of all individual officers involved in the arrest at issue in this litigation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/5/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 06/29 5:18 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on behalf of defendant City by The City of New York. (McKinney, Morgan) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 06/01 2:38 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The City of New York. The City of New York waiver sent on 5/1/2017, answer due 6/30/2017. (McKinney, Morgan) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/01 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan Chmiel McKinney on behalf of The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (McKinney, Morgan) |
|
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 05/01 2:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Brian Ramirez. (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 11:57 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/25 11:54 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/25 11:53 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/25 11:52 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 4:05 PM
COMPLAINT Khalid Wisdom against Paul Dawkins, Teddy Duroc, Brian Ramirez, The City of New York filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9472975 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Khalid Wisdom. (Stoll, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons |