Hartman v. MRS BPO LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond J Dearie |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02445 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 5:53 AM EDT |
Defendant
MRS BPO LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tova Hartman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/03 4:03 PM
JOINT STIPULATION for Voluntary Dismissal: Final Order of Dismissal with Prejudice in this matter, each party to bear its own costs and fees, and without prejudice as to the rights of any putative class members other than Plaintiff, if any. SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 8/3/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/02 4:12 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Tova Hartman (Palace, David) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order(Other)
Fri 07/07 1:38 PM
ORDER: As discussed during the 7/7/2017 conference (see attached order for additional detail and deadlines), class action discovery bifurcated. counsel agree no discovery is needed for the dispositive motion. Defendant to file PMC for summary judgment motion by 8/4/2017; Plaintiff to reply by 8/11/2017. Counsel are referred to Sarder v. Academy Collection Service, Inc. 2005 WL 615831 (EDNY 3/3/2005), adopted on docket 02CV2486 (EDNY 5/24/2005) and cases citing. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/7/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Fri 07/07 1:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon:Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/7/2017 in Room 504 North. David Palace appearing for Plaintiff. Aleksander Powietrzynski appearing for Defendant. See separate docket entry for Order issuing from this proceeding. (Tape #12:33-12:49.) (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Wed 07/05 2:12 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order Joint by MRS BPO LLC (Etmund, Michael) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Wed 07/05 11:38 AM
ORDER: The Parties failed to file the joint proposed scheduling order per this Court's8 Order. The Parties are to file the proposed order by 7/6/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/5/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 06/19 2:35 PM
RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Initial Conference originally scheduled for 6/29/2017 will be held on 7/7/2017 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 504 North before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. The Parties are to refer to8 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 6/30/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/19/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Tue 06/06 12:09 PM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Adjourn Conference; RE-SCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel are advised that the Initial Conference currently scheduled for 6/14/2017 has been rescheduled to 6/29/2017 at 3:45 PM in Courtroom 13A South before before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Counsel are to confirm amongst themselves that all are aware of this change. The Parties are to refer to8 and must file the joint proposed scheduling order by 6/22/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 6/6/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 06/05 4:05 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Tova Hartman. (Palace, David) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Change of Address/Firm/Email
Fri 06/02 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Change of Firm Address by Aleksander Piotr Powietrzynski New Address is 750 Third Avenue, New York, NY 10017 (Powietrzynski, Aleksander) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/31 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksander Piotr Powietrzynski on behalf of MRS BPO LLC (aty to be noticed) (Powietrzynski, Aleksander) |
|
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/31 9:45 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: As set forth in the attached Order, an Initial Conference is scheduled for 6/14/2017 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Scanlon in Courtroom 504 North. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to confirm with Defendant's counsel that all necessary participants are aware of this conference. Plaintiff must appear in person for the conference. Counsel must complete the attached joint proposed scheduling order and file on ECF no later than 6/8/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 5/31/2017. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/30 10:59 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MRS BPO LLC identifying Corporate Parent MRS Associates, Inc. for MRS BPO LLC. (Etmund, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/30 10:58 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by MRS BPO LLC. (Etmund, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/30 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Etmund on behalf of MRS BPO LLC (aty to be noticed) (Etmund, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 12:44 PM
Summons Issued as to MRS BPO LLC. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/25 12:42 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/25 12:42 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/25 12:40 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT tova Hartman against MRS BPO LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9473434 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by tova Hartman. (Palace, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |