Reyes v. Natale Bakery Corp. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02448 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 04, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 6:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
Giusepp Natale
|
|
Defendant
Natale Bakery Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Vincenzo Vaccaro
|
|
Plaintiff
Eduardo Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 06/04 11:19 AM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the terms of settlement agreement are fair and reasonable; and that this case is closed. Ordered by Clerk of Court, by Deputy Clerk Jalitza Poveda, on 6/4/2018. (Barrett, C) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Settlement Order on Sua Sponte - Report and Recommendations
Fri 06/01 11:03 AM
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Court adopts, in its entirety, the Honorable Ramon Reyes's 5/15/18 Report and Recommendation, which reviewed the settlement agreement in accordance with Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc. , 796 F.3d 199, 206 (2d Cir. 2015) and found the terms to be fair and reasonable. No objections have been filed, and the Court finds that the Report and Recommendation is neither "clearly erroneous" nor "contrary to law." See 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1); Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a). Accordingly, the Court adopts the Report and Recommendation. The Court respectfully directs the Clerk to terminate this matter. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 6/1/2018. |
||
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
motion
Sua Sponte - Report and Recommendations
Tue 05/15 3:48 PM
ORDER SUA SPONTE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re25 MOTION for Settlement filed by Eduardo Reyes. The Court has reviewed the settlement agreement in accordance with Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199, 206 (2d Cir. 2015) and finds its terms to be fair and reasonable. Accordingly, Magistrate Judge Reyes recommends approval of settlement. Objections to R&R due by 5/29/2018.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 5/15/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Monday, May 14, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Letter
Mon 05/14 3:01 PM
Letter requesting settlement approval by Eduardo Reyes (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines
Mon 04/16 10:21 AM
ORDER granting re24 Letter filed by Eduardo Reyes. The parties request thirty (30) days (until May 14, 2018) to file the motion for settlement approval. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 4/15/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Friday, April 13, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter
Fri 04/13 3:57 PM
Letter re: mediation status report by Eduardo Reyes (Seelig, Anne) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
adr
Report of Mediation(Settled/Unsettled)
Thu 03/29 2:57 PM
REPORT of Mediation settled. Both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Mediation Report Questionnaires due by 4/12/2018. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Wed 03/28 10:30 AM
STATUS REPORT Re: Mediation by Eduardo Reyes (Lee, C.K.) |
|
order
Status Report Order
Wed 03/28 5:31 PM
ORDER re23 Status Report filed by Eduardo Reyes. Further status report on mediation is due by 4/13/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/28/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Tue 03/27 4:33 PM
ORDER: The parties are directed to file the over due 3/21/2018 Mediation Status Report on or before 3/30/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/27/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Thursday, February 22, 2018 | ||
adr
Selection of Mediator
Thu 02/22 12:30 PM
SELECTION OF MEDIATOR Raymond Nardo selected as Mediator. The first mediation session will take place on March 7, 2018. Fourteen days on or before the session date, counsel shall file with the Mediator their client's mediation statement summarizing the facts, legal issues, particulars of any prior settlement discussions, and the name and title of the client or client representative with full settlement authority who will attend the mediation in person. Attendance in person is required of the trial attorney, insurance adjuster, and client or client representative with full settlement authority. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants and the Mediator and returned to Robyn Weinstein, ADR Administrator, Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov or fax (718) 613-2333. Contact information for the Mediator is on the docket sheet. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session.Report of Mediation due by 3/21/2018. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 02/16 4:13 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Telephone Conference held on 2/16/2018. Appearances: Anne Seelig, Esq. for Plaintiff and Sean T. Wright, Esq. for Defendants. Discussions held. Defendants to provide Plaintiff with requested discovery no later than 2/23/2018. (FTR Log #11:00:36 - 11:04:22 (208N).) (Genovese, Jacqueline) |
||
Thursday, February 15, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 02/15 9:38 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re22 Letter filed by Eduardo Reyes. Telephone Conference set for 2/16/2018 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the call then dial in chambers once all parties are on the line. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/14/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Letter
Wed 02/14 4:32 PM
Letter re: Discovery Dispute by Eduardo Reyes (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Discovery
Tue 01/23 5:14 PM
ORDER granting21 Motion for Discovery as unopposed Discovery and selection of mediation due by 1/30/2018. All non-privilege based objections to discovery are waived due to untimely production. Failure to adhere to this Order may result in a report to the assigned district judge recommending that default be entered for failure to follow a court order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/23/2018. |
||
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Discovery
Tue 01/16 4:51 PM
Letter MOTION for Discovery Dispute by Eduardo Reyes. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Case Referred to Mediation
Mon 12/18 12:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Initial Conference Hearing held on 12/18/2017. Case called. Appearances and discussions held on the record. The parties are directed to exchange the discovery documents by 1/26/2018. Case referred to mediation. Mediation shall be completed by 3/23/2018. (Selection of Mediator due by 1/1/2018.) (FTR Log #11:56:16-12:05:45.) (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
adr
Mediation Instructions
Mon 12/18 12:16 PM
MEDIATION INSTRUCTIONS for Counsel are available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Counsel are to select a mediator, schedule the first mediation session, and file the name of the mediator, date, time and place of the first mediation session via CM/ECF using the event Selection of Mediator. For a list of the EDNY Mediators and their qualifications, see the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr/Mediation/displayAll.cfm. EDNY Mediators are compensated in accordance with EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.8(f)(1)[formerly EDNY Local Civil Rule 83.11(f)(1)]. The Confidentiality Stipulation must be signed at the mediation session by all participants, including the mediator, and sent via email to Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov. The Confidentiality Stipulation is available at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. Upon completion of the mediation, both parties must submit a Mediation Report which can be found at: https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/adr-forms. The Mediation Report must be e-mailed to Robyn Weinstein at Robyn_Weinstein@nyed.uscourts.gov within two weeks following mediation session. (Weinstein, Robyn) |
||
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Case Management Statement Proposed Scheduling Order
Mon 12/11 1:35 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Eduardo Reyes, Proposed Scheduling Order by Eduardo Reyes (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order | ||
Saturday, December 02, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Sat 12/02 12:42 AM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Wright, Sean) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
order
~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 11/20 12:48 PM
Set/Reset Hearing: The 11/20/2017 Initial Conference is rescheduled for 12/18/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/20/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 11/20 12:51 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Sean T, Wright is directed to file a Notice of Appearances on CM/ECF immediately. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Case Management Statement
Wed 11/15 4:22 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Att: 1 The Parties' Proposed Case Management Plan | ||
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 10/27 3:20 PM
ORDER re17 Stipulation of Extending Defendants' Time to Answer by 11/18/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/27/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation
Fri 10/20 5:28 PM
STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to Answer by Eduardo Reyes (Lee, C.K.) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 10/20 9:08 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Initial Conference is adjourned to 11/20/2017 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Case Management Statement11 is due by 11/15/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/20/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 10/19 3:57 PM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for October 24, 2017 by Eduardo Reyes. (Seelig, Anne) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 10/13 4:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eduardo Reyes Letter Regarding Adjournment of an Initial Conference (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 10/06 3:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eduardo Reyes. Vincenzo Vaccaro served on 8/9/2017, answer due 8/30/2017. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 09/18 2:42 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Eduardo Reyes. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 09/18 3:04 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Adjourn 9/21/2017 Initial Conference. Initial Conference is rescheduled for 10/24/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Case Management Statement11 is due by 10/19/2017. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel and pro se parties are aware of the adjournment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/18/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 07/28 4:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eduardo Reyes Court's Order of an Initial Conference (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 07/24 11:10 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Conference set for 9/21/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See main document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 9/18/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/24/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/11 4:39 PM
Summons Issued as to Vincenzo Vaccaro. (Basnight, Jasmine) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 07/10 5:25 PM
Proposed Summons. by Eduardo Reyes (Lee, C.K.) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/10 5:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Natale Bakery Corp., Vincenzo Vaccaro, filed by Eduardo Reyes. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 06/20 5:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eduardo Reyes. Natale Bakery Corp. served on 6/13/2017, answer due 7/4/2017. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 06/19 12:40 PM
NOTICE by Eduardo Reyes Consent to Sue (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/23 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne Seelig on behalf of Eduardo Reyes (aty to be noticed) (Seelig, Anne) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 12:53 PM
Summons Issued as to Giusepp Natale, Natale Bakery Corp.. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/25 12:49 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/25 12:48 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/25 12:48 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 5:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Giusepp Natale, Natale Bakery Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9473742 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Eduardo Reyes. (Lee, C.K.) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |