Greer et al v. Greer
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joan M Azrack |
Referred: | Anne Y Shields |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02398 |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 05, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:42 AM EDT |
Defendant
Steven Greer
|
|
Plaintiff
Charles Greer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miles Greer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 07/06 10:58 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re:8 STIPULATION of Discontinuance with prejudice. Case Closed. So Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/5/2017. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Stipulation
Mon 07/03 9:38 AM
STIPULATION of Discontinuance by Charles Greer (Weinberger, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/11 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Cohn on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Cohn, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Reissued
Tue 04/25 12:42 PM
Summons Reissued as to Steven Greer. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 04/25 12:40 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Charles Greer, Miles Greer (Weinberger, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 4:49 PM
Summons Issued as to Steven Greer. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 04/24 4:47 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 04/24 11:54 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Rodin, Deanna). |
|
Att: 1 (4/24/2017) Additional Corrections | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 04/24 4:47 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Steven Greer filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9468193 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No, filed by Charles Greer, Miles Greer. (Weinberger, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/24/2017 (Rodin, Deanna). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |