Witt v. Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur D Spatt |
Referred: | Gary R Brown |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02429 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 6:09 AM EDT |
Defendant
Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Witt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Saturday, December 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 12/18 11:47 AM
ORDER re15 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with each party to bear its respective attorney's fees and costs. Case will remain closed. SO ORDERED by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 12/16/2017. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
Thursday, December 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 12/14 10:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Christopher Witt (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 09/14 2:07 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE Re:13 NOTICE of Settlement. The Court is closing this case for administrative purposes, subject to the terms of the settlement agreement. The parties are granted leave to move to reopen this matter in theevent the settlement is not consummated. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 9/14/2017. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 09/13 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Christopher Witt (Barshay, David) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Settlement
Wed 09/13 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA (Fjermedal, Glenn) |
|
order
1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 09/13 4:54 PM
ORDER: In light of the notice of settlement tomorrow's initial conference is adjourned without date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 9/13/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/17 11:18 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re11 Status Report filed by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA Initial Conference set for 9/14/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 8/17/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/16 12:59 PM
STATUS REPORT by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA (Fjermedal, Glenn) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Status Report Order
Mon 07/31 8:19 AM
ORDER granting10 Motion to Adjourn the 8/11/2017 Conference. STATUS REPORT ORDER: (A Status Report is due by 8/14/2017.). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/31/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 07/28 3:40 PM
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA. (Fjermedal, Glenn) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 07/07 10:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 8/11/2017 10:45 AM in Courtroom 840 before Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. In addition, each individual client and/or a principal with full settlement authority for a corporation or other business entity must personally appear with counsel at the conference. Upon failure to appear at the conference with authorized clients, the Court will entertain an application for fees and costs by the opposing side. See order and attachment for instructions. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 7/7/2017. (McMorrow, Karen) Modified on 7/7/2017 (McMorrow, Karen) |
|
Att: 1 GRB Individual Rules | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/28 2:03 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA (Fjermedal, Glenn) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 06/28 2:02 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA. (Fjermedal, Glenn) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/24 2:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Witt. Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA served on 5/8/2017, answer due 6/30/2017. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Saturday, May 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Sat 05/20 10:24 AM
Electronic ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading on or before 6/30/2017. So Ordered by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 5/20/2017. (Fell, Christopher) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 05/19 11:28 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA. (Fjermedal, Glenn) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/10 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Christopher Witt (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 9:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/25 9:30 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) |
|
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/25 9:29 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/25 9:30 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 10:29 AM
COMPLAINT against Weltman, Weinberg & Reis Co., LPA filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9470589 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Christopher Witt. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |