Gesualdi et al v. Flavio Aguirre Corp.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joan M Azrack |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02446 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 16, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 5:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
Flavio Aguirre Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
Louis Bisignano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Bourgal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Corbett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank H. Finkel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Gesualdi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marc Herbst
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darin Jeffers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael O'Toole
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Wednesday, November 06, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Wed 11/06 5:13 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Louis Bisignano Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Darin Jeffers Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Thomas Gesualdi Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Michael Bourgal Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Thomas Corbett Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Frank H. Finkel Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Marc Herbst Against Flavio Aguirre Corp. by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson (Muller, Arthur) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 06/07 2:00 PM
PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson RE: Bank Account Levy; Served at CitiBank, N.A.; Served on 5/7/2019; Remarks: Per CitiBank instructions all legal services must be faxed or mailed to the legal services Intake Unit. The Writ of Execution was faxed. Attached is confirmation of facsimile service. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Satisfaction of Judgment
Mon 04/29 2:57 PM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT entered In favor of Michael Bourgal Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Thomas Corbett Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Louis Bisignano Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Darin Jeffers Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Frank H. Finkel Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Thomas Gesualdi Against Flavio Aguirre Corp., In favor of Marc Herbst Against Flavio Aguirre Corp. Partial Satisfaction of Judgment by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson (Muller, Arthur) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
order
Judgment - Default
Mon 07/16 4:16 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT: ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment is granted; that Plaintiffs are awarded $49,327.81 as against the defendant Flavio Aguirre Corp; and that this case is hereby closed. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 7/16/2018. (Toritto, Jim) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Mon 07/09 8:57 AM
ORDER: For the reasons stated herein (PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS), plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED; The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiffs against defendant as follows: PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. SO Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/6/2018. (Ortiz, Grisel) |
|
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 05/02 3:15 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Motion, Declaration of Arthur J. Muller III Esq. in Support of Default Judgement with Exhibits, Declaration of Theresa Cody in Support of Default Judgment with Exhibits, Declaration of Angelos Poulos in Support of Motion for Default Judgment with Exhibit, Declaration of Diego Remache with Exhibits and Plaintiffs Memorandum of law in Support of Motion for Default Judgment served on Flavio Aguirre Corp. on October 18, 2017, filed by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson. (Muller, Arthur) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 05/02 1:43 PM
ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 55.2(c), plaintiffs are directed to serve their motion for default judgment as well as the accompanying memorandum of law, declarations and exhibits upon defendant. Plaintiffs must file proof of service with the Court by May 16, 2018. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/2/2018. (Schnier, Samantha) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
21
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Tue 10/17 4:24 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re10 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson. (Muller, Arthur) |
|
14 | 14
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 10/17 4:24 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re10 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment of Diego Remache filed by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson. (Muller, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Audit 13-0327 | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B- Audit 13-0327 R2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Audit 15-0547 | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Audit 15-0547 R2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E -Audit 16-0607 | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Audit 16-0907 A1 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 10/17 4:20 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re10 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment of Angelos Poulos filed by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson. (Muller, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Audit 13-0327 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 10/17 4:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re10 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment of Theresa Cody filed by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson. (Muller, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Agreement and Declaration of Trust, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - CBA, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - MOA, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Remittance Reports, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - T&F Demand Letter, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Oct 2017 UO NEW, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - UO LTR Nov 2016, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Series 13 Demand, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Audit 13A1, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10- 13A1 Demand, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 11- 13 APR, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 12- 15 Demand, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 13- Audit 15A1, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - 15A1 Demand, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 15- Series APR, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Series demand, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - Series 16 demand, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 - Interest Bills | ||
11 | 11
respm
Affidavit/Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 10/17 3:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re10 Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson. (Muller, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Certificate of Default, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - NY State Department of Corporations, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - T&F Demand Letter, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Attorneys Fees | ||
10 | 10
motion
Default Judgment
Tue 10/17 3:53 PM
Notice of MOTION for Default Judgment by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson. (Muller, Arthur) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Fri 07/21 3:27 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Flavio Aguirre Corp. has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Flavio Aguirre Corp. is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Tue 07/18 12:06 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson (Muller, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration | ||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 05/19 1:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Denise Richardson, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. Flavio Aguirre Corp. served on 5/13/2017, answer due 6/5/2017. (Muller, Arthur) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 05/18 3:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Denise Richardson, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. Flavio Aguirre Corp. served on 5/1/2017, answer due 5/22/2017. (Muller, Arthur) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 04/25 11:25 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Louis Bisignano, Michael Bourgal, Thomas Corbett, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Frank H. Finkel, Thomas Gesualdi, Marc Herbst, Darin Jeffers, Michael O'Toole, Denise Richardson (Muller, Arthur) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 10:11 AM
Summons Issued as to Flavio Aguirre Corp.. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued - Belleville Address | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/25 10:06 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/25 9:57 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/25 9:59 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 5:11 PM
COMPLAINT against Flavio Aguirre Corp. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9473658 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Frank H. Finkel, Darin Jeffers, Joseph A. Ferrara, Sr, Denise Richardson, Louis Bisignano, Marc Herbst, Thomas Gesualdi, Michael O'Toole, Thomas Corbett, Michael Bourgal. (Muller, Arthur) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Newark Address, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Belleville Address |