Hoffman v. MRS BPO, LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Allyne R Ross |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02447 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 6:13 AM EDT |
Defendant
MRS BPO, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Attorney Igor Litvak
The Litvak Law Firm, PLLC 1701 Avenue P
Brooklyn, NY 11229 |
|
Plaintiff
Michelina Hoffman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, August 17, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
4
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/17 12:28 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE/Joint stipulation for voluntary dismissal with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 8/16/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
23 | 23
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/17 11:27 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE/Joint stipulation for voluntary dismissal with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Allyne R. Ross on 8/16/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/15 3:56 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by MRS BPO, LLC (Etmund, Michael) |
|
order
Order(Other) 1 - Terminate Hearings
Wed 08/15 5:16 PM
ORDER The 8/16/2018 Status Conference is cancelled. See (23 in 2:17-cv-02585-ARR-RER) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by MRS BPO, LLC, (22 in 2:17-cv-02447-ARR-RER) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by MRS BPO, LLC, (24 in 2:17-cv-02586-ARR-RER) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by MRS BPO, LLC, (26 in 2:17-cv-02019-ARR-RER) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by MRS BPO, LLC, (24 in 2:17-cv-02587-ARR-RER) Stipulation of Dismissal filed by MRS BPO, LLC. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/15/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Fri 08/10 1:17 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by MRS BPO, LLC (Etmund, Michael) |
|
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 08/10 2:46 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference is set for 8/16/2018 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. NO Adjournments.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/10/2018. (Genovese, Jacqueline) |
||
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 07/11 9:22 AM
ORDER re20 Status Report filed by MRS BPO, LLC. Further Status Report regarding settlement is due by 8/10/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/11/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Tue 07/10 3:51 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by MRS BPO, LLC (Etmund, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 04/10 11:24 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Continue Stay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 4/09/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/09 12:32 PM
STATUS REPORT by Michelina Hoffman (Barshay, David) |
|
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Fri 03/30 5:03 PM
ORDER: In light of the Second Circuit's March 29th decision in Taylor v. Financial Recovery Services, Inc., No. 17-1650 cv, counsel are to meet and confer regarding future proceedings for this case, and submit a status report setting forth each parties' position thereon, no later than 4/13/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/30/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Thursday, February 01, 2018 | ||
order
~Util - Case Stayed
Thu 02/01 11:40 AM
Case stayed for Appeal Proceeding. Litigation Pending Outcome of Appeal to Second Circuit in Case no. 17-1650 Taylor v. Financial Recovery Services, Inc. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/14/2017. (See case no. 2:17-cv-00647(ARR)(RER)) (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
order
Status Report Order
Thu 02/01 12:12 PM
ORDER: Joint Status Report is due by 7/26/2018 or within 7 days of decision in Taylor v. Financial Recovery Services, Inc. whichever is earlier. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/1/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
notice
Notice of Failure to Comply with ECF Requirement
Thu 02/01 12:50 PM
The parties are reminded to file all future status reports or motions seeking relief from the Court in all of the related cases. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Mon 01/29 2:51 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint by MRS BPO, LLC (Etmund, Michael) |
|
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines
Thu 07/27 4:15 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Initial Conference Hearing held on 7/27/2017. Case called. Plaintiff represented by Jonathan Cader. Defendant represented by Aleksander Powietrzynski. Discussions held. Defendant's motion to stay is due 8/3/2017; Plaintiff's response is due 8/10/2017. Counsel are directed to e-mail or fax the other attorneys in the related cases the motion to stay and response.(Tape#11:26:45-12:11:57) (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/26 6:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Mark Cader on behalf of Michelina Hoffman (aty to be noticed) (Cader, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Case Management Statement
Mon 07/24 2:04 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Etmund, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/30 8:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksander Piotr Powietrzynski on behalf of MRS BPO, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Powietrzynski, Aleksander) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 06/22 1:32 PM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Michelina Hoffman. (Barshay, David) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 06/22 4:38 PM
ORDER granting (17) Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 2:17-cv-00647-ARR-RER; granting (18) Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 2:17-cv-02019-ARR-RER; granting (14) Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 2:17-cv-02447-ARR-RER; granting (15) Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 2:17-cv-02585-ARR-RER; granting (15) Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 2:17-cv-02586-ARR-RER; granting (15) Motion to Adjourn Conference in case 2:17-cv-02587-ARR-RER. The 7/6/2017 Initial Conference is adjourned to 7/27/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Case Management Statement due on 7/24/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/22/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 06/06 9:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/6/2017 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See main document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 6/30/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/6/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice(Other)
Mon 06/05 10:05 AM
NOTICE: With reference to plaintiffs' letters dated May 2610 , May 3011 , and May 31, 201712 , I have, by previous order, accepted the reassignment of this case. (Kovalenko, Nina) |
||
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Wed 05/31 9:43 PM
Notice of Related Case copy of letter to Clerk of the Court in opposition to Defendant's Notice of Related Cases (Litvak, Igor) |
|
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 05/31 3:18 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Allyne R. Ross and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Arthur D. Spatt, Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 5/31/2017. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Tue 05/30 1:09 PM
Notice of Related Case copy of letter to Clerk of the Court in opposition Defendant's Notice of Related Cases (Barshay, David) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Letter
Fri 05/26 4:40 PM
Letter copy of letter to Clerk of the Court concerning Defendant's Notice of Related Cases by Michelina Hoffman (Barshay, David) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation
Wed 05/24 11:24 AM
Notice of Related Case (Etmund, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 05/24 11:15 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MRS BPO, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MRS Associates, Inc. for MRS BPO, LLC. (Etmund, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 05/24 11:14 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by MRS BPO, LLC. (Etmund, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/24 11:14 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Etmund on behalf of MRS BPO, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Etmund, Michael) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 05/12 12:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: INITIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for June 26, 2017 at 12 p.m. before Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson in Courtroom 910 at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York. No later than two business days before the Initial Conference, counsel for the parties must submit, by means of electronic filing on the court's ECF system, a Joint Proposed Discovery Plan. SEE ATTACHED ORDER for additional details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/12/2017. (Roman, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/10 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Michelina Hoffman (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 10:22 AM
Summons Issued as to MRS BPO, LLC. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/25 10:18 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/25 10:16 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/25 10:18 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 5:25 PM
COMPLAINT against MRS BPO, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9473737 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Michelina Hoffman. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |