Augi et al v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sandra J Feuerstein |
Referred: | A Kathleen Tomlinson |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02449 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 6:20 AM EDT |
Defendant
Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christine N. Augi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Holly F. Vosefski
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 54 minutes ago |
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 10/03 10:44 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re11 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/2/2017. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 09/29 2:45 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Christine N. Augi, Holly F. Vosefski (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 07/19 9:52 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Plaintiff having advised the Court that this matter has settled, this case is closed with leave to reopen on ten (10) days' notice by no later than September 19, 2017. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 7/19/2017. (Killigrew, Patricia) |
||
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 07/18 10:44 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Christine N. Augi, Holly F. Vosefski (Barshay, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 06/14 5:50 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Genovese, Amanda) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 05/31 12:25 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, filed by Christine N. Augi, Holly F. Vosefski. (Barshay, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Collection Letters | ||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 05/30 11:21 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Genovese, Amanda) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/30 11:20 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PRA Group, Inc. for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Genovese, Amanda) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/30 11:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Lyn Genovese on behalf of Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Genovese, Amanda) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/10 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Christine N. Augi, Holly F. Vosefski (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) |
|
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 10:32 AM
Summons Issued as to Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/25 10:28 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/25 10:26 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/25 10:28 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 04/25 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 9/13/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (D'Agostino, Peter) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 5:38 PM
COMPLAINT against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9473807 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Christine N. Augi, Holly F. Vosefski. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |