Brady et al v. Malen & Associates, P.C.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sandra J Feuerstein |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02450 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 5:23 AM EDT |
Defendant
Malen & Associates, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Brady
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deon Lee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 08/18 10:43 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re11 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 8/16/2017. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/15 10:18 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Timothy Brady, Deon Lee (Barshay, David) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 08/02 4:02 PM
ORDER re10 : The time for Malen & Associates, P.C. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the amended complaint is extended to and including August 16, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 8/2/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 07/31 5:17 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Malen & Associates, P.C.. (Hughes, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 07/19 11:27 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Malen & Associates, P.C., filed by Timothy Brady, Deon Lee. (Barshay, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Collection Letters | ||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Letter
Fri 07/07 5:00 PM
Letter Motion to Dismiss Served by Malen & Associates, P.C. (Hughes, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/07 4:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy Brady, Deon Lee. Malen & Associates, P.C. served on 5/12/2017, answer due 7/7/2017. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 06/06 3:37 PM
ORDER re6 : The time for Malen & Associates, P.C. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to and including July 7, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 6/6/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 06/02 1:48 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Malen & Associates, P.C.. (Hughes, Adam) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/01 1:23 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Adam M. Hughes on behalf of Malen & Associates, P.C. (aty to be noticed) (Hughes, Adam) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 05/10 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Timothy Brady, Deon Lee (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) |
|
Wednesday, April 26, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 04/26 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 9/14/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing on Defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Walsh, Kenneth) |
||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 04/25 10:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Malen & Associates, P.C.. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 04/25 10:39 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 04/25 10:37 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 04/25 10:39 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 5:55 PM
COMPLAINT against Malen & Associates, P.C. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9473836 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Timothy Brady, Deon Lee. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |