Barrentine v. City of York, The
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Margaret B Seymour |
Case #: | 0:17-cv-01055 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 5:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
City of York, The
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derrick Barrentine
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Document E-Mailed
Mon 02/26 9:51 AM
***DOCUMENT E-MAILED (40 in 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 41 in 0:17-cv-01056-MBS, 41 in 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 41 in 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 41) Order on Motion for Reconsideration to Clerk, York County Common Pleas Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS(mdea ) |
|
41 | 41
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Mon 02/26 9:37 AM
ORDER AND OPINION granting (19) Motion for Reconsideration in case 0:17-cv-01053-MBS; granting (20) Motion for Reconsideration in case 0:17-cv-01054-MBS; granting (20) Motion for Reconsideration in case 0:17-cv-01055-MBS; granting (20) Motion for Reconsideration in case 0:17-cv-01056-MBS Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 2/21/2018.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS Clerk's Notice: Attorneys are responsible for supplementing the State Court record with all documents filed in Federal Court.(mdea ) |
|
Wednesday, February 07, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Wed 02/07 11:57 AM
NOTICE of Hearing on Motion (38 in 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 39 in 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 39 in 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 39 in 0:17-cv-01056-MBS) Joint MOTION for Settlement (to approve settlement and dismiss action) : Motion Hearing set for 2/28/2018 10:45 AM in Columbia # 6, Matthew J. Perry, Court House, 901 Richland St, Columbia before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS(mdea ) |
|
39 | 39
motion
Settlement
Wed 02/07 10:05 AM
Joint MOTION for Settlement (to approve settlement and dismiss action) by City of York, The. Response to Motion due by 2/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS(Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-Fully Executed Settlement | ||
Saturday, September 09, 2017 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Sat 09/09 12:01 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re20 MOTION for Reconsideration re16 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Response filed by Derrick Barrentine. (Ahn, Chan) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 09/01 11:16 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re (19 in 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 19 in 0:17-cv-01056-MBS, 19 in 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 19 in 0:17-cv-01054-MBS) MOTION for Reconsideration re (16 in 0:17-cv-01053-MBS) Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Response filed by City of York, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 9/8/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS(Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. 1- Anderson Complaint | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 09/01 1:30 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Response to19 MOTION for reconsideration out of time by City of York, The.No proposed order. Filed by Clerk to include in all applicable cases.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS(mdea ) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher Johnson | ||
33 | 33
minutes
Status Conference Order on Motion for Leave to File
Thu 08/31 3:03 PM
Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Honorable Margaret B Seymour: granting (33) Motion for Leave to File Response to the Motion for Reconsideration. Response to motion is due September 1, 2017. Status Conference held on 8/31/2017 in case 0:17-cv-01053-MBS. Court Reporter Tana Hess. Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS(cper, ) |
|
32 | 32
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 08/31 10:48 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Status Conference set for 8/31/2017 02:30 PM before Honorable Margaret B Seymour. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call and have all parties on the line prior to contacting the Court at 843-579-1497.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS(cper, ) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases
Wed 08/23 3:01 PM
TEXT ORDER granting (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:17-cv-01053-MBS; granting (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:17-cv-01054-MBS; granting (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:17-cv-01055-MBS; granting (8) Motion to Consolidate Cases in case 0:17-cv-01056-MBS. At this time, the cases are consolidated only for the purposes of discovery. Parties may move to consolidate for the purposes of trial at a later date. See ECF No. 29 . Adkins v. City of York, 0 17-1053 will serve as the lead case. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/23/2017.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS(mdea ) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/22 2:12 PM
STATUS REPORT *Joint Status Report* by City of York, The. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order
Wed 08/16 11:53 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendant are directed to submit a joint status report within 7 days of the filing date of this order regarding whether the parties request the cases consolidated solely for discovery purposes or for the remainder of the case, including trial. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/16/2017. Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS(mdea ) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Thu 08/10 11:26 AM
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Derrick Barrentine.(Ahn, Chan) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
discov
Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 08/08 3:44 PM
Defendant's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by City of York, The.(Haselden, Thomas) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/07 2:11 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 10/2/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 10/23/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 11/27/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 12/27/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 12/27/2017, Discovery due by 2/23/2018, Motion in Limine due by 6/5/2018, Motions due by 3/6/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 5/21/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 6/28/2018, ADR Statement due by 4/4/2018, Mediation Due by 5/4/2018. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 8/7/2017. (mdea ) |
|
24 | 24
discov
Rule 26 Discovery Plan
Mon 08/07 12:27 PM
Joint Rule 26 Outline of Discovery Plan by City of York, The.(Johnson, Christopher) |
|
23 | 23
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Mon 08/07 12:25 PM
Joint Rule 26(f) Report by City of York, The.(Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Sunday, August 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Response to Motion Do not use if support or object to motion
Sun 08/06 12:59 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Response filed by Derrick Barrentine.Reply to Response to Motion due by 8/14/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Ahn, Chan) |
|
21 | 21
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Sun 08/06 12:50 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Derrick Barrentine.(Ahn, Chan) |
|
Saturday, August 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Reconsideration
Sat 08/05 10:18 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re16 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court by Derrick Barrentine. Response to Motion due by 8/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Ahn, Chan) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
19 | 19
motion
Reconsideration
Sat 08/05 10:05 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re (16 in 0:17-cv-01053-MBS) Order on Motion to Remand to State Court by William Adkins. Response to Motion due by 8/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS(Ahn, Chan) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Mon 07/31 10:27 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff and Defendant shall submit a proposed consent amended scheduling order within 7 days of the filing date of this order. Plaintiff is ordered to respond to Local Rule 26.01 Interrogatories within 7 days of the filing date of this order. Plaintiff is further ordered to respond to Defendant's motions to consolidate, ECF No. 8 , within 14 days of the filing date of this order. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 7/31/2017. Associated Cases: 0:17-cv-01053-MBS, 0:17-cv-01054-MBS, 0:17-cv-01055-MBS, 0:17-cv-01056-MBS(mdea ) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Fri 07/28 3:40 PM
ORDER AND OPINION denying 10 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 7/28/2017.(asni, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Wed 07/26 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Christopher W Johnson for August 7-11 and November 30-December 4, 2017 (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 05/12 10:39 AM
TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's motion for extension of time 11 is GRANTED. Pursuant to Local Rule 16.00(C) the entry of the scheduling order(s) and all federal and local civil rule disclosure and conference requirements are stayed pending resolution of Plaintiff's motion to remand. Plaintiff's motion for costs and actual expenses is held in abeyance until determination of the motion to remand. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 5/12/2017.(asni, ) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 05/11 4:07 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 MOTION for Extension of Time MOTION to Stay. Response filed by City of York, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/18/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Filing corrected for event type (cbru, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Emails | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 05/11 4:05 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Remand to State Court Response filed by City of York, The.Reply to Response to Motion due by 5/18/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.(Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Emails | ||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time Stay
Fri 05/05 6:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to answer LR 26.01 interrogatories by Derrick Barrentine. Response to Motion due by 5/19/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Ahn, Chan). Added MOTION to Stay Scheduling Order deadlines on 5/8/2017 (mdea, ) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Remand to State Court
Fri 05/05 3:21 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Derrick Barrentine. Response to Motion due by 5/19/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.(Ahn, Chan) |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Reply Not to a Motion
Wed 05/03 2:14 PM
REPLY by City of York, The to5 Order Concerning Removal . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Consolidate Cases
Wed 05/03 1:36 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases by City of York, The. Response to Motion due by 5/17/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 04/24 4:12 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Report due by 5/30/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 6/23/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 7/24/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 8/22/2017, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 8/22/2017, Discovery due by 10/23/2017, Motion in Limine due by 2/5/2018, Motions due by 11/6/2017, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/19/2018, Jury Selection Deadline 2/26/2018, ADR Statement due by 12/6/2017, Mediation Due by 1/4/2018. Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 4/24/2017. (mdea ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Mon 04/24 3:48 PM
ORDER re 1 Notice of Removal filed by City of York, The Signed by Honorable Margaret B Seymour on 4/24/2017. (mdea ) |
|
4 | 4
respoth
Answer to Complaint Notice of Removal
Mon 04/24 3:46 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by City of York, The. (mdea ) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 04/24 3:45 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by City of York, The.(mdea ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/24 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from York County Common Pleas, case number 2017-CP-46-812. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7117316), filed by City of York, The.(mdea ) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Documents |