Wilson v. Anthem Insurance Companies Inc
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Bruce Howe Hendricks |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01035 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 08, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:16 AM EDT |
Defendant
Anthem Insurance Companies Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order
Fri 06/08 11:59 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 6/8/2018. (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 06/07 10:15 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Kenneth Wilson (Louzri, Melissa) |
|
Thursday, April 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Change of Case Number
Thu 04/12 12:34 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF CASE NUMBER from 2:17-cv-01035-DCN to 2:17-cv-01035-BHH. Please use the new case number on all future filings. (sshe, ) |
|
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 04/11 4:37 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time. It is ordered that the joint stipulation and memorandum deadlines set forth in the specialized case management order are extended to June 10, 2018. The parties will submit a proposed consent order to the court. Entered at the Direction of The Honorable Bruce Howe Hendricks on 4/11/2018.(vdru, ) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Wed 04/11 3:55 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Bruce Howe Hendricks. Judge David C Norton no longer assigned to the case. (suro, ) |
|
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 04/11 3:41 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Kenneth Wilson. Response to Motion due by 4/25/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Louzri, Melissa) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 04/10 4:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Stevens Brown on behalf of Anthem Insurance Companies Inc (Brown, William) |
|
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Erisa Order
Fri 06/02 3:04 PM
ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 6/2/2017. (jbry, ) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 05/19 12:54 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Anthem Insurance Companies Inc.(Foster, William) |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 05/19 12:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Anthem Insurance Companies Inc.(Foster, William) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Thu 05/18 10:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kenneth Wilson. Anthem Insurance Companies Inc served on 4/28/2017, answer due 5/19/2017.(Louzri, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Acceptance of Service DOI, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents Return Receipt | ||
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 8:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Anthem Insurance Companies Inc. (jbry, ) |
|
2 | 2
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 04/24 8:05 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Kenneth Wilson.(jbry, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 8:04 AM
COMPLAINT against Anthem Insurance Companies Inc ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7115166.), filed by Kenneth Wilson. Service due by 7/20/2017(jbry, ) |