Hughes et al v. Wright National Flood Insurance Company
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | R Bryan Harwell |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01058 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 42:4001 National Insurance Flood Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 6:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
Wright National Flood Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angela Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Hughes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order
Mon 06/25 10:50 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 6/25/2018. (hcic, ) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 06/25 10:09 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Angela Hughes, Michael Hughes (Player, Tucker) |
|
Thursday, June 21, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/21 10:14 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's 32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment. Response now due June 25, 2018. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 6/21/2018.(tmcb, ) |
|
Tuesday, June 19, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 06/19 1:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to28 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Angela Hughes, Michael Hughes. Response to Motion due by 7/3/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Player, Tucker) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 06/08 9:24 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's motion for summary judgment. Response now due June 21, 2018. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 6/8/2018.(tmcb, ) |
|
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 06/07 3:23 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to28 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Angela Hughes, Michael Hughes. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Player, Tucker) |
|
Thursday, May 24, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 05/24 4:58 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 6/7/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order |
|
Att: 1 Memo in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Bulletin W-15060, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Dwelling Form, | ||
Att: 4 Envelope 3 Declaration of Carolann Whitfield, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 Flood Declarations Page, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 Colonial Report, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 Deposition of Angela Hughes, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 Ram Jack Estimate, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 Deposition of Michael Hughes, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 Photographs, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 Deposition of Saul Martinez, | ||
Att: 12 Supporting Documents Armstrong v. Fidelity National Property and Casualty Insurance Company, | ||
Att: 13 Supporting Documents Clifford v. Preferred Mutual Insurance Co, | ||
Att: 14 Supporting Documents Cooper v. Omaha Property and Casualty Insurance Co, | ||
Att: 15 Supporting Documents Greene v. Nationwide Mutual Fire Insurance Co, | ||
Att: 16 Supporting Documents Harris v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Co | ||
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
adr
ADR Statement/Certification
Tue 05/22 1:14 PM
ADR STATEMENT/CERTIFICATION by Wright National Flood Insurance Compan |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Request for Protection from Court Appearance
Tue 04/17 3:43 PM
NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Phillip Earl Reeves for June 25, 2018 to July 11, 2018 |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses
Mon 03/19 4:06 PM
DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Wright National Flood Insurance Company |
|
Monday, February 26, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Mon 02/26 1:26 PM
TEXT ORDER denying, without prejudice, Defendant's 20 motion to compel. Counsel are directed to comply with the Scheduling Order regarding the request for an informal telephone conference prior to filing any motions related to discovery. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 2/26/2018.(tmcb, ) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 02/26 12:00 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 02/26/2018. (lsut, ) |
|
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Fri 02/23 9:06 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joel Wayne Morgan ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7628517) by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 3/9/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Supporting Documents Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Order | ||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Compel
Fri 01/26 5:47 PM
MOTION to Compel by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 2/9/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Defendant's Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents | ||
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 01/19 1:22 PM
CONSENT AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 2/9/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 3/19/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 3/19/2018, Discovery due by 5/11/2018, Motions due by 5/25/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/9/2018, ADR Statement due by 5/22/2018, Mediation Due by 6/22/2018. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to date set for trial. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 09/10/2018. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 01/19/2018. (lsut, ) |
|
18 | 18
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 01/19 1:19 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 01/19/2018. (lsut, ) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response to Motion Do not use if support or object to motion
Thu 12/21 4:40 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 MOTION for Extension of Time Response filed by Wright National Flood Insurance Company.Reply to Response to Motion due by 12/28/2017 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 12/07 9:08 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time by Angela Hughes, Michael Hughes. Response to Motion due by 12/21/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Player, Tucker) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 09/22 4:58 PM
CONSENT ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFFS' CLAIMS FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES AND PREJUDGMENT INTEREST AND STRIKING PLAINTIFFS' JURY DEMAND. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 9/22/2017. (hcic, ) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss
Thu 09/21 2:50 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Claims for Attorney's Fees and Prejudgment Interest and Striking Plaintiffs' Jury Demand by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 10/5/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Consent Order Dismissing Plaintiffs' Claims for Attorney's Fees and Prejudgment Interest and Striking Plaintiffs' Jury Demand | ||
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
discov
Rule 26(f) Report
Tue 09/12 4:03 PM
Rule 26(f) Report by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Proposed Amended Conference and Scheduling Order | ||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/11 11:18 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Theodore Ira Brenner. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 09/11/17. (lsut, ) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (only one attorney per motion)
Fri 09/08 3:26 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Theodore Ira Brenner ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-7351252) by Wright National Flood Insurance Company. Response to Motion due by 9/22/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Application/Affiavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/09 4:44 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 8/29/2017, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 9/12/2017, Rule 26 Report due by 9/12/2017, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 11/7/2017, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 12/7/2017, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 1/8/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 1/8/2018, Discovery due by 3/7/2018, Motions due by 3/22/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 6/5/2018, ADR Statement due by 4/21/2018, Mediation Due by 5/21/2018. Motions in limine must be filed at least three weeks prior to the date set for jury selection. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed within seven (7) days after the motion is filed. Parties shall furnish the Court pretrial briefs seven (7) days prior to the date set for jury selection. This case is subject to being called for jury selection and/or trial on or after 8/6/2018. Signed by the Honorable R Bryan Harwell on 8/9/2017. (hcic, ) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Tue 08/08 3:57 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wright National Flood Insurance Company |
|
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/08 3:56 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Wright National Flood Insurance Company |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Thu 07/20 10:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Angela Hughes, Michael Hughes. All Defendants. (Player, Tucker) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 3:19 PM
Summons Issued as to Wright National Flood Insurance Company. Service due by 7/24/2017. (hcic, ) |
|
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 04/24 3:18 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories with jury demand by Angela Hughes, Michael Hughes. (hcic, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 3:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Wright National Flood Insurance Company (filing fee $400 receipt number 0420-7117749), filed by Angela Hughes, Michael Hughes. (hcic, ) |