Green v. Verizon Wireless Managed Short Term Disability Plan
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Donald C Coggins, Jr |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-01036 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Apr 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Wednesday Oct 18, 2017 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
Verizon Wireless Managed Short Term Disability Plan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dinah Green
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11 hours ago |
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 04/06 8:59 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Verizon Wireless Managed Short Term Disability Plan. (Floyd, William) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order
Fri 01/26 9:03 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/26/2018. (abuc) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Settlement
Thu 01/25 4:12 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Dinah Green (Louzri, Melissa) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 01/24 9:26 AM
TEXT ORDER granting 18 motion for extension of time. Cross-motions for judgment are due by January 29, 2018. Signed by Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr on 1/24/2018. (abuc) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 01/23 4:04 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time by Dinah Green. Response to Motion due by 2/6/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Louzri, Melissa) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Case Reassigned CV
Wed 12/13 2:25 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Honorable Donald C Coggins, Jr. Judge Honorable J Michelle Childs no longer assigned to the case. (glev, ) |
|
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Erisa Order
Fri 10/06 4:04 PM
AMENDED ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Mediation due on or before 11/15/17; Cross-Motions for Judgment due on or before 12/15/17. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/6/17. (alew, ) |
|
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Fri 10/06 4:03 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 10 Motion to Amend/Correct 7 Erisa Case Management Order. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/6/17.(alew, ) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Amend/Correct
Thu 10/05 1:48 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Specialized Case Management Order by Verizon Wireless Managed Short Term Disability Plan. Response to Motion due by 10/19/2017. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Floyd, William) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Joint Certification ERISA
Wed 08/30 11:54 AM
JOINT CERTIFICATION by Verizon Wireless Managed Short Term Disability Plan, Dinah Green (Floyd, William) Modified on 8/30/2017 to add party listed as filer (alew, ) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed - Complaint Served
Thu 06/22 7:04 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dinah Green. Verizon Wireless Managed Short Term Disability Plan served on 5/19/2017, answer due 6/9/2017.(Louzri, Melissa) |
|
Att: 1 Supporting Documents Return Receipt | ||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Erisa Order
Fri 06/09 11:26 AM
ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Joint Stipulation Deadline 10/10/2017. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/9/17. (alew, ) |
|
6 | 6
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Fri 06/09 10:00 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Verizon Wireless Managed Short Term Disability Plan.(Floyd, William) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/09 9:58 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Verizon Wireless Managed Short Term Disability Plan.(Floyd, William) |
|
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 04/24 9:36 AM
Summons Issued as to Verizon Wireless Managed Short Term Disability Plan. (alew, ) |
|
Friday, April 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Mon 04/24 9:35 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Andrew Russo.(alew, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 04/24 9:34 AM
COMPLAINT against Verizon Wireless Managed Short Term Disability Plan ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7115171.), filed by Andrew Russo. Service due by 7/20/2017(alew, ) |