Seaway Bank and Trust Company v. MVF Properties LLC et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | J P Stadtmueller |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00578 |
Nature of Suit | 430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 4:25 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jane Does
|
|
Defendant
John Does
|
|
Defendant
James C Fazio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Fazio Automotive Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MVF Properties LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amanda May Reitz
|
|
Plaintiff
Seaway Bank and Trust Company
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Counter Claimant
James C Fazio
Terminated: 10/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Fazio Automotive Inc
Terminated: 10/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
MVF Properties LLC
Terminated: 10/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Terminated: 10/11/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand
Thu 11/30 9:10 AM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 11/30/2017: GRANTING28 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to take all appropriate steps to effectuate the remand of this case back to the Milwaukee County Circuit Court. (cc: all counsel) (jm) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
38 | 38
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 3:33 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. John Doe 9 served on 9/2/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
37 | 37
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 3:27 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. John Doe 8 served on 9/2/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
36 | 36
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. John Doe 7 served on 9/7/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
35 | 35
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 3:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. John Doe 6 served on 9/7/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
34 | 34
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 3:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. John Doe 5 served on 9/2/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
33 | 33
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 3:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. John Doe 4 served on 9/2/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
32 | 32
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 3:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. John Doe 3 served on 9/2/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
31 | 31
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 3:15 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. John Doe 2 served on 9/7/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
30 | 30
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 3:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. Jane Doe 8 served on 9/2/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
29 | 29
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 3:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. Jane Doe 7 served on 9/2/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Remand
Tue 10/24 3:01 PM
MOTION to Remand by Seaway Bank and Trust Company.(Payne, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit CCAP report of originating case, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order proposed order | ||
27 | 27
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 2:59 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. Jane Doe 6 served on 9/7/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
26 | 26
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 2:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. Jane Doe 5 served on 9/4/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
25 | 25
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 2:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. Jane Doe 4 served on 9/7/2016 9/7/2017 . (Payne, Benjamin) Modified on 10/24/2017 (asc) |
|
24 | 24
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 2:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. Jane Doe 3 served on 9/7/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
23 | 23
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 2:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. Jane Doe 2 served on 9/2/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
22 | 22
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 2:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. Jane Does served on 9/2/2016. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
21 | 21
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 10/24 2:07 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. Amanda May Reitz served on 3/23/2017. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 10/11 4:19 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/11/2017. Within 14 days, Plaintiff to provide evidence of service or otherwise explain why good cause exists to extend the service deadline as to defendant Amanda May Reitz. Within 14 days, Plaintiff to identify the Doe defendants in an amended pleading, dismiss them from this action, or explain why good cause exists to allow the Doe defendants to remain unnamed. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
19 | 19
6
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Terminate Party
Wed 10/11 4:07 PM
ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 10/11/2017: GRANTING7 FDIC's Motion to Dismiss; DISMISSING MVF Properties LLC, James C. Fazio, and Fazio Automotive Inc.'s counterclaims; and DISMISSING FDIC from this action. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Affidavit
Thu 06/29 2:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Bryan M. Becker of No Objection to Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims .(Becker, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines
Tue 06/27 4:24 PM
TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 6/27/2017: Interim Settlement Report due by 12/22/2017; Dispositive Motions due by 12/28/2017; Final Settlement Report due by 3/22/2018; Motions in Limine and all other Non-Dispositive Motions due by 3/26/2018; Single Joint Final Pretrial Report due by close of business on 3/29/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/3/2018 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Jury Trial set for 4/9/2018 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 425, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. See Order. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
16 | 16
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 06/27 2:43 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. P. Stadtmueller: Scheduling Conference held on 6/27/2017 (Court Reporter Liberty Court Recorder) (km) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Report of Rule 26(f) Plan
Thu 06/22 2:31 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by James C Fazio, Fazio Automotive Inc, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, MVF Properties LLC, Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Becker, Bryan) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/19 3:55 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by James C Fazio, Fazio Automotive Inc, MVF Properties LLC. (Judge, William) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/19 3:53 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by James C Fazio, Fazio Automotive Inc, MVF Properties LLC. (Judge, William) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 06/19 3:26 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice by Clerk to Counsel Re Consent to Magistrate
Wed 06/14 11:03 AM
NOTICE from the clerk to PLAINTIFF; Seaway Bank and Trust Company requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin be filed no later than 6/21/2017; the form is available at the court's web site: www.wied.uscourts.gov (asc) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/07 4:57 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/07 4:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Becker, Bryan) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/07 12:02 PM
BLANK; TO BE RE-FILED Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Payne, Benjamin) Modified on 6/7/2017 (blr) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 06/07 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2017 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 284, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave., Milwaukee, WI before Judge J.P. Stadtmueller. Joint Rule 26 Plan due by 6/22/2017. (cc: all counsel)(jm) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss
Wed 06/07 9:10 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims and BRIEF in Support by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.(Becker, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Clifford Gilliard | ||
misc
Notice of Electronic Filing Error
Wed 06/07 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re9 Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. The Consent/Refusal form is blank. This document must be RE-FILED.7 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. The Brief in Support and Affidavit should have been filed as separate entries. The brief and affidavit do not need to be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (blr) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Mon 04/24 4:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Federal Deposit Insurance Company filed by James C Fazio, MVF Properties LLC, Fazio Automotive Inc.(asc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits | ||
5 | 5
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/24 3:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Company re: Notice of Removal (Becker, Bryan) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Amended Document (NOT Motion)
Mon 04/24 11:47 AM
Milwaukee County Circuit Court Summons and Complaint AMENDED DOCUMENT by Federal Deposit Insurance Company, as Receiver for Seaway Bank and Trust Company. Summons and Complaint filed in state court action. (Becker, Bryan) Modified on 4/24/2017 (asc) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/24 11:46 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Federal Deposit Insurance Company, as Receiver for Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Becker, Bryan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/24 11:45 AM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Federal Deposit Insurance Company, as Receiver for Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Becker, Bryan) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/24 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Deposit Insurance Company, as Receiver for Seaway Bank and Trust Company from Circuit Court, Milwaukee County, Wisconsin, Case Number: 2016 CV 6412 with attached state court documents, see4 for additional documents.(Becker, Bryan) Modified on 4/24/2017 (asc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 04/24 10:55 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge J P Stadtmueller ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) |