Seaway Bank and Trust Company v. Lindbergh et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lynn Adelman |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00580 |
Nature of Suit | 430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 4:52 AM CDT |
Counter Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James C Fazio
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amanda May Reitz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bank of America NA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Atetullah Biten
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jane Doe Fazio
|
|
Defendant
Genuine Parts Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jane Does A and B
|
|
Defendant
John Does A and B
|
|
Defendant
Kandy Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kevin J Lindbergh
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Metro Resource Investment & Management Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
North Shore Bank FSB
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John S Winkowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Seaway Bank and Trust Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Thu 01/25 12:13 PM
ORDER ON MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO MILWAUKEE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this case is hereby remanded to Milwaukee County Circuit Court, where it was pending immediately prior to removal as case number 2016CV006914. Signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 1/24/2018. (cc: all counsel) (gc) |
|
utility
Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys
Fri 01/26 10:07 AM
Case Terminated pursuant to15 Order on Motion to Remand Case to Milwaukee County Circuit Court. Certified copy of15 Order and docket sheet sent via US Mail to Milwaukee County Clerk's Office. (bx) |
||
Thursday, November 09, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Remand to State Court
Thu 11/09 9:11 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Seaway Bank and Trust Company.(Payne, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit CCAP report of originating case, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit proposed order | ||
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 11/06 2:06 PM
ORDER that FDIC's motion to dismiss Fazio's counterclaims5 is GRANTED and Fazio's counterclaims are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Lynn Adelman on 11/6/2017. (cc: all counsel) (gc) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit
Thu 06/29 3:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Bryan M. Becker of No Objection to Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims .(Becker, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order Dismissing Counterclaims | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response to Motion
Wed 06/28 5:33 PM
RESPONSE to Motion filed by James C Fazio, Jane Doe Fazio re5 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims . (Judge, William) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice of Electronic Filing Error
Thu 06/08 9:20 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re5 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation ; The Brief in Support and Affidavit should have been filed as separate entries and not as attachments to the motion. These documents do not need to be re-filed. Furthermore, the description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/07 4:54 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Certificate of Service
Wed 06/07 4:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Becker, Bryan) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/07 3:45 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/07 3:43 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 06/07 12:05 PM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Payne, Benjamin) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss
Wed 06/07 9:34 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.(Becker, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Clifford Gilliard | ||
Tuesday, April 25, 2017 | ||
misc
Case Opening Modification
Tue 04/25 11:11 AM
Case Opening Modification(s); The following modification(s) have been made to your case entry: One or more party names have been modified (do not add addresses or punctuation)- please remember to follow the Party Name Guidelines found on our website. ; Please refer to the[LINK:attorney case opening instructions] , the[LINK:summons instructions] and the[LINK:party name guidelines found in the user manual] for further guidance (bx) |
||
misc
Notice of Electronic Filing Error
Tue 04/25 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Company ; The description of the attachments contains duplicate text. In the future, when attaching documents to the main document you may select a description from the category drop-down list but then you should not repeat that word in the description text box. For example, if you choose Exhibit from the drop-down list, then you may simply type A in the description text box and Exhibit A will appear on the docket. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (bx) |
||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 04/24 3:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Company re: Notice of Removal (Becker, Bryan) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Disclosure Statement
Mon 04/24 11:52 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Federal Deposit Insurance Company, as Receiver for Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Becker, Bryan) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Mon 04/24 11:51 AM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Federal Deposit Insurance Company, as Receiver for Seaway Bank and Trust Company. (Becker, Bryan) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 04/24 11:14 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federal Deposit Insurance Company, as Receiver for Seaway Bank and Trust Company from Circuit Court, Milwaukee County, Wisconsin, Case Number: 16 CV 6914 with attached state court documents.(Becker, Bryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 04/24 11:19 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge Lynn Adelman ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Jones to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl) |