Moore v. Eckstein et al
Wisconsin Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | David E Jones |
Referred: | William C Griesbach |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00581 |
Nature of Suit | 560 Prisoner Petitions - Civil Detainee - Conditions of Confinement |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 23, 2018 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
order
Judgment
Wed 05/23 12:20 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk in favor of James Cygan, Michael Schneider, Rodney Owens against Kevin Moore. Approved by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 5/23/2018. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to plaintiff)(amb) |
|
18 | 18
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 05/23 10:30 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 05/23/2018. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to plaintiff)(amb) |
|
Tuesday, May 22, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Tue 05/22 9:39 AM
LETTER from Timothy M. Barber re Dkt. 16 . (Barber, Timothy) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Request
Mon 05/21 3:29 PM
REQUEST to close case by Kevin Moore. (amb) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 01/24 8:56 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 1/24/2018. Discovery due by 5/25/2018, Dispositive Motions due by 6/29/2018. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to plaintiff)(amb) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Prisoner Complaint
Fri 01/19 1:56 PM
ANSWER to Prisoner Complaint by James Cygan, Rodney Owens, Michael Schneider.(Barber, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 01/03 10:41 AM
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Sgt Cygan, Rodney Owens, Education Director Schneider. (Barber, Timothy) |
|
12 | 12
service
Acceptance of Service by DOJ
Wed 01/03 10:37 AM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY DOJ as to Sgt Cygan, Rodney Owens, Education Director Schneider (Barber, Timothy) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/03 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy M Barber on behalf of Sgt Cygan, Rodney Owens, Education Director Schneider. Attorney(s) appearing: Timothy M. Barber(Barber, Timothy) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
utility
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction
Thu 01/04 8:09 AM
Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (amb) |
||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
~Util - Case No Longer Referred Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 11/21 3:19 PM
ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C. Griesbach on 11/21/17. Plaintiff's6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee is GRANTED. Plaintiff's9 MOTION to Add Party/file a proposed amended complaint is DENIED. Defendants' Eckstein, Foster, Schueler, Kind, Stevens, Casperson, Kamps, Perttu, Boatwright, Davidson, Hompe, Rose and O'Donnell are DISMISSED from this action. The case is no longer referred to Chief Judge William C. Griesbach and is returned to Magistrate Judge David E. Jones for further proceedings. (cc: all counsel and via US Mail to Kevin Moore and Warden)(Griesbach, William) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Wed 11/15 10:54 AM
CASE REFERRED to Chief Judge William C. Griesbach. (amb) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Add Party
Mon 07/24 11:53 AM
MOTION to Add Party/Proposed Amended Complaint by Kevin Moore. (mac) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
misc
Initial Partial Filing Fee Received
Wed 06/07 2:26 PM
INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE Received: $19.57, receipt number MK4689-066038. ; the payment of all future filing fees will be maintained by the financial department (jcl) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 05/22 9:42 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge David E Jones on 05/19/2017. IT IS ORDERED that Mr. Moore's motion to use funds from release account to pay filing fee4 is DENIED. The Court will allow Mr. Moore to use funds from his release account to pay his initial partial filing fee. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, upon Mr. Moore's request, the warden at the correctional institution where Mr. Moore is incarcerated shall withdraw a total of $19.57 from Mr. Moore's release account and forward that sum to the Clerk of this Court as the initial partial filing fee in this action. Such payment is to be made on or before 06/09/2017. (cc: all counsel, via US Mail to Plaintiff and Warden) (amb) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Thu 05/04 1:09 PM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Kevin Moore. (tlf) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee
Thu 05/04 1:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Kevin Moore. (tlf) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 05/02 1:57 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Kevin Moore. (tlf) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 04/27 12:49 PM
MOTION to use funds from Release Account to pay filing fee by Kevin Moore.(mac) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Information Request | ||
Monday, April 24, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Letter (From Court)
Mon 04/24 12:52 PM
LETTER from the Clerk to Kevin Moore regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program. (cc: All Counsel)(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet | ||
2 | 2
misc
Letter from Clerk re Consent to Magistrate
Mon 04/24 12:46 PM
LETTER from the Clerk to Kevin Moore requesting that he submit the consent/refusal form for Magistrate Judge David E Jones within 21 days. He must also submit either the filing fee or the request to proceed in forma pauperis and his certified trust account statement.(tlf) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint - Prisoner
Mon 04/24 12:32 PM
PRISONER COMPLAINT with jury demand filed against all Defendants by Kevin Moore.(tlf) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibits (with bookmarks) |