Steven Rupp et al v. Xavier Becerra et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Josephine L Staton |
Referred: | John D Early |
Case #: | 8:17-cv-00746 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Apr 24, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Sep 08, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 25, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 21, 2017 2:46 AM PDT |
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Dember
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Rupp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Seifert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alfonso Valencia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy Willis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas Grassey
|
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Martin
|
1. | First Lawsuit Filed Against CA's Expanded "Assault Weapon" Law (redstate.com) |
Submitted Thu 04/27/2017 | |
2. | California Rifle & Pistol Association files lawsuit against state over six gun control laws (sacbee.com) |
Submitted Wed 04/26/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
178 | 178
notice
Appearance
Tue 04/16 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Anna M Barvir on behalf of Plaintiffs California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated, Steven Dember, Cheryl Johnson, Michael Jones, Dennis Martin, Steven Rupp, Christopher Seifert, Alfonso Valencia, Troy Willis (Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party California Rifle and Pistol Association, Incorporated (pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Steven Dember(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Cheryl Johnson(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Michael Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Dennis Martin(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Steven Rupp(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Christopher Seifert(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Alfonso Valencia(pty:pla), Attorney Anna M Barvir added to party Troy Willis(pty:pla))(Barvir, Anna) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2024 | ||
177 | 177
2
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags
Tue 04/09 4:45 PM
ORDER GRANTING Stipulation and Joint Request to Stay Litigation of Costs Pending Appeal (Doc.176 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton that all proceedings regarding costs in this action shall be stayed until 30 days after a mandate issues from the Ninth Circuit or, if no notice of appeal is timely filed in this case, until 5/24/2024. (jp) |