Eden Solutions Corporation
New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Robert E Grossman |
Case #: | 8:17-bk-72485 |
Case Filed: | Apr 25, 2017 |
Creditor Meeting: | Jun 07, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Nov 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 28, 2017 |
Debtor
Eden Solutions Corporation
PO Box 696
Rockville Centre, NY 11571-0696 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
Robert L. Pryor
Pryor & Mandelup LLP 675 Old Country Road
Westbury, NY 11590 |
|
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2017 12:02 AM EDT |