District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Tanya S Chutkan
Case #: 1:17-cv-00757
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2017
Terminated:Dec 07, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Oct 22, 2017 5:16 AM EDT
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
Represented By
Jeremy S. Simon
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff
WESTERN VALUES PROJECT
Represented By
Scott Allan Hodes
Scott A. Hodes, Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 27 minutes ago
Monday, December 07, 2020
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/07 9:37 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
order .Order Mon 12/07 11:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint stipulation of dismissal29 , this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 12/7/2020. (DJS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 02, 2020
28 28 misc Status Report Mon 11/02 1:40 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
27 27 misc Status Report Tue 09/01 8:28 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 14, 2020
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 08/14 4:18 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/1/2020. (tb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 13, 2020
order .Order Thu 08/13 3:14 PM
MINUTE ORDER: On 2/27/2019 this court entered an order directing the parties in this FOIA action to file a joint status report by 4/9/19 and every sixty days thereafter. Although the parties have not sought to be relieved from the obligation of filing the reports, they filed their last report over five months ago on 3/10/2020. Accordingly, the parties shall file a joint status report by 9/1/2020 and every sixty days thereafter. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this action without further notice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/13/2020. (DJS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 10, 2020
26 26 misc Status Report Tue 03/10 2:07 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2020
25 25 misc Status Report Thu 01/09 4:58 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2019
24 24 misc Status Report Thu 11/07 3:23 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
23 23 misc Status Report Mon 08/05 9:05 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
22 22 misc Status Report Mon 06/10 9:08 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. (Collette, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/04 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Collette on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Collette, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 18, 2019
20 20 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Thu 04/18 10:17 AM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to WESTERN VALUES PROJECT. Attorney Scott Allan Hodes terminated. (Hodes, Scott)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2019
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/17 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Standish Massey on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Massey, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2019
18 18 misc Status Report Tue 04/09 12:43 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 28, 2019
order Order Lifting Stay Thu 02/28 9:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/28/19. (DJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 27, 2019
order .Order Wed 02/27 11:29 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' joint status report17 it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint status report by April 9, 2019, and every 60 days thereafter. To the extent the status report contains a proposed briefing schedule, the parties shall also submit a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 2/27/19. (DJS)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 02/27 2:27 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2019. (tb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 07, 2019
17 17 misc Status Report Thu 02/07 5:03 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 18, 2019
order Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Fri 01/18 2:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER : Granting16 Motion to Stay; Granting16 Motion for Extension of Deadlines. This action is herby STAYED until appropriations are restored to the Department of Justice. All pending deadlines are extended for a period of time equal to the calendar day duration of the lapse in appropriations. The parties shall file a joint status report within fourteen (14) calendar days after Congress has appropriated funds for the Department of Justice, notifying the Court that the appropriations lapse has ceased and proposing new deadlines for pending matters. The joint status report shall contain a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/18/19. (DJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 16, 2019
16 16 motion Stay Extension of Time to Wed 01/16 4:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay , Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to All Deadlines by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR(Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, November 15, 2018
15 15 misc Status Report Thu 11/15 3:33 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
14 14 misc Status Report Thu 07/19 5:22 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 21, 2018
13 13 misc Status Report Mon 05/21 12:35 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
12 12 misc Status Report Thu 03/22 12:27 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2018
11 11 misc Status Report Wed 01/24 10:07 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 01/24 12:10 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/26/2018. (tb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2018
order .Order Tue 01/23 7:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER: On 8/31/17 the court entered an order directing the parties to file a Joint Status Report by 11/1/17 and every 60 days thereafter. The parties filed a report on 11/17/17, but more than sixty days have elapsed since then and the parties have not filed another report or sought an extension of time in which to do so. Accordingly, the parties shall file their status report by 1/26/18 and every sixty days thereafter. To the extent the status report contains a proposed briefing schedule, the parties shall also submit a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/23/18. (DJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2017
10 10 misc Status Report Wed 11/01 4:26 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 04, 2017
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 09/04 3:37 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file another joint status report by 11/1/2017 and every 60 days thereafter. To the extent the status report contains a proposed briefing schedule, the parties shall also submit a proposed order. (jth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2017
order .Order Thu 08/31 6:08 PM
MINTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report9 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another joint status report by November 1, 2017 and every 60 days thereafter. To the extent the report contains a proposed briefing schedule, the parties shall also submit a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 8/31/17. (DJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
9 9 misc Status Report Wed 08/30 12:38 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, July 02, 2017
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Sun 07/02 12:29 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file another Joint Status Report along with a proposed order by 8/30/2017. (jth)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 01, 2017
order .Order Sat 07/01 1:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Having considered the parties' Joint Status Report8 , it is hereby ordered that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report by August 30, 2017, along with a proposed order. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 7/1/17. (DJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2017
8 8 misc Status Report Fri 06/30 3:33 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 09, 2017
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 06/09 9:10 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: The parties shall file a joint status report that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order by 6/30/17. (jth)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2017
order Scheduling Order Thu 06/08 2:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER SETTING DEADLINES: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil procedure appear to be inapplicable. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and propose a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule shall address the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, whether and when either party anticipates filing a dispositive motion, and any other pertinent issues. The parties shall file a joint status report that addresses these issues and that contains a proposed schedule and proposed order not later than 6/30/17. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 6/8/17. (DJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 01, 2017
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 06/01 4:44 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Simon, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant Tue 05/16 2:05 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR served on 5/1/2017 (Hodes, Scott)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Tue 05/16 2:05 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/02/2017. (Hodes, Scott)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney Tue 05/16 2:04 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/2/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/1/2017. (Hodes, Scott)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2017
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Thu 04/27 7:43 PM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (md)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent
Tuesday, April 25, 2017
2 2 notice LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Tue 04/25 5:27 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT (md)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 04/25 12:23 PM
COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4926863) filed by WESTERN VALUES PROJECT.(Hodes, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits to Complaint,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 LCvR7.1,
Att: 4 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 04/25 5:29 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Tanya S. Chutkan. (md)
Related: [-]