Erickson v. Hocking Technical College et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Edmund A Sargus |
Referred: | Chelsey M Vascura |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00360 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Apr 27, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 24, 2017 5:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
Hocking Technical College
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Andy Stone
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ron Erickson
|
Represented By
|
1. | Former Hocking College President files federal discrimination lawsuit against former employer (athensnews.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/11/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 05/30 8:47 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Ron Erickson (Bean, Frederick) |
|
Thursday, May 03, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/03 3:39 PM
ORDER - The case deadlines are indefinitely STAYED. The parties are DIRECTED to file within forty-five (45) days from the date of this Order a stipulation of dismissal or a status report explaining why no stipulation of dismissal has been filed. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 5/3/2018. (mas) |
|
Thursday, April 19, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/19 5:04 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Settlement Week due by 6/2018. (agm) |
||
Tuesday, March 27, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
8
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/27 10:54 AM
Opinion and Order issued re: 3/12/18 Telephonic Discovery Conference; Plaintiffs request for an order compelling Ms. Dioguardis testimony regarding the discussions held during the meetings memorialized in said discovery conference is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/27/18. (sem) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order
Tue 03/13 9:30 AM
ORDER memorializing the telephonic discovery conference on March 12, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 3/13/2018. (kpt) |
|
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
minutes
Discovery Conference
Mon 03/12 4:26 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Discovery Conference held on 3/12/2018. (agm) |
||
Wednesday, February 14, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 02/14 1:42 PM
ORDER - Counsel to confer within five (5) business days and inform the Court via email by 2/21/2017 if case should not be set for March 2018 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 2/14/2018. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 01/19 5:17 PM
ORDER granting20 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery. Discovery is due ON OR BEFORE APRIL 13, 2018. Dispositive motions are due ON OR BEFORE MAY 11, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 1/19/18. (sem) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines
Fri 01/19 5:18 PM
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Discovery now due by 4/13/2018. Dispositive motions now due by 5/11/2018. (sem) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Thu 01/18 2:59 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 4/13/2018. by Plaintiff Ron Erickson. (Bean, Frederick) |
|
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines
Mon 12/11 3:39 PM
Set/Reset Columbus PPTO Deadlines: Settlement Week due 3/2018. (agm) |
||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 11/30 4:24 PM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FOR THE PROTECTION OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/30/2017. (kpt) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Protective Order
Thu 11/30 11:26 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order for the Protection of Confidential Information Stipulated by Defendants Hocking Technical College, Andy Stone. (Ita, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulated Protective Order | ||
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 11/22 10:46 AM
ORDER granting 16 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The new deadline for Discovery is 2/28/2018 ; Dispositive Motions due 4/3/2018 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/22/2017. (kpt) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 11/22 11:16 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/28/2018. Dispositive motions due by 4/3/2018. (kpt) |
||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 11/21 9:34 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery New date requested 2/28/2018. and Dispositive Motion Deadlines 04/03/2018 by Defendants Hocking Technical College, Andy Stone. (Ita, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/01 4:38 PM
ORDER - Counsel to confer within five (5) business days and inform the Court via email by 11/9/2017 if case should not be set for December 2017 Settlement Week. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/1/2017. (agm)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 07/24 10:52 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 12/10/2018 at 9:30 AM; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/25/2019 at 9:00 AM; and Jury Trial set for 2/4/2019 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 07/24/2017. (Attachment: FPTO Form) (dh1) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Wed 07/19 10:19 AM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the December 2017 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 7/31/2017 . Motions to Amend and/or Joinder of Parties due by 8/17/2017 . If no motions for summary judgment are filed, any primary expert must make his/her Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures by 2/28/2018 ; any responsive/rebuttal experts' Rule 26(a)(2) disclosures must be made by 3/31/2018 ; and depositions of the damages experts must occur by 3/31/2018 . Discovery due by 12/30/2017 . Dispositive motions due by 1/31/2018 . Plaintiffs made a settlement demand on 7/3/2017. Defendants will respond by 7/21/2017 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/19/2017. (kdp) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Wed 07/19 3:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/18/2017. (agm) |
||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Thu 07/06 4:45 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Hocking Technical College, Andy Stone. (Ita, Amy) |
|
Saturday, July 01, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Reassigning Case
Sat 07/01 10:43 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 6/30/17. (jcw) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 06/23 1:13 PM
ANSWER to3 Amended Complaint filed by Hocking Technical College, Andy Stone. (Ita, Amy) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 06/08 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference of the parties set for 7/18/2017 @ 3:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Terence P. Kemp. (sh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Unexecuted
Wed 06/14 2:33 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Hocking Technical College c/o Statutory Agents, Ohio Board of Regents. (er) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 05/30 11:11 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Andy Stone answer due 6/23/2017. (agm) |
||
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 05/26 1:21 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Hocking Technical College answer due 6/23/2017. (er) |
||
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Stipulation
Thu 05/25 10:07 AM
STIPULATION Extension of Time for Defendants to Move or Plead in Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendants Hocking Technical College, Andy Stone. (Ita, Amy) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 05/19 1:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed: Defendant Hocking Technical College served on 5/17/2017, answer due 6/7/2017. (kdp) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 05/16 3:30 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Andy Stone. Andy Stone served on 5/12/2017, answer due 6/2/2017. (jlk) |
|
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Certificate of Clerk
Wed 05/10 11:05 AM
CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk. (agm) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 05/02 1:25 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ron Erickson. (Bean, Frederick) |
|
Thursday, April 27, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 04/27 5:01 PM
Summons Issued as to Hocking Technical College and Andy Stone. (sem) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 04/27 4:18 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-5936287), filed by Ron Erickson. (Bean, Frederick) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Form Summons x 3, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit EEOC Forms |