Nuverra Environmental Solutions, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Kevin J Carey |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10949 |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 06, 2018 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jul 25, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $500,000,001 to $1 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Nuverra Environmental Solutions, Inc.
14624 N. Scottsdale Road Suite 300
Scottsdale, AZ 85254 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 13, 2017 12:29 PM EDT |
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
Prime Clerk 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dilley ISD
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Montgomery County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o John P. Dillman P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lavaca County
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
La Salle County
711 Navarro, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Karnes City ISD
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Gonzales County
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Cotulla ISD
711 Navarro, Suite 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, as Agent
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Pennsylvania Department of Revenue
Office of the Attorney General c/o Christopher R. Momjian 21 S. 12th Street, 3rd Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19107 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Atascosa County
711 Navarro, Ste. 300
San Antonio, TX 78205 |
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wilmington Trust, National Association , as indenture trustee for the 9.875% Senior Notes Due 2018
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TDL Resources LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Supporting Noteholders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Carla Matulka
|
|
Interested Party
Lexon Insurance Company and Bond Safeguard Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
DIP Term Facility Lenders
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Corporex Companies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | Nuverra Environmental Solutions files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (bankruptcompanynews.com) |
Submitted Mon 05/01/2017 | |