Eagles, Ltd. v. Hotel California Baja, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | R Gary Klausner |
Referred: | Rozella A Oliver |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03276 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 18, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Oct 28, 2017 3:43 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hotel California Baja, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Eagles, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
1. | The Eagles file lawsuit against Hotel California alleging company uses song name for financial gain (washingtonpost.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/03/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
1
pgs
misc
Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
Thu 01/18 11:47 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (iv) |
|
Att: 1 Order | ||
41 | 41
1
pgs
order
Dismissing Case
Thu 01/18 11:46 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Having considered the Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice between the Parties40 , and good cause appearing therefor: IT IS SO ORDERED that the above-captioned action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own attorneys fees and costs. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
stip
Dismiss Case
Wed 01/17 2:30 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Settlement filed by Plaintiff Eagles Merchandising Co. II, Eagles, Ltd..(Jirgal, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
39 | 39
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 12/18 11:24 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Brent Massman, identifying Hotel California Baja, LLC, Grupo Todos Santos Hoteleria SRL, Legendary Properties SRL, Promociones Brento Y Asociados SRL. (Attorney William J Seiter added to party Brent Massman(pty:dft))(Seiter, William) |
|
38 | 38
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/18 11:20 PM
AMENDED ANSWER Answer to Amended Complaint/Petition,34 filed by Defendant Brent Massman. (Seiter, William) |
|
37 | 37
respoth
Amended Answer to Complaint
Mon 12/18 11:14 PM
AMENDED ANSWER Answer to Amended Complaint/Petition,34 filed by Defendant Hotel California Baja, LLC. (Seiter, William) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
36 | 36
service
Summons Issued
Fri 11/17 10:42 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition,34 as to Defendant Brent Massman. (bp) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Summons Request
Thu 11/16 3:49 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,34 filed by Plaintiffs Eagles Merchandising Co. II, Eagles, Ltd.. (Jirgal, Thomas) |
|
34 | 34
othcmp
Amended Complaint/Petition
Thu 11/16 3:43 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Hotel California Baja, LLC, Brent Massman amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 , filed by Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd., Eagles Merchandising Co. II(Attorney Thomas P Jirgal added to party Eagles Merchandising Co. II(pty:pla))(Jirgal, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Reviews | ||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
order
Leave
Wed 11/15 8:43 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) Order Re: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint29 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court grants Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. The Amended Complaint must be filed within five days of the date of this Order. (ah) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Wed 11/08 8:30 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Plaintiff's Motion to File First Amended Complaint29 , calendared for hearing on November 13, 2017, has been taken under submission and off the motion calendar. No appearances by counsel are necessary. The Court will issue a ruling after full consideration of properly submitted pleadings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Reply (Motion related)
Mon 10/30 8:23 PM
REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT 29 filed by Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd..(Jirgal, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Thomas Jirgal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Proposed First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Proposed First Amended Complaint | ||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
respm
Objection/Opposition (Motion related)
Mon 10/23 6:27 PM
Defendant Hotel California's Opposition to Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd.'s Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT 29 filed by Defendant Hotel California Baja, LLC.(Seiter, William) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of William J. Seiter | ||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Leave
Fri 09/29 5:54 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 11/13/2017 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Jirgal, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Thomas Jirgal, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A-Proposed First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A to First Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Protective Order
Fri 09/22 10:50 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver: GRANTED.27 (klg) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
stip
Protective Order
Wed 09/20 3:58 PM
STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by plaintiff Eagles, Ltd..(Wytsma, Laura) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
order
Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only
Tue 08/22 11:34 AM
ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2018 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 5/8/2018 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (ah) |
|
25 | 25
order
Order/Referral to ADR (No 3) (Private Mediator) (ADR-12)
Tue 08/22 11:33 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (ah) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 08/22 11:32 AM
MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2017. Discovery cut-off 2/9/2018. Motions due by 2/23/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2018 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Jury Trial set for 5/8/2018 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. Court Reporter: Sandra MacNeil. (ah) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan
Tue 08/08 11:13 AM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 3 to 5 trial days, filed by Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd... (Wytsma, Laura) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only
Wed 05/31 9:02 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge R. Gary Klausner. A Scheduling Conference has been placed on calendar for August 21, 2017 at 9:00 a.m. The Conference will be held pursuant to F.R.Civ. P. 16(b). Trial counsel must be present and there are no telephonic appearances. Counsel are ordered to file a joint statement providing a brief factual summary of the case, including the claims being asserted. The parties are reminded of their obligations to disclose information and confer on a discovery plan not later than 21 days prior to the scheduling conference, and to file a joint statement with the Court not later than 14 days after they confer, as required by F.R. Civ.P. 26 and the Local Rules of this Court. Failure to comply may lead to the imposition of sanctions. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to give notice of the scheduling conference to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date. (pso) |
|
21 | 21
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Wed 05/31 1:27 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hotel California Baja, LLC, identifying Grupo Hoteleria, S. de R.L. de C.V.; Legendary Properties, S. de R.L. de C.V.. (Seiter, William) |
|
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 05/31 1:21 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Hotel California Baja, LLC.(Attorney William J Seiter added to party Hotel California Baja, LLC(pty:dft))(Seiter, William) |
|
Wednesday, May 24, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 05/24 8:25 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. See Order for details. (sw) |
|
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Tue 05/23 10:37 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2;17-cv-03276 RGK(RAOx). (rn) |
|
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) DECLINED before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program
Mon 05/22 7:02 PM
DECLINED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd.. (Masters, Douglas) |
|
16 | 16
service
Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days)
Mon 05/22 6:57 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd., upon Defendant Hotel California Baja, LLC served on 5/9/2017, answer due 5/30/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon William J. Seiter, counsel for Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. AFFIDAVIT OF DOUGLAS N. MASTERS OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT (Masters, Douglas) |
|
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Proof of Service (subsequent documents)
Fri 05/19 2:12 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by PLAINTIFF Eagles, Ltd., OF NOTICE OF CONSENT FORM served on May 9, 2017. (Masters, Douglas) |
|
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/08 3:55 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that11 Non-Resident Attorney Douglas N. Masters' APPLICATION11 to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd., designating Laura A. Wytsma as local counsel is GRANTED. (See document for complete details) (afe) |
|
13 | 13
order
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 05/08 1:40 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar.IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth K. O'Neill's APPLICATION12 to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd., designating Laura A. Wytsma as local counsel is GRANTED. (See document for complete details) (afe) |
|
Thursday, May 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 05/04 12:19 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth K. O'Neill to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19798040) filed by plaintiff Eagles, Ltd.. (Wytsma, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Certific ate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64)
Thu 05/04 12:05 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Douglas N. Masters to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-19797892) filed by plaintiff Eagles, Ltd.. (Wytsma, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form
Wed 05/03 2:13 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (mz) |
|
Tuesday, May 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Tue 05/02 1:58 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Elisabeth K O'Neill. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) |
|
8 | 8
attorney
Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form
Tue 05/02 1:56 PM
NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Douglas N Masters. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 05/02 1:47 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Hotel California Baja, LLC. (car) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form
Tue 05/02 1:39 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car) |
|
Att: 1 CV-11C | ||
Monday, May 01, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120)
Mon 05/01 6:25 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Eagles, Ltd.. (Wytsma, Laura) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Mon 05/01 6:24 PM
PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd., (Wytsma, Laura) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Mon 05/01 6:22 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd.. (Wytsma, Laura) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Summons Request
Mon 05/01 6:19 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd.. (Wytsma, Laura) |
|
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Mon 05/01 6:16 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19778857 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Eagles, Ltd.. (Attorney Laura A Wytsma added to party Eagles, Ltd.(pty:pla))(Wytsma, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |