Hunter v. HCA et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Jill N Parrish |
Referred: | Dustin B Pead |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00060 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 15, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 30, 2017 3:04 AM MDT |
Defendant
Mark Adams
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patrick Willis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Carla Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeff Stephens
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yasmeen Simonian
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mountainstar Health
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vicky McCall
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Lines
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steve Kier
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Danielle Ihler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Hemmersmeier
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Keith Hancett
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HCA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ed Ehrenberger
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John Diemel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Columbia Ogden Regional Medical Center
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Don Cazel
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Dann Byck
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mindy Boehm
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Board of Trustees
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward G. Hunter
143 E 1900 N
CENTERVILLE, UT 84014 |
Docket last updated: 19 minutes ago |
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
68 | 68
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 03/10 7:58 AM
ORDER DECLINING TO CONSIDER PLAINTIFF'S OBJECTIONS as to 67 Notice of Filing (Objections) filed by Edward G. Hunter. Signed by Judge Jill N. Parrish on 3/9/21. (alf) |
|
Thursday, March 04, 2021 | ||
67 | 67
misc
Notice of Filing
Fri 03/05 2:54 PM
NOTICE OF FILING of Objections to Rulings in documents56 Report and Recommendations and57 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations filed by Plaintiff Edward G. Hunter pro se. (alf) |