Central Grocers, Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-10993 |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2017 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Central Grocers, Inc.
2600 West Haven Avenue
Joliet, IL 60433 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Monday Jun 12, 2017 2:00 PM EDT |
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Food and Commercial Workers Unions and Employers Midwest Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
J.B. Sullivan, Inc. d/b/a Sullivan's Foods
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ice Cream Specialties, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Hugh H. Branch, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
HYG Financial Services, Inc. f/k/a NMHG Financial Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Grimmway Farms
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Giorgio Fresh Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KC Global Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Fresh Express, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dean Foods Entities
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DLC Management Corp.
2029 Century Park East Suite 800
Los Angeles, CA 90067 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Crosset Company, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Commonwealth Edison Company; Constellation NewEnergy, Inc.; Constellation NewEnergy - Gas Division, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chobani, LLC
Chobani, LLC c/o Harris Beach PLLC 333 W. Washington St., Ste. 200
Syracuse, NY 13202 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Chiquita Fresh North America, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mizkan America, Inc.
1661 Feehanville Drive Suite 300
Mount Prospect, IL 60056 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Teamsters Local Union No. 703 Employee Benefit Funds
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Synchrony Bank
PO Box 41021
Norfolk, VA 23541 |
|
Creditor
Social Mecca Inc. d/b/a Brickfish
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Hillshire Brands Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Sage Fruit Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Produce Plus
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
North Bay Produce, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Noosa
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
West Coast Vegetable Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
MLAT LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Tyson Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lamb Weston Sales, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
L&M Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kimberly-Clark Global Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KeHE Food Distributors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
KeHE Distributors, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dietz & Kolodenko Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vision Import Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Norpac Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mars Financial Services
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kimberly-Clark Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jem D International
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jack Tuchten Wholesale Produce Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
General Produce Distributors, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
General Mills, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Caito Foods, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dean Dairy Holdings,LLC
700 Three Galleria Tower 13155 Noel Road, L.B. 13 Attn; Mark H. Ralston, Esquire
Dallas, TX 75240 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
David Oppenheimer & Company I, LLC, The Pictsweet Company, R & C Berndt, Inc. d/b/a Sierra Produce, and Tom Lange Company, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Conopco, Inc. dba Unilever
993 Lenox Drive
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
C.H. Robinson Worldwide, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Brixmor Property Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Anthony Marano Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Welch Foods, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Post Consumer Brands
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United Sugars Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bushman's, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bill's Produce, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Valu Merchandisers Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bank of the West
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Altar Produce, LLC, David Oppenheimer & Company I, LLC, The Pictsweet Company, Berndt, Inc., d/b/a Sierra Produce, Spice World, Inc., Tom Lange Company, Inc., and Wonderful Citrus Ventures, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Worldwide Farms, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Coca-Cola Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Strube Celery & Vegetable Co.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Spiech Farms, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ruby Robinson Co. Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Panama Banana Dist. Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Van Til's Super Market, Inc., Van Til's Super Market, Inc. d/b/a Almira's Bakery, Van Til's Real Estate, LLC, Griffland Center, INc. and Tilland Parntership
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Topco Associates, LLC and Topco Holdings, Inc.
Bayard PA 222 Delaware Avenue PO Box 25130
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Weiss Entities, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United Food & Commercial Workers International Union-Industry Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The J.M. Smucker Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United Food & Commercial Workers International Union Local 1546 ("UFCW")
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Greater Omaha Packing Co., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Forest Park Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Clorox Sales Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Smucker Retail Foods Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bobbie Shier
|
|
Interested Party
North Windham Properties, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Local Unions No. 703, 710 and 142 of the International Brotherhood of Teamsters
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Jewel Food Stores, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Clarence L. Huginnie
|
|
Interested Party
Hormel Foods Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Patrick P. Gill
|
|
Interested Party
Jeffrey M. Chebot
325 Chestnut Street Suite 1300, Constiution Place
Philadelphia, PA 19106 |
|
Interested Party
Best Chicago Meat Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SuperValu, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
PNC Bank, National Association, as Agent
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Kellogg Sales Company
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Attorney
Richard C Cobb
Terminated: 05/09/2017
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP 919 Market Street Suite 1800
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
1. | Cooperative Grocery Wholesaler Central Grocers files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (bankruptcompanynews.com) |
Submitted Mon 05/08/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 9 minutes ago |