NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC. v. FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Juan R Sanchez |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02038 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Oct 30, 2017 6:06 AM EDT |
Cross Claimant
JEFFREY ATKINS
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC
|
|
Cross Defendant
FYRE MEDIA, INC.
|
|
Cross Defendant
WILLIAM (BILLY) MCFARLAND
|
|
Defendant
JEFFREY ATKINS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC
|
|
Defendant
FYRE MEDIA, INC.
|
|
Defendant
WILLIAM (BILLY) MCFARLAND
|
|
Plaintiff
NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Unrepresented Party
FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC
52 LISPENARD STREET TH 1
NEW YORK, NY 10013 |
|
Unrepresented Party
FYRE MEDIA, INC.
111 EIGHTH AVENUE 13TH FLOOR
NEW YORK, NY 10011 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, January 31, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
2
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 01/31 9:44 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC.. (WALTO, CATHERINE) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 12/01 10:03 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZin Courtroom 11A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND DEFAULT HEARING held on 11/1/2017(amas) |
|
Wednesday, November 22, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 11/22 1:08 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Urena re: served Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, and Demand for Jury upon William McFarland by Fed. R. Civ. P 4(e) on November 6, 2017 (HERNDON, THOMAS) |
|
30 | 30
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 11/22 1:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Robert Urena re: served Answer, Affirmative Defenses, Cross-Claims, and Demand for Jury upon Fyre Media, Inc. by Fed. R. Civ. P 4(h) on October 26, 2017 (HERNDON, THOMAS) |
|
Wednesday, November 08, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
5
pgs
respm
Memorandum
Wed 11/08 6:22 PM
Memorandum Letter Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Default re15 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Fyre Festival LLC, Fyre Media, Inc. and William "Billy" McFarland filed by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC..(WALTO, CATHERINE) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Expenses, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Friedman Case | ||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 11/02 2:46 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT DISCOVERY IS DUE BY 1/31/2018. DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS ARE DUE BY 3/7/2018. A TELECONFERENCE TO DISCUSS SETTLEMENT SHALL TAKE PLACE ON 3/22/2018, AT 3:00 PM. MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 3/28/2018. PLAINTIFFS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA IS DUE BY 4/5/2018. DEFENDANTS PRETRIAL MEMORANDA IS DUE BY 4/5/2018. A FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SHALL BE HELD ON 4/10/2018, AT 11:00 AM, IN COURTROOM 11A. THIS MATTER IS IN THE 4/16/2018 TRIAL POOL. FURTHER INFORMATION AND DEADLINES OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 11/1/2017. 11/2/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
27 | 27
trial
Exhibit
Thu 11/02 2:41 PM
EXHIBITS, AS OUTLINED HEREIN. (amas) |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
discov
Discovery Plan
Tue 10/31 3:19 PM
Discovery Plan by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC..(WALTO, CATHERINE) |
|
Monday, October 30, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 10/31 9:18 AM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS STAYED AS TO DEFENDANT FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC, PENDING RESOLUTION OF THE BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS. PLAINTIFF SHALL SUBMIT A WRITTEN STATUS REPORT EVERY 90 DAYS ADVISING THE COURT OF THE STATUS OF FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC'S BANKRUPTCY PROCEEDINGS, WITH THE FIRST SUCH REPORT TO BE SUBMITTED ON 1/29/2018. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/30/2017. 10/31/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO COUNSEL AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/27 4:08 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT JEFFREY ATKIN'S 10/27/17, LETTER REQUEST THAT LOCAL COUNSEL BE PERMITTED TO APPEAR FOR MR.ATKINS AT THE 11/1/17, RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/27/17.10/27/17 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, MAILED.(jl, ) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 10/27 10:22 AM
MOTION to have local counsel appear at R. 16 Conference filed by JEFFREY ATKINS..(SMITH, GARY) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Praecipe/Request
Wed 10/25 2:59 PM
Attach Exhibits A-F to Affidavit of Service for Request for Default, Motion for Default Judgment and Order dated October 5, 2017 by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC.. (WALTO, CATHERINE) |
|
21 | 21
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 10/25 2:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by USPS re: served Request for Default and Motion for Default and Court Order dated October 5, 2017 upon Fyre Festival, Fyre Media and William McFarland by Certified Mail, Return Receipt Requested on 9/22/2017 and 10/11/2017 (WALTO, CATHERINE) |
|
20 | 20
3
pgs
respoth
Memorandum
Wed 10/25 12:38 PM
Memorandum letter brief by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC.. (WALTO, CATHERINE) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Mon 10/23 2:10 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAV VICE ADMISSION OF THOMAS H. HERNDON, JR., ESQUIRE (DOC. NO.18 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/23/2017.10/23/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO THOMAS HERNDON WITH ECF APPLICATION AND E-MAILED. (amas) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Fri 10/20 5:10 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Thomas H. Herndon, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number 0313-12406229.) filed by JEFFREY ATKINS.certificate of service.(SMITH, GARY) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 10/05 3:28 PM
ORDER THAT A RULE 16 CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT SHALL BE HELD ON 11/1/2017, AT 1:30 PM, IN COURTROOM 11A. FURTHER INFORMATION OUTLINED HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 10/5/2017. 10/5/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 10/05 3:29 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to15 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Fyre Festival LLC, Fyre Media, Inc. and William "Billy" McFarland. MOTION HEARING SET FOR 11/1/2017 01:30 PM IN COURTROOM BEFORE HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ. (amas) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Request for Default
Fri 09/22 4:16 PM
Request for Default NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC. against FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC, FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC, FYRE MEDIA, INC., FYRE MEDIA, INC., WILLIAM (BILLY) MCFARLAND. (WALTO, CATHERINE) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Default Judgment
Fri 09/22 4:14 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendants Fyre Festival LLC, Fyre Media, Inc. and William "Billy" McFarland filed by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(WALTO, CATHERINE) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 09/25 1:19 PM
DEFAULT BY FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC, FYRE MEDIA, INC., WILLIAM (BILLY) MCFARLAND FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (amas) |
||
misc
Default Entered
Mon 09/25 1:20 PM
Default Entered (amas) |
||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Fri 09/15 1:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against All Defendants by JEFFREY ATKINS.(SMITH, GARY) |
|
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Order Setting Answer Deadline
Fri 09/15 1:17 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT JEFFREY ATKINS IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 9/15/2017, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/15/2017. 9/15/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 09/13 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GARY NEAL SMITH on behalf of JEFFREY ATKINS, JEFFREY ATKINS (SMITH, GARY) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 09/11 1:09 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL 9/25/2017, TO CAUSE DEFENDANTS' DEFAULTS TO BE ENTERED AND MOVE FOR JUDGMENT, OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY A REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT HAVE NOT BEEN FILED, ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 9/11/2017. 9/11/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 07/18 11:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Brendan Collishaw re: served Summons and Complaint upon Jeffrey Atkins by personal on 05/20/2017 (ENDLER, JESSE) |
|
9 | 9
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 07/18 11:45 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Nelson Carvajal re: served Summons and Complaint upon William McFarland by personal on 05/18/2017 (ENDLER, JESSE) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/14 11:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC. re: Adam Golden served Summons and Complaint upon FYRE MEDIA, INC. by personal. FYRE MEDIA, INC. served on 7/10/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (ENDLER, JESSE) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/14 11:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC. re: Adam Golden served Summons and Complaint upon FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC by personal. FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC served on 7/10/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (ENDLER, JESSE) |
|
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Praecipe/Request
Fri 07/07 9:35 AM
PRAECIPE TO REISSUE SUMMONS by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC.(amas) |
|
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/07 9:36 AM
2 ALIAS Summons Issued as to FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC, FYRE MEDIA, INC.. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL, JESSE M. ENDLER on 7/7/2017 (amas) |
||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/27 3:35 PM
2 ALIAS Summons Issued as to FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC, FYRE MEDIA, INC. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 6/27/2017 (amas) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Praecipe/Request
Fri 06/23 3:58 PM
Reissue Summons by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC.. (ENDLER, JESSE) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Thu 05/18 8:55 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION OF CHRIS VLAHOS, ESQUIRE (DOC. NO.3 ), IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 5/17/2017.5/18/2017 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 05/17 11:17 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Chris Vlahos, Esquire to Appear on behalf of National Event Services, Inc. filed by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC..Certificate of Service.(WALTO, CATHERINE) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, May 05, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 05/05 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CATHERINE N. WALTO on behalf of NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC. (WALTO, CATHERINE) |
|
Wednesday, May 03, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/04 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT against JEFFREY ATKINS, FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC, FYRE MEDIA, INC., WILLIAM (BILLY) MCFARLAND ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE159101.), filed by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC..(jmv, ) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Case Management Track Form, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form | ||
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/04 4:03 PM
Summons Issued as to JEFFREY ATKINS, FYRE FESTIVAL, LLC, FYRE MEDIA, INC., WILLIAM (BILLY) MCFARLAND. Forwarded To: 4 Origs mailed to counsel on 5/3/17 (jmv, ) |
||
misc
Jury Demand
Thu 05/04 4:03 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NATIONAL EVENT SERVICES, INC.. (jmv, ) |