Searchmetrics Inc.
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher S Sontchi |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11032 |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2017 |
Dismissed: | Jul 17, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 18, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 50-99 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Searchmetrics Inc.
1100 Park Place Suite 150
San Mateo, CA 94403 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Thursday Aug 03, 2017 2:02 PM EDT |
Claims Agent
JND Corporate Restructuring
www.JNDLA.com 8269 E. 23rd Avenue, Suite 275
Denver, CO 80238 |
|
Creditor
Ford Motor Credit Company
993 Lenox Drive
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Park Place Realty Holding Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
BrightEdge Technologies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Searchmetrics GmbH
|
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | Searchmetrics files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy in order to resolve a patent dispute (social.techcrunch.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/10/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago |