Texas v. Travis County, Texas et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Sam Sparks |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00425 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 09, 2017 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 03, 2017 4:29 AM CDT |
Defendant
Kathie Tovo
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Richard Wiles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Texas Organizing Project Education Fund
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tom Schmerber
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raul L. Reyes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maverick County, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
League of United Latin American Citizens
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mario A. Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
El Paso County, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of El Cenizo, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ellen Troxclair
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Travis County, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Steve Adler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sabino Renteria
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Leslie Pool
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mexican American Legal Defense and Education Fund
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ann Kitchen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ora Houston
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sally Hernandez
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Elaine Hart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Delia Garza
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jimmy Flannigan
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Austin, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gregorio Casar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alison Alter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Texas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ken Paxton
|
Represented By
|
1. | State of Texas files lawsuit against potential opponents of anti-sanctuary cities law (latimes.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/10/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, January 28, 2019 | ||
78 | 78
appeal
USCA Judgment/Mandate
Wed 01/30 10:40 AM
Certified copy of USCA JUDGMENT/MANDATE Affirming76 Notice of Appeal (E-Filed) filed by Texas, Ken Paxton. (dm) |