Cumberland Systems LLC v. True Media, LLC
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert W Schroeder, III |
Referred: | K Nicole Mitchell |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00277 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 24, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 04, 2017 5:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
True Media, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Cumberland Systems LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Wed 07/26 1:17 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mll, ) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Mon 07/24 1:09 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Plaintiff's claims against the Defendant are dismissed with prejudice and final judgment is entered in this case. All relief not previously granted is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/24/17. (mll, ) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order
Mon 07/24 1:06 PM
ORDER granting8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Cumberland Systems LLC. This action is voluntarily dismissed with prejudice. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III on 07/24/17. (mll, ) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Sealed Motion
Wed 07/19 3:29 PM
ORDER granting7 Sealed Motion to Stay. All unreached deadlines as between Cumberland Systems LLC and True Media, LLC are stayed until 8 16-2017 so that they may document the agreement and submit appropriate dismissal papers. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 07/19/17. (mll, ) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 07/19 12:47 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cumberland Systems LLC(Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Sealed Motion
Mon 07/17 5:10 PM
Agreed SEALED MOTION to Stay All Deadlines and Notice of Settlement by Cumberland Systems LLC.(Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Thu 07/06 3:59 PM
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint6 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for True Media, LLC to 7/20/2017. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Filed by Plaintiff on behalf of Defendant.)( mll, ) |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Wed 07/05 1:43 PM
Joint Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cumberland Systems LLC and True Media, LLC.( Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
text
Application Granted for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Thu 06/01 10:59 AM
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint5 is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for True Media, LLC to 7/5/2017. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension. (Filed by Plaintiff on behalf of Defendant.)( mll, ) |
||
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
text
Unopposed Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint
Tue 05/30 2:11 PM
Joint Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Cumberland Systems LLC and True Media, LLC.( Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/09 11:30 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to True Media, LLC, and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) |
|
3 | 3
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Tue 05/09 10:38 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, ) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Tue 05/09 10:21 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
notice
Notice of Magistrate Availability
Tue 05/09 10:42 AM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (mll, ) |
||
Monday, May 08, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/08 10:19 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against True Media, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6284669.), filed by Cumberland Systems LLC.(Chaudhari, Papool) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A | ||
misc
Jury Demand
Tue 05/09 10:05 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Cumberland Systems LLC. (mll, ) |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 05/09 10:06 AM
Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell added. (mll, ) |