Jones v. City and County of Denver et al
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Christine M Arguello |
Referred: | S Kato Crews |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01131 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1983 Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 08, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 21, 2020 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 04, 2017 3:39 AM MDT |
Defendant
Gregory (I) Black
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jose (I) Manriquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deon Lamon Jones
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Gregory Black
Terminated: 11/01/2017
|
|
Defendant
City and County of Denver
Terminated: 11/01/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jose Manriquez
Terminated: 11/01/2017
|
|
Defendant
Damon Roman
Terminated: 11/01/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Damon (I) Roman
Terminated: 11/01/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Man files racial profiling lawsuit against Denver officers (9news.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/10/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Thursday, May 21, 2020 | ||
103 | 103
order
Judgment
Thu 05/21 12:28 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Jose Manriquez and Gregory Black and against Plaintiff Deon Lamon Jones re:102 Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First, Second, and Third Claims for Relief Consistent with the April2 3, 2020 Order and Judgment of the Court of Appeals. This case is closed. Entered by the Clerk on 5/21/2020. (swest) |
|
102 | 102
2
pgs
order
Order
Thu 05/21 12:20 PM
ORDER Granting65 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's First, Second, and Third Claims for Relief Consistent with the April 23, 2020 Order and100 Judgment of the Court of Appeals. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/21/2020. (swest) |
|
Friday, May 15, 2020 | ||
101 | 101
appeal
USCA Mandate
Fri 05/15 10:57 AM
MANDATE of USCA as to100 USCA Order and Judgment,93 Notice of Appeal filed by Gregory (I) Black, Jose (I) Manriquez : (USCA Case No. 19-1144 (evana, ) |