Jones et al v. Takeda Pharmaceutical Co Ltd et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Case #: | 6:17-mc-00096 |
Case Filed: | May 09, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 25, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Judgment Adopting Report and Recommendations Order on Sealed Motion Order on Report and Recommendations
Thu 05/25 11:14 AM
JUDGMENT ADOPTING Report and Recommendations2 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the1 Motion to Approve Settlement is hereby GRANTED, pursuant to the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Hanna, which is hereby adopted. Signed by Judge Rebecca F Doherty on 5/25/2017. (crt,Guidry, C) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Report and Recommendations
Fri 05/12 2:19 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 SEALED MOTION Approving Settlement Amount, Contingency Fee and Advanced Costs filed by Bonnie Sue Morris, Connie Jones, Cathy Darlene King, Tammy Mederios, Tony Ray Hooper, Buelgh Inez Boaz. This Court having considered all submissions made, I recommend to the Court that the Motion be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 5/21/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 5/11/2017. (crt,Alexander, E) |
|
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Sealed Motion (Sealed Pleading)
Tue 05/09 4:42 PM
SEALED MOTION Approving Settlement Amount, Contingency Fee and Advanced Costs by Buelgh Inez Boaz, Tony Ray Hooper, Connie Jones, Cathy Darlene King, Tammy Mederios, Bonnie Sue Morris.(Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Buelgh Inez Boaz(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Tony Ray Hooper(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Connie Jones(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Cathy Darlene King(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Tammy Mederios(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick C Morrow added to party Bonnie Sue Morris(pty:pla))(aty,Morrow, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Attorney Verification, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed order | ||
misc
Electronic Payment of Miscellaneous Case Filing Fee
Tue 05/09 4:42 PM
ELECTRONIC PAYMENT of Miscellaneous Case filing fee by Buelgh Inez Boaz, Tony Ray Hooper, Connie Jones, Cathy Darlene King, Tammy Mederios, Bonnie Sue Morris. ( Filing Fee: $47, receipt number 0536-3360758) . (aty,Morrow, Patrick) |