Gillard et al v. Good Earth Power AZ LLC et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | Douglas L Rayes |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-01368 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | May 04, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 24, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Oct 31, 2017 2:29 AM MST |
Counter Claimant
ZR FEC Limited
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Jason Rosamond
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Maya Minkova
|
Represented By
|
Counter Claimant
Good Earth Power AZ LLC
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Darren Gurner
|
Represented By
|
Counter Defendant
Martin Gillard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alawi Zawawi
|
|
Defendant
Good Earth Power Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FEC Logging USA LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ZR FEC Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jason Rosamond
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maya Minkova
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Good Earth Power AZ LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darren Gurner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Martin Gillard
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Concord Blue USA Incorporated
Terminated: 06/01/2017
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Concord Blue Eagar LLC
Terminated: 06/01/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit filed against Good Earth Power AZ by two workers who allegedly did not receive promised salaries (azdailysun.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/25/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM MST |
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
125 | 125
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions
Fri 05/24 3:12 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Court APPROVES the Parties Settlement Agreement (filed under seal). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Parties'121 Joint Motion is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorneys' fees, costs and expenses, except as expressly provided in the Settlement Agreement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all scheduled matters in this case are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case without further order from the Court. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/24/19. (GMP) |
|
124 | 124
misc
Sealed Document
Fri 05/24 10:23 AM
Sealed Exhibit (Settlement Agreement) to121 Motion to Approve Settlement and for Dismissal by Martin Gillard. (MAP) |
|
123 | 123
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document
Fri 05/24 10:21 AM
ORDER granting122 Motion to Seal. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to file under seal the Settlement Agreement, which is lodged at Doc.120 . Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 5/24/19. (MAP) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
122 | 122
motion
Seal Document
Thu 05/23 4:49 PM
Joint MOTION to Seal Document Exhibit to the Joint Motion to Approve Settlement and for Dismissal by Martin Gillard, Darren Gurner.(Badoux, Laurent) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
121 | 121
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 05/23 4:41 PM
Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement and for Dismissal by Martin Gillard, Darren Gurner.(Badoux, Laurent) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Text of Proposed Order | ||
120 | 120
respoth
Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)
Thu 05/23 4:27 PM
SEALED LODGED Proposed Settlement Agreement. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by Martin Gillard, Darren Gurner. (Badoux, Laurent) |
|
Tuesday, May 21, 2019 | ||
119 | 119
minutes
Telephone Conference 1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)
Tue 05/21 2:13 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Douglas L Rayes: Telephone Conference held on 5/21/2019. After hearing from the parties, the Court directs counsel for plaintiffs to have the exhibits to defense by 10:00 AM on 5/22/19. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Laurent Badoux for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by Amanda Newman for Defendants. (Court Reporter Jennifer Pancratz.) Hearing held 2:00 PM to 2:04 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) |
|
118 | 118
order
~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 05/21 1:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 5/21/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Douglas L Rayes. Counsel for Defendants shall make the necessary arrangements for the conference call. All parties participating in the conference call shall do so via a landline only. The use of cellular phones will not be permitted. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MMO) |