|
GPO
Jun 02 2017
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Citizens for Clean Energy CV-17-30-GF-BMM is designated as the lead case, to which all filings shall henceforth be made. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS AND DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/2/2017. (MMS) Modified on 6/2/2017 to add case number (MMS).
|
|
GPO
Jun 02 2017
ORDER: Plaintiffs have moved for admission of Elizabeth Rumsey to appear pro hac vice in this case with Roger M. Sullivan, of McGarvey, Heberling, Sullivan & Lacey, P.C. to act as local counsel. Ms. Rumseys application appears to be in compliance with L.R. 83.1(d). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: Plaintiff's14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED, subject to the following conditions: SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/2/2017. (ACC)
|
|
GPO
Jun 05 2017
ORDER granting 20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bill Grantham for Plaintiffs. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 6/19/2017. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/5/2017. (Copy mailed to counsel Grantham) (MMS)
|
|
GPO
Jul 10 2017
ORDER granting (37) Motion to Intervene as to National Mining Association in case 4:17-cv-00030-BMM Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/10/2017. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (MMS)
|
|
GPO
Jul 10 2017
ORDER granting (39) Motion to Intervene regarding the State of Montana in case 4:17-cv-00030-BMM Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/10/2017. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (MMS)
|
|
GPO
Jul 25 2017
ORDER granting 34 Motion to Intervene regarding the State of Wyoming. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/25/2017. (MMS)
|
|
GPO
Jun 21 2018
2-BMM, (Copy of Order mailed to PHV Counsel Templeton, Counsel Weinstock is a registered user) (MMS) Modified on 6/21/2018 to correct name of attorney in docket text (MMS).ORDER granting (103) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Templeton ; granting (104) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Weinstock in case 4:17-cv-00030-BMM; granting (85) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Mark Templeton ; granting (86) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Robert Weinstock in case 4:17-cv-00042-BMM. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 7/6/2018. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/21/2018. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-0004
|
|
GPO
Jul 23 2018
ORDER: The parties shall comply with the following deadlines and word counts: Federal Defendants to certify, serve, and lodge the second revised administrative record 7/11/18, Opening Brief of Plaintiff in CV-17-30 is 7/27/18, Opening Brief of Plaintiff in CV-17-42 is 7/27/18, Brief of Amicus Curiae Professor Michael Greenstone (5,000 words) 8/3/2018, Federal Defendants' Cross-Motion and Opposition Brief (13,000 words) 9/5/2018, Intervenor-Defendants State of Wyoming and State of Montana's Joint Cross-Motion and Opposition Brief(7,500 words) 9/19/18, Intervenor-Defendant National Mining Association'sCross-Motion and Opposition Brief 9/19/18, Opposition and Reply Brief of Plaintiff in CV -17-30 is 10/16/2018, Opposition and Reply Brief of Plaintiff in CV-17-42 is 10/16/2018, Federal Defendants' Reply Brief 11/16/2018, Intervenor-Defendants State of Wyoming and State of Montana's Reply Brief 12/3/2018, Intervenor-Defendant National Mining Association's Reply Brief 12/3/2018.Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment is set for 12/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/23/2018. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (MMS)
|
|
GPO
Apr 19 2019
ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 97 and 99 in CV-17-42-GF-BMM; and 115 and 117 in CV-17-30-GF-BMM are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. It is further ORDERED that Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenors' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment 105, 107, 109 in CV-17-42-GF-BMM; and 123, 125, 127 in CV-17-30-GF-BMM are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Entry of judgment will follow the imposition of a remedy in accordance with the above Order. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/19/2019. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (MMS)
|
|
GPO
Jul 31 2019
ORDER: The Court deems it appropriate to postpone a remedies ruling until after Federal Defendants' completion of their NEPA review. The Court's postponement of a remedies ruling does not foreclose Plaintiffs' ability to challenge the adequacy of Federal Defendants' NEPA review after its completion. The parties shall reserve their rights set forth in the Court's 141 Summary Judgment Order to file briefs within the word limits determined by the Court. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/31/2019. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (SLR)
|
|
GPO
Mar 26 2020
ORDER granting (157) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for attorney James Kaste in case 4:17-cv-00030-BMM; granting (138) Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 4:17-cv-00042-BMM. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 4/17/2020. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/26/2020. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (MMS) Modified on 3/26/2020 to regenerate order to Mr. Kaste (MMS).
|
|
GPO
May 22 2020
ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs' requested relief identified in their 115 117 Motions for Summary Judgment and 147 153 Briefs on Remedies is DENIED. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and enter judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/22/2020. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (SLR)
|
|
GPO
May 22 2020
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs requested relief in their Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 115, 117) and Briefs on Remedies (Docs. 147, 153) is DENIED. (SLR)
|
|
GPO
Jun 03 2021
ORDER denying (199) Motion to Stay in case 4:17-cv-00030-BMM; denying (174) Motion to Stay in case 4:17-cv-00042-BMM. The current Scheduling Order 198 remains in effect. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/3/2021. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (MMS)
|
|
GPO
Aug 12 2022
ORDER: Plaintiffs Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 202 & 204) is GRANTED, IN PART, AND DENIED AS MOOT, IN PART. Federal Defendants, State Intervenors, and NMAs Motions for Summary Judgment (Docs. 219, 223, & 225) and NMAs Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 210) are DENIED. SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 8/12/2022. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (SLR)
|
|
GPO
Oct 11 2022
ORDER; The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and enter judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/11/2022. Associated Cases: 4:17-cv-00030-BMM, 4:17-cv-00042-BMM (TLO)
|
|
GPO
Oct 11 2022
ORDER; The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case and enter judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/11/2022. (TLO)
|