elliott v. Buffalo City School District et al
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | William K Sessions III |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-00397 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 10, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 10, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 06, 2017 4:24 AM EST |
Defendant
Crystal Boling-Barton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Byshop Elliott
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Buffalo City School District
Terminated: 10/05/2017
|
Represented By
|
1. | Lawsuit settled over alleged discrimintation against LGBTQ students at McKinley High (buffalonews.com) |
Submitted Tue 09/05/2017 | |
2. | NYCLU files Lawsuit against Buffalo City School District alleging unequal treatment of LGBTQ students (artvoice.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/11/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Transcript
Mon 05/07 8:16 AM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/10/18, before Judge Sessions. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle L. McLaughlin, RPR, Telephone number 716-332-3560. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 5/29/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/7/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/6/2018. (SG) |
|
Tuesday, April 10, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Judgment
Tue 04/10 4:42 PM
JUDGMENT that Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss is granted and this case is dismissed. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 4/10/2018. (KLH) |
|
29 | 29
14
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion to Expedite
Tue 04/10 4:34 PM
OPINION AND ORDER granting19 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot,23 Motion to Stay; and denying as moot,24 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Hon. William K. Sessions III on 4/10/2018. (KLH) |
|
28 | 28
minutes
Oral Argument ~Util - Motions Submitted
Tue 04/10 3:41 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. William K. Sessions III: Oral Argument held on 4/10/2018. Parties proceed to argument. Court reserves decision. Motions Submitted: 19 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Crystal Boling-Barton, Without Prejudice, Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) . Court declines to hear argument on motion to stay; Court will issue decision before a purported deposition scheduled for Friday. APPEARANCES: R. Hodgson (pltf); P. Mackey and R. Boreanaz (deft Boling-Barton); J. Moore (deft Bflo City Sch Dist). (Court Reporter FTR Gold.) (GAI) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 04/05 12:25 PM
Notice: Oral Argument set for 4/10/2018 at 02:30 PM before Hon. William K. Sessions III. Location: Cattaraugus Courtroom (7 West) (JMM) |
||
Tuesday, April 03, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Tue 04/03 12:01 PM
RESPONSE in Support re24 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Consideration of his Motion for a Brief Stay of Discovery in Light of Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing on April 10 and Depositions of Counsel Scheduled for April 12-13 ,23 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Motion for a Brief Stay of Discovery in Light of Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing on April 10 and Depositions of Counsel Scheduled for April 12-13 filed by Buffalo City School District. (Moore, Joel) |
|
26 | 26
misc
Declaration
Tue 04/03 9:33 AM
DECLARATION signed by Robert L. Boreanaz re23 MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Motion for a Brief Stay of Discovery in Light of Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing on April 10 and Depositions of Counsel Scheduled for April 12-13 filed by Crystal Boling-Barton Declaration in Opposition filed by Crystal Boling-Barton.(Boreanaz, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Memorandum of Law in Opposition | ||
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Declaration
Mon 03/26 9:45 AM
DECLARATION signed by Robert L. Boreanaz re24 MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Consideration of his Motion for a Brief Stay of Discovery in Light of Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing on April 10 and Depositions of Counsel Scheduled for April 12-13 filed by Crystal Boling-Barton Declaration in Opposition filed by Crystal Boling-Barton. (Boreanaz, Robert) |
|
Friday, March 23, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Expedite
Fri 03/23 1:03 PM
MOTION to Expedite Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Consideration of his Motion for a Brief Stay of Discovery in Light of Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing on April 10 and Depositions of Counsel Scheduled for April 12-13 by Byshop Elliott.(Hodgson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expedite Consideration of Plaintiff's Motion for a Brief Stay of Discovery, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Motion for a Brief Stay of Discovery in Light of Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing on April 10 and Depositions of Counsel Scheduled for April 12-13, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Hodgson Affirmation in Support of Plaintiff's Motion | ||
23 | 23
motion
Stay
Fri 03/23 12:59 PM
MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Motion for a Brief Stay of Discovery in Light of Pending Motion to Dismiss Hearing on April 10 and Depositions of Counsel Scheduled for April 12-13 by Byshop Elliott.(Hodgson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affirmation of Robert Hodgson in support of the Plaintiff's Motion for a Brief Stay of Discovery | ||
utility
E-Filing Notification
Fri 03/23 10:13 AM
E-Filing Notification regarding22 Letter. The assigned judge does not accept e-filed letter motions. ACTION REQUIRED: Reformat the document and re-file using the motion event. (SG) |
||
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Stay
Thu 03/22 6:15 PM
MOTION to Stay Plaintiff's Letter Motion Requesting Brief Stay of Discovery Pending April 10 Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss by Byshop Elliott.(Hodgson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Affirmation of Robert Hodgson in support of the Plaintiff's Letter Request to Stay Discovery (with exhibits) | ||
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Reply/Response
Wed 03/14 12:31 PM
REPLY/RESPONSE to re19 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Crystal Boling-Barton, Without Prejudice, Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) ,20 Declaration,, PLAINTIFF'S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF HIS MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT CRYSTAL BOLING-BARTON, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO RULE 41(a)(2) filed by Byshop Elliott.(Hodgson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Supplemental Affirmation of Robert Hodgson in Support of Plaintiff's Motion | ||
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Declaration
Wed 03/07 2:58 PM
DECLARATION signed by Patrick J. Mackey, Esq. re19 MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Crystal Boling-Barton, Without Prejudice, Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) filed by Crystal Boling-Barton in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Crystal Boling-Barton.(Mackey, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Voluntary Dismissal | ||
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Dismiss
Wed 02/21 2:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Crystal Boling-Barton, Without Prejudice, Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2) by Byshop Elliott.(Hodgson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Claims Against Defendant Crystal Boling-Barton, Without Prejudice, Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(2), | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affirmation of Robert Hodgson in Support of the Plaintiff's Motion, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
cmp
Crossclaim Amended Answer to Complaint
Fri 02/09 11:02 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to COMPLAINT WITH , CROSSCLAIM against Buffalo City School District by Crystal Boling-Barton. (Mackey, Patrick) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Vacate Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 02/05 1:13 PM
ORDER granting as unopposed13 Motion for Leave to File; granting as unopposed13 Motion to Amend or Correct; granting as unopposed15 Motion to Vacate14 Stipulation and Order ; denying as moot16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply.. Signed by Hon. William K. Sessions III on 02/05/18. (EE) |
|
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 11/03 4:29 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Co-Defendant Crystal Boling-Barton's Motion to Vacate by Buffalo City School District.(Moore, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Attorney Declaration | ||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Vacate
Fri 10/20 1:58 PM
MOTION to Vacate Order of Dismissal granted 10.04.17 by Crystal Boling-Barton.(Mackey, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A - Order of Dismissal, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit B - Defendant's motion papers, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit C - Complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit D - Answer, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit E - Proposed Amended Answer | ||
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 10/05 8:35 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER for Settlement and Dismissal of defendant Buffalo City School District. Signed by Hon. William K. Sessions III on 10/4/17. (SG) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Leave to File Document Amend/Correct
Thu 09/28 3:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to File , MOTION to Amend/Correct Answer by Crystal Boling-Barton.(Mackey, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex A to Declaration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex B to Declaration, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex C to Declaration, | ||
Att: 5 Memorandum in Support | ||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Settlement Agreement
Fri 09/01 12:36 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT between the Plaintiff and the Defendant Buffalo City School District and PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to the Defendant Buffalo City School District by Byshop Elliott. (Hodgson, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/19 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Boreanaz on behalf of Crystal Boling-Barton (Boreanaz, Robert) |
|
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/19 1:53 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Crystal Boling-Barton.(Mackey, Patrick) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/19 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick James Mackey on behalf of Crystal Boling-Barton (Mackey, Patrick) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 07/10 1:37 PM
ORDER granting as unopposed5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Hon. William K. Sessions III on 07/10/17. (EE) |
|
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/10 12:35 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Crystal Boling-Barton on June 21, 2017, filed by Byshop Elliott. (Hodgson, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
adr
ADR Plan
Wed 07/05 1:10 PM
ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/30 3:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Buffalo City School District.(Moore, Joel) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 06/09 3:52 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Buffalo City School District.(Moore, Joel) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/09 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joel Clarence Moore on behalf of Buffalo City School District (Moore, Joel) |
|
Thursday, June 08, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 06/08 6:18 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Buffalo City School District on May 11, 2017, filed by Byshop Elliott. (Hodgson, Robert) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/11 11:15 AM
Summons Issued as to Crystal Boling-Barton, Buffalo City School District. (SG) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 05/11 11:10 AM
Case assigned to Hon. William K. Sessions, III. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG) |
||
adr
Automatic Referral to Mediation
Thu 05/11 11:10 AM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG) |
||
notice
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge
Thu 05/11 11:10 AM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG) |
||
Wednesday, May 10, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
12
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/10 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-2782271, filed by byshop elliott.(Hodgson, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons: for defendants Buffalo City School District and Crystal Boling-Barton |