Marsh Supermarkets Holding, LLC
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Brendan Linehan Shannon |
Case #: | 1:17-bk-11066 |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Apr 20, 2021 |
Plan Confirmed: | Jun 11, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $0 to $50,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Marsh Supermarkets Holding, LLC
401 Towne Centre Drive
Hillsborough, NJ 08844 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Friday Jan 18, 2019 12:37 PM EST |
Attorney
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Claims Agent
Prime Clerk LLC
www.primeclerk.com 830 Third Avenue 9th Floor
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
86th and Ditch Road Realty Company, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Amrit, Inc.
3360 W 16th St
Indianapolis, IN 46222 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Katherine Maude Anderson
807 Warrington Ct
Indianapolis, IN 46234 |
|
Creditor
Axis FC, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
B-Marsh LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Barb Investment Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bottling Group, LLC and its affiliates and subsidiaries, opeating as Pepsi Beverages Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
CVS Pharmacy, Inc. and its wholly owned subsidiary Hook-SupeRx, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carmel LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Carter Development Corporation
828 E. Jefferson Street
Tipton, IN 46072 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Central States Southeast and Southwest Areas Pension Fund
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
DR-Marsh LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dee Headley, Cushman & Wakefield, as court-appointed receiver for MSI Crosspoint Indianapolis Grocery, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dee Headley, Cushman & Wakefield, as court-appointed receiver for MSI Franklin Indianapolis Grocery, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dee Headley, Cushman & Wakefield, as court-appointed receiver for MSI Walnut Street Hartford Grocery, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dee Headley, Cushman & Wakefield, as court-appointed receiver for MSI West 38 Street Grocery, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dee Headley, Cushman & Wakefield, as court-appointed receiver for Yorktown Grocery Management, LLC and DEEM, LLC,
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Patrick J. Donahoe
2409 S. 9th Street
Lafayette, IN 47909 |
|
Creditor
Uniqueka Dorsey
10181 Dedham Drive
Indianapolis, IN 46229 |
|
Creditor
Duke Energy Indiana, LLC and Duke Energy Ohio, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ecolab Inc.
4650 North Port Washington Rd.
Milwaukee, WI 53212 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Mark Engle
7751 Cardinal Cove N
Indianapolis, IN 46256 |
|
Creditor
Frito-Lay North America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
GP-CM Lockerbie Partners, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pamela Hardin
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Russell Hardin
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
IBM Corporation
|
|
Creditor
Indiana Michigan Power Company d/b/a American Electric Power; Ohio Power Company d/b/a American Electric Power
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Iron Mountain Information Management, LLC
One Federal Street
Boston, MA 02110 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Joshen Paper and Packaging Co.
Ulmer & Berne LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
KRG Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kellogg Sales Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Zandra Kestenman
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kite West 86th Street, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Lafayette Station LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
MSI Washington Street Kokomo Grocery, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Dennis L. McDaniel
3552 W. 79th Street
Indianapolis, IN 46268 |
|
Creditor
David F. Miller
531 Sunblest Blvd. S.
Fishers, IN 46038 |
|
Creditor
New Wabash Village, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Shelley A. Noel
906 W. Linden Ave.
Logansport, IN 46947 |
|
Creditor
O'Malia Investment Co., LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
Office of Chief Counsel 1200 K Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
PepsiCo, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Phillip Edison & Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Phillip Edison Limited Partnership
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
James A. Pitner
5073 Ashbrook Dr.
Noblesville, IN 46062 |
|
Creditor
Stephen Ramsey
|
|
Creditor
Realty Income Corporation
|
|
Creditor
Rug Doctor, LLC
|
|
Creditor
SHARP ELECTRONICS CORPORATION
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Spirit MA Indianapolis IN, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Stoner Bunting Advertising, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Chubb Companies
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Topco Associates, LLC and Topco Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
United States/USAO
U.S. Attorney's Office 1007 N. Orange Street Suite 700
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
VSF Wabash Indiana Property LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kenneth Waitt
350 Morse Landing
Cicero, IN 46034 |
|
Creditor
West Coast Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bottling Group, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
CIP Two, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bobbie Chambers
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cindy Chambers
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Danari Muncie Plaza, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Delaware County, Indiana
|
|
Interested Party
Diversified Investment Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Keith A. Foster
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
GPM Southeast, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Michele Ann Graves
|
|
Interested Party
Hilco Merchant Resources, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Irvington Plaza Associates
|
|
Interested Party
JT Grocery Consulting, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Zandra Kestenman
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
KeyBank National Association
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MSI East 116th Street Carmel Portfolio, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MSI East 96th Street Fishers Portfolio, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MSI Forest Avenue Marion Portfolio, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MSI Fox Road Indianapolis Portfolio, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MSI Kinser Pike Bloomington Portfolio, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MSI North Broadway Anderson Portfolio, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MSI North Michigan Road Zionsville Portfolio, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MSI South Tillotson Muncie Portfolio, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
MSI West US 36 Pendleton Portfolio, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Marsh Group Finance, LLC and Marsh Group Finance II, LLC (Junior Noteholder)
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Carol Niec
7909 W. Abercrombie Drive
Muncie, IN 47304 |
|
Interested Party
Prudential Bank & Trust Company, FSB Prudential Retirement
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Prudential Retirement Insurance and Annuity Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
SBMC Ann Arbor, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Southern Glazer's Wine and Spirits
|
|
Interested Party
State of Ohio, Bureau of Workers' Compensation
|
|
Interested Party
Supervalu, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Topvalco, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
United States Department of Labor
|
|
Interested Party
Michelle Waitt
350 Morse Landing
Cicero, IN 46034 |
|
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Wells Fargo Vendor Financial Services, LLC fka GE Capital c/o Ricoh USA Program, fka IKON Financial Services
|
|
Liquidating Trustee
Alfred T. Giuliano
Giuliano Miller & Co., LLC Berlin Business Park 140 Bradford Drive
West Berlin, NJ 08091 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Clear Thinking Group LLC
|
|
Other Prof.
Peter J. Solomon Company
|
|
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Represented By
|
1. | Marsh Supermarkets files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (indystar.com) |
Submitted Thu 05/11/2017 | |