Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Steve C Jones
Case #: 1:17-cv-01705
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 11, 2017
Terminated:May 12, 2017
Last checked: Monday May 15, 2017 10:46 AM EDT
Defendant
Gregory Dozier
Represented By
Sabrina D. Graham
Attorney General'S Office-Atl
contact info
Beth Attaway Burton
Office Of State Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Other Unknown Employees and Agents
Represented By
Sabrina D. Graham
Attorney General'S Office-Atl
contact info
Beth Attaway Burton
Office Of State Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Warden Eric Sellers
Represented By
Sabrina D. Graham
Attorney General'S Office-Atl
contact info
Beth Attaway Burton
Office Of State Attorney General
contact info
Plaintiff
J. W. Ledford, Jr.
Represented By
John D. Cline
Jones Day-Sf
contact info
Mary Elizabeth Wells
Law Office Of M. Elizabeth Wells
contact info
Gerald Wesley King, Jr.
Federal Defender Program Inc.-Atl
contact info

Docket last updated: 08/18/2017 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, July 21, 2017
25 25 appeal USCA Order Fri 4:35 PM
Certified copy of USCA ORDER: Appellant Ledford's death has mooted16 Notice of Appeal filed by J. W. Ledford, Jr. Therefore, the Clerk is directed to close this case. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 17-12167 (pjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2017
24 24 appeal Appeal Remark Fri 7:58 AM
Appeal notice from USCA via USSC DENYING Certiorari re:16 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 17-12167 PP. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2017
23 23 appeal USCA Order Wed 7:57 AM
Certified copy of USCA ORDER: PUBLISHED ORDER: A petition for initial hearing en banc having been filed, a judge in active service having requested a poll on the petition, and a majority of the judges in active service having voted against it, the petition is DENIED. The motion for a stay of execution is DENIED and the States motion to file a response to the plaintiff-appellants sur-reply is DENIED AS MOOT re:16 Notice of Appeal filed by J. W. Ledford, Jr. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 17-12167 PP. (pjm)
Related: [-]
22 22 appeal USCA Order Tue 11:39 AM
Certified copy of USCA ORDER: Motion to File Sur-reply in Support of his Motion for Stay of Execution to the En Banc Court filed by Appellant J. W. Ledford, Jr. is GRANTED re:16 Notice of Appeal filed by J. W. Ledford, Jr. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 17-12167 PP. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2017
21 21 appeal USCA Order Tue 7:52 AM
Certified copy of USCA ORDER: PUBLISHED ORDER: Under a sentence of death, J.W. Ledford, Jr. has his execution scheduled for Tuesday, May 16, 2017, at 7:00 p.m. On Thursday, May 11, 2017, a mere five days before his execution, Ledford challenged Georgia's method of his execution by filing a civil complaint under 42 U.S.C. 1983... EMERGENCY MOTION FOR A STAY DENIED re:16 Notice of Appeal filed by J. W. Ledford, Jr. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 17-12167 PP. (pjm)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Filing Mon 12:00 PM
NOTICE Of Filing Corrected/Signed Expert Declaration by J. W. Ledford, Jr re1 Complaint,(King, Gerald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Dr. James S. Williams
Friday, May 12, 2017
19 19 appeal USCA Acknowledgment Fri 6:33 PM
USCA Acknowledgment of16 Notice of Appeal filed by J. W. Ledford, Jr. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 17-12167 P. (pjm)
Related: [-]
18 18 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Fri 6:08 PM
Transmission of Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal, Judgment, Order and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:16 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Fri 6:05 PM
NOTICE Of Filing of NOA Transmittal Letter re:16 Notice of Appeal. (pjm)
Related: [-]
16 16 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 5:58 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to15 Clerk's Judgment,14 Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, Order on Motion to Dismiss, by J. W. Ledford, Jr. Transcript Order Form due on 5/26/2017. (Wells, Mary)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Judgment - Clerk Fri 5:39 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants against Plaintiff. (pdw)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion for TRO Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 5:37 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's3 Motion for TRO or Injunction Preventing Petitioner's Execution by Lethal Injection or, Alternatively and Injunction Pending Appeal; denying Plaintiff's4 Motion for TRO or, Alternatively, an Injunction Preventing Defendants from Discontinuing Plaintiff's Medication. The Court sua sponte GRANTS Ledford leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/12/2017. (pdw)
Related: [-]
13 13 respm Response (Non-Motion) Fri 3:14 PM
RESPONSE re11 Pre-Answer and Motion to Dismiss Complaint and12 Response to Motion and REPLY in Support of3 Motion for TRO filed by J. W. Ledford, Jr. (Wells, Mary) Modified on 5/12/2017 to edit text and add hyperlink (rjs)
Related: [-]
12 12 respm Response to Motion Fri 12:51 PM
RESPONSE re3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Permanent Injunction and4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Eric Sellers.(Burton, Beth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A
11 11 motion Dismiss Fri 12:28 PM
PRE-ANSWER MOTION TO DISMISS and RESPONSE to1 COMPLAINT by Eric Sellers and Gregory Dozier .(Burton, Beth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Modified on 5/12/2017 to change event type, edit text and filer information (rjs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment A,
Att: 2 Attachment B
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 8:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sabrina D. Graham on behalf of Eric Sellers (Graham, Sabrina)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Beth Attaway Burton on behalf of Eric Sellers (Burton, Beth)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order ruling on IFP Fri 8:19 AM
Duplicative Entry Filed in Error ORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis and this action may proceed without payment of docket costs or the costs of any transcripts. It is further ORDERED that this Court does not find that the instant action is frivolous or malicious and this matter is ALLOWED TO PROCEED as any other civil action. As Plaintiff is represented, service of process shall be effected by or at the direction of counsel of record and service by the United States Marshal service shall not be required. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 5/11/2017. (rjs) Modified on 5/12/2017 to edit text (rjs)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Order Fri 8:16 AM
Duplicative Entry Filed in Error ORDER re3 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Injunction Preventing Petitioner's Execution by Lethal Injection or, Alternatively, an Injunction Pending Appeal and4 Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, Alternatively, an Injunction Preventing Defendants From Discontinuing Plaintiff's Medication. The Defendants are ORDERED to file a response brief on or before Friday, May 12, 2017 at 4:30 p.m.. Any reply brief by Plaintiff thereto must be filed no later than Saturday, May 13, 2017 at 4:30 p.m. If Plaintiff should elect not to file a reply brief, counsel is directed to file notice to that effect as early as is practicable. Signed by Judge Steve C Jones on 5/11/2017. (rjs) Modified on 5/12/2017 to edit text (rjs)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 5:42 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (pdw)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Certified Fri 6:35 PM
Pursuant to F.R.A.P.11(c), the Clerk certifies that the record is complete for purposes of this appeal,16 Notice of Appeal. Case Appealed to USCA- 11th Circuit. Case Number 17-12167 PP. The entire record on appeal is available electronically. (pjm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2017
6 6 order Order on Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 5:38 PM
ORDER granting2 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and allowing this matter to proceed as any other civil action. As Plaintiff is represented, service of process shall be effected by or at the direction of counsel of record and service by the United States Marshal Service shall not be required. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/11/2017. (pdw)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order Thu 5:16 PM
ORDER on the Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or Injunction Preventing Petitioners Execution by Lethal Injection or, Alternatively, an Injunction Pending Appeal3 and Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, Alternatively, an Injunction Preventing Defendants From Discontinuing Plaintiff's Medication4 . The Defendants are ORDERED to file a response brief on or before Friday, May 12, 2017 at 4:30 p.m.. Any reply brief by Plaintiff thereto must be filed no later than Saturday, May 13, 2017 at 4:30 p.m. If Plaintiff should elect not to file a reply brief, counsel is directed to file notice to that effect as early as is practicable. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 5/11/2017. (pdw)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Temporary Restraining Order Permanent Injunction Thu 4:48 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or, Alternatively, an Injunction Preventing Defendants from Discontinuing Plaintiff's Medication by J. W. Ledford, Jr.(rjs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Permanent Injunction Thu 4:46 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or Injunction Preventing Petitioner's Execution by Lethal Injection or, Alternatively, An Injunction Pending Appeal by J. W. Ledford, Jr.(rjs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
2 2 motion Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 4:43 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by J. W. Ledford, Jr. (rjs)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 4:42 PM
COMPLAINT filed by J. W. Ledford, Jr.(rjs)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Submission to District Judge Thu 4:49 PM
Submission of2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Permanent Injunction and4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Permanent Injunction,to District Judge Steve C Jones. (rjs)
Related: [-]