METRA INDUSTRIES, INC. v. Rockland County, New York
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Kenneth M Karas |
Referred: | Lisa Margaret Smith |
Case #: | 7:17-cv-03537 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332ds Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | May 11, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 07, 2017 4:29 AM EST |
Defendant
Rockland County, New York
11 New Hempstead Rd
New City, NY 10956 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Metra Industries, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Thu 03/21 5:05 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been advised that all claims asserted herein have been settled, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby dismissed and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. Further, if the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court within the same thirty day period to be "so ordered" by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(8) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are denied. All conferences are vacated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 3/21/2019) (jca) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Thu 03/21 12:47 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Status Conference held on 3/21/2019. Charles W. Groscup appearing by telephone on behalf of Plaintiff. Matthew G. Parisi appearing by telephone on behalf of Defendant. Adjourned. (mde) |
||
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 03/07 11:44 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Status Conference held on 3/6/2019. Charles W. Groscup appearing by telephone on behalf of Plaintiff. Matthew G. Parisi appearing by telephone on behalf of Defendant. Plaintiff must identify any and all experts by 4/1/2019; Defendant must identify its experts by 4/12/2019. When identifying experts, the parties must submit all of the information required under Rule 26, except for the expert report. Expert reports are to be simultaneously exchanged on 5/3/2019. Rebuttal reports, if any, are due by 5/17/2019. Expert depositions must be completed by 6/7/2019. Adjourned to March 21, 2019, at 12:15 PM for a telephonic status conference. (Status Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 12:15 PM before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith.) (mde) Modified on 3/7/2019 (Landers, Rigoberto) |
||
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 02/28 12:40 PM
RE-SCHEDULING NOTICE: The matter of Metra Industries, Inc. v. Rockland County, New York, 17CV3537 (KMK) (LMS), has been re-scheduled from a telephonic status conference on Thursday, February 28, 2019, at 10:15 a.m., before the Hon. Lisa Margaret Smith, United States Magistrate Judge, to a telephonic status conference on Wednesday, March 6, 2019, at 10:15 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel is to have defense counsel on the line when contacting Chambers. Please Note: Counsel seeking to reschedule an appearance must have all parties on the line prior to contacting Chambers. SO ORDERED. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 2/28/2019) (rj) |
|
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 01/15 10:59 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Status Conference held on 1/15/2019. Charles W. Groscup appearing by telephone on behalf of Plaintiff. Matthew G. Parisi appearing by telephone on behalf of Defendant. Plaintiff must identify any and all experts no later than 3/18/2019; Defendant must identify its expert(s) by 4/5/2019. When identifying experts, the parties must submit all of the information required under Rule 26, except for the expert report. Expert reports must be produced by 4/15/2019. Adjourned to February 28,2019, at 10:15 AM for a telephonic status conference. (Status Conference set for 2/28/2019 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith.) (mde) |
||
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 12/11 6:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith: Status Conference held on 12/11/2018. Peter M. Kutil appearing in person on behalf of Plaintiff. Matthew G. Parisi appearing in person on behalf of Defendant. Adjourned to January 15, 2019, at 10:00 AM for a telephonic status conference. (Status Conference set for 1/15/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith.) (Court Reporter Courtflow) (mde) |
||
Wednesday, November 28, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 11/28 12:39 PM
ORDER granting35 Letter Motion for Extension of Time for initial disclosures, but all other deadlines remain in place. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith)(Text Only Order) (Smith, Lisa) |
|
Tuesday, November 27, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 11/27 9:24 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for deadline regarding initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosure to November 30, 2018 addressed to Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith from Peter M. Kutil dated November 27, 2018. Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc..(Kutil, Peter) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 11/14 9:39 AM
ORDER: In order to facilitate the progress of pre-trial discovery of this litigation in a just, speedy and inexpensive manner, to insure compliance with the case management plan, and to prevent the accumulation of unresolved discovery issues, the following procedures will be followed for the resolution of discovery disputes: The party objecting to disclosure, claiming an insufficient response to a discovery request, or asserting a privilege bears the burden of coming forward by bringing the dispute to the attention of the court as hereinafter set forth. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 11/14/2018) (mro) |
|
33 | 33
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 11/14 9:37 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE: The matter of Metra Industries, Inc. v. Rockland County, New York, 17-cv-3537 (KMK)(LMS), has been scheduled for an in-person status conference before the Hon. Lisa Margaret Smith, United States Magistrate Judge, on Tuesday, December 11, 2018, at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom 520. Please note: counsel seeking to reschedule an appearance must have all parties on the line prior to contacting chambers. ( Status Conference set for 12/11/2018 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 520, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith on 11/14/2018) (mro) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 11/13 5:18 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisa Margaret Smith. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/13/2018) (mml) |
|
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 11/09 11:20 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Deposition due by 3/7/2019. Expert Deposition due by 6/7/2019. Fact Discovery due by 3/7/2019. Case Management Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 1 week. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 11/9/2018) (mml) |
|
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 11/09 10:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Status Conference held on 11/9/2018. Charles Groscup appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Matthew Parisi appeared on behalf of Defendants. No court reported served. The Court will hold another conference on June 27, 2019 at 11:00am. The moving party shall file any pre-motion letter by no later than June 13, 2019. The non-moving party shall file a response by June 20, 2019. (ID) |
||
Friday, September 28, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
15
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 09/28 5:51 PM
OPINION & ORDER re:24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Release of Its Earned Retainage : For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied. The Court will hold a conference on November 9, 2018 at 10:00 am to discuss the status of the case. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the pending Motion. (Dkt. No. 24.) (Status Conference set for 11/9/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 9/28/2018) (jwh) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
respm
Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 12/01 3:41 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Release of Its Earned Retainage . . Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc.. (Groscup, Charles) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 11/17 4:29 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re:24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Release of Its Earned Retainage . . Document filed by Rockland County, New York.(Parisi, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Kent Rigg, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - May 23 2013 Revised Specs, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Addendums 1 through 5, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - OPI Arbitration Award, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Closing Documents, | ||
Att: 6 Memorandum of Law | ||
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
respm
Affidavit in Support of Motion
Mon 10/23 7:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Stephan P. Dioslaki in Support re:24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Release of Its Earned Retainage .. Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc..(Groscup, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit | ||
26 | 26
misc
Rule 56.1 Statement
Mon 10/23 6:52 PM
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc.. (Groscup, Charles) |
|
25 | 25
11
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Mon 10/23 6:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Release of Its Earned Retainage . . Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc.. (Groscup, Charles) |
|
24 | 24
motion
Partial Summary Judgment
Mon 10/23 6:45 PM
MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment As To The Release of Its Earned Retainage . Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc..(Groscup, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/11 2:25 PM
MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER: At the Conference on October 11, 2017, the Court adopted the following schedule: Plaintiff shall file its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by October 23, 2017. Defendant shall file opposition papers by November 17, 2017. Defendant shall file its Reply in support of the Motion by December 1, 2017. Sur-reply papers will not be accepted unless prior permission of the Court is given. Any pending deadlines found in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or in any applicable statute are hereby stayed until the date the Motion is decided, as set forth in this Order. Motions due by 10/23/2017. Responses due by 11/17/2017. Replies due by 12/1/2017. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/11/2017) (mml) |
|
minutes
Pre-Motion Conference
Wed 10/11 11:27 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kenneth M. Karas: Pre-Motion Conference held on 10/11/2017. Peter Kutil and Charles William Groscup appeared on behalf of Plaintiff; Matthew Parisi appeared on behalf of Defendant. No court reporter served. The Court adopted a briefing schedule. See Order. (DR) |
||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/03 3:55 PM
ORDER ADMITTING C. WILLIAM GROSCUP PRO HAC VICE granting20 Motion for Charles William Groscup to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/3/2017) (mml) |
|
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/03 1:21 PM
ORDER ADMITTING LEWIS JAN BAKER PRO HAC VICE granting19 Motion for Lewis Jan Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 10/3/2017) (mml) |
|
Monday, October 02, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/02 2:24 PM
MOTION for Charles William Groscup to Appear Pro Hac Vice -prior payment receipt #0208-14161212 . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc..(Kutil, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from Va Supreme Court, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Charles William Groscup in Support of his admission pro hac vice, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/02 2:17 PM
MOTION for Lewis Jan Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Filing fee previsously paid Receipt No. 0208-14146415 . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc..(Kutil, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from Va Supreme Court, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Lewis Jan Baker in support of his pro hac vice admission, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Mon 10/02 2:21 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 19 MOTION for Lewis Jan Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Filing fee previsously paid Receipt No. 0208-14146415. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Mon 10/02 2:27 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 20 MOTION for Charles William Groscup to Appear Pro Hac Vice -prior payment receipt #0208-14161212. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu) |
||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/27 7:18 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 17 MOTION for Lewis Jan Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice -prior payment receipt #0208-14146415. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 18 MOTION for C. William Groscup to Appear Pro Hac Vice -prior payment receipt #0208-14161212. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the motion was not signed by the Attorney applying for Pro Hac Vice; missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb) |
||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/26 7:42 PM
MOTION for C. William Groscup to Appear Pro Hac Vice -prior payment receipt #0208-14161212 . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc..(Kutil, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from Virginia State Bar, an agency of the Virginia State Supreme Court, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of C. William Groscup in support of his pro hac vice admission, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
17 | 17
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/26 7:34 PM
MOTION for Lewis Jan Baker to Appear Pro Hac Vice -prior payment receipt #0208-14146415 . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc..(Kutil, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing from Virginia State Bar, an agency of the Virginia State Supreme Court, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Lewis Jan Baker in support of his pro hac vice admission, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 09/25 8:58 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 16 CONSENT MOTION for Lewis Jan Baker and C. William Groscup to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14161212. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): PLEASE CONTACT THE ECF HELP DESK FOR FURTHER GUIDANCE AT 212.805.0800 BEFORE REFILING.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma) Modified on 9/25/2017 (ma). Modified on 9/25/2017 (ma). Modified on 9/25/2017 (ma) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 09/22 5:10 PM
CONSENT MOTION for Lewis Jan Baker and C. William Groscup to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14161212. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc..(Kutil, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit New Certificates of Standing Dated September 21, 2017, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order proposed Order for Pro Hac Vice Admission, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Lewis Baker in Support of his admission pro hac vice, | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Affidavit of C. William Groscup in support of his admission pro hac vice | ||
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice Regarding Deficient Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 09/20 6:48 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. 15 MOTION for Lewis Jan Baker and C. William Groscup to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14146415. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia; the filing fee was not paid; Please call the ECF helpdesk at 212-805-0800 for instructions on how to file you Documents;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb) |
||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 09/19 5:58 PM
MOTION for Lewis Jan Baker and C. William Groscup to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14146415. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc..(Kutil, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit Certification of Counsel Baker for his admission pro hac vice, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Certification of Counsel Groscup for his admission pro hac vice | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 08/21 1:44 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re:13 Letter filed by Rockland County, New York. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold a pre-motion conference on 10/11/17, at 10:30. (Pre-Motion Conference set for 10/11/2017 at 10:30 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas.) (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/20/2017) (ap) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter
Fri 08/11 4:25 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Matthew G. Parisi dated August 11, 2017 re: Response to Aug. 2 2017 letter of counsel to plaintiff Metra Industries. Document filed by Rockland County, New York.(Parisi, Matthew) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 08/08 8:36 AM
MEMO ENDORSED granting10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's request for pre-motion conference to August 18, 2017 addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Matthew G. Parisi dated August 7, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff's time to respond is extended to August 11, 2017. So Ordered Responses due by 8/11/2017. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/7/2017) (js) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Pre-Conference Statement
Mon 08/07 2:43 PM
PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT - CORRECTED DOCUMENT (document entry #8 was in error) . Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc..(Kutil, Peter) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/07 12:48 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's request for pre-motion conference to August 18, 2017 addressed to Judge Kenneth M. Karas from Matthew G. Parisi dated August 7, 2017. Document filed by Rockland County, New York.(Parisi, Matthew) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/07 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Gerard Parisi on behalf of Rockland County, New York. (Parisi, Matthew) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Pre-Conference Statement
Wed 08/02 7:25 PM
PRE-CONFERENCE STATEMENT IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO FILE A PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION . Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc..(Kutil, Peter) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 06/20 4:06 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Rockland County, New York.(Humbach, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 05/31 11:14 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Rockland County, New York served on 5/30/2017, answer due 6/20/2017. Service was accepted by Thomas Humbach, County Attorney. Document filed by Metra Industries, Inc.. (Kutil, Peter) |
|
Friday, May 12, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 05/12 2:44 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kutil, Peter) |
|
Thursday, May 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/12 4:27 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rockland County, New York. (vf) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/11 3:35 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by METRA INDUSTRIES, INC..(Kutil, Peter) |
|
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 05/11 3:16 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rockland County, New York, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by METRA INDUSTRIES, INC.. (Kutil, Peter) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/11 3:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Rockland County, New York. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13653150)Document filed by METRA INDUSTRIES, INC..(Kutil, Peter) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Fri 05/12 11:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Peter Mario Kutil. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: METRA INDUSTRIES, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet
Fri 05/12 11:35 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Peter Mario Kutil. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (vf) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Fri 05/12 4:22 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Peter Mario Kutil. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); Dollar Demand 1,170,000,000; Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Westchester; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 1,170,000; the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (vf) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 05/12 4:23 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 05/12 4:24 PM
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (vf) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 05/12 4:25 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf) |