T. V. D. B. Sarl et al v. KAPLA USA, LP et al
Georgia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | B Avant Edenfield |
Referred: | G R Smith |
Case #: | 4:12-cv-00230 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2012 |
Terminated: | Apr 01, 2014 |
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
CITIBLOCS, LLC
Terminated: 04/01/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marjorie I. Chayette
Terminated: 04/01/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KAPLA USA GP, LLC
Terminated: 04/01/2014
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KAPLA USA, LP
Terminated: 04/01/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kapla France SARL
Terminated: 04/01/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
T. V. D. B. Sarl
Terminated: 04/01/2014
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tom's Toys, LLC
Terminated: 04/01/2014
|
Represented By
|
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 01, 2014 | ||
90 | 90 ORDER APPROVING re89 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Kapla France SARL, T. V. D. B. Sarl, Tom's Toys, LLC. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 4/1/2014. (loh) | |
Monday, March 31, 2014 | ||
89 | 89 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kapla France SARL, T. V. D. B. Sarl, Tom's Toys, LLC. (Ambler, Robert) | |
88 | 88 NOTICE by Kapla France SARL, T. V. D. B. Sarl, Tom's Toys, LLC of Satisfaction of Judgment (Ambler, Robert) | |
Wednesday, March 26, 2014 | ||
87 | 87 ORDERED that the parties are to submit a voluntary dismissal pursuant to Rule 41 or a joint proposed pretrial order by 5:00 PM on March 31, 2014. Signed by Judge B. Avant Edenfield on 3/25/2014. (loh) | |
Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 3/31/2014. (loh) |