Shirley v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Harold L Murphy |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-00090 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 11, 2017 3:51 AM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mentor Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mentor Worldwide, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Melissa Shirley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 01/05 3:36 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT dismissing action w/out prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to serve Defendants with process. (bjh) |
|
7 | 7
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 01/05 3:24 PM
ORDER Granting Defendants'6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Serve, and DISMISSES this action Without Prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to serve Defendants with process. Signed by Judge Harold L. Murphy on 1/5/18. (bjh) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 01/05 3:39 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bjh) |
||
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss
Thu 12/21 2:41 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure To Serve with Brief In Support by Mentor Corporation.(Ducca, Marcella) |
|
Att: 1 Brief Memo In Support of Motion To Dismiss | ||
5 | 5
discov
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 12/21 2:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mentor Corporation by Mentor Corporation.(Ducca, Marcella) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 05/15 3:01 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Mentor Worldwide, LLC. (bjh) |
|
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 05/15 3:00 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Mentor Corporation. (bjh) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 05/15 3:00 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson. (bjh) |
|
1 | 1
17
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/15 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Melissa Shirley. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 113E-7146212). (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bjh) |