BRYCE et al v. BIOMET, INC. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Freda L Wolfson |
Referred: | Tonianne J Bongiovanni |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03433 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 11, 2017 4:19 AM EST |
Defendant
ABC-XYZ COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
BIOMET MANUFACTURING CORP.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BIOMET, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES I-X
|
|
Defendant
ZIMMER BIOMET
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES BRYCE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
MAUREEN O. BRYCE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
mdl
MDL Transfer Order (out)
Wed 05/31 9:05 AM
Order of MDL Panel (CTO-149) transferring case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana. (dm ) |
|
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Wed 05/31 9:07 AM
Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana. (dm ) |
||
misc
Docket Annotation (public)
Wed 05/31 10:26 AM
Case transferred from New Jersey has been opened in USDC Northern Indiana as case 3:17-cv-00417, filed 05/31/2017. (dm ) |
||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
utility
Update Answer Due Deadline
Tue 05/23 7:41 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document5 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC, ZIMMER BIOMET, BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC, BIOMET MANUFACTURING CORP., BIOMET, INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/5/2017. (seb) |
||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
Mon 05/22 3:21 PM
Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Application for Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to the Complaint.. (BUFANO, MICHELLE) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Thu 05/18 11:27 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal with Exhibit A; Civil Cover Sheet; Defendants' Corporate Disclosure Statement; and Order Scheduling Conference served on Miller & Guadio P.C. on 5/16/2017, filed by BIOMET MANUFACTURING CORP., BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC, BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC, BIOMET, INC., ZIMMER BIOMET. (BUFANO, MICHELLE) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 05/15 4:41 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/19/2017 at 02:00 PM in Trenton - Courtroom 6E before Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni on 5/15/2017. (seb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 05/15 3:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BIOMET MANUFACTURING CORP., BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC, BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC, BIOMET, INC., ZIMMER BIOMET identifying LVB ACQUISITION, INC. as Corporate Parent.. (jem) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 05/15 3:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC, ZIMMER BIOMET, BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC, BIOMET MANUFACTURING CORP., BIOMET, INC. from SUPERIOR COURT OF NEW JERSEY, MONMOUTH COUNTY, case number MON-L1280-17. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 7837757), filed by BIOMET U.S. RECONSTRUCTION, LLC, ZIMMER BIOMET, BIOMET ORTHOPEDICS, LLC, BIOMET MANUFACTURING CORP., BIOMET, INC..(jem) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |