Hillary v. St. Lawrence County et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond J Dearie |
Referred: | Steven M Gold |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02952 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 15, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 11, 2017 3:49 AM EST |
Defendant
william Fitzpatrick
|
|
Defendant
gary snell
|
|
Defendant
Ray Wickenheiser
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
St. Lawrence County Kevin M Wells
|
|
Defendant
Village Of Potsdam Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Village Of Potsdam
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unidentified Jane/John Doe Village Of Potsdam Employees #31-40
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Unidentified Jane/John Doe #41-50 New York State Police Employees
|
|
Defendant
Unidentified Jane/John Doe #21-30 St. Lawrence County Sheriff Employees
|
|
Defendant
Unidentified Jane/John Doe #11-20 St. Lawrence County District Attorney Employees
|
|
Defendant
Unidentified Jane/John Doe #1-10 St. Lawrence County Employees
|
|
Defendant
Edward Tischler
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
St. Lawrence County District Attorneys Office
|
|
Defendant
St. Lawrence County
|
|
Defendant
Mary E. Rain
|
|
Defendant
Julie Pizziketti
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tim Peets
|
|
Defendant
Onondaga County
|
|
Defendant
New York State Police
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Murray
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Theodore Levinson
|
|
Defendant
John E Jones
|
|
Defendant
Kevin M Bates
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Oral Nicholas Hillary
|
Represented By
|
1. | Oral "Nick" Hillary files lawsuit alleging violation of civil rights during homicide investigation (cnycentral.com) |
Submitted Mon 05/22/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
utility
Transfer Case Opened
Mon 06/19 3:36 PM
CASE: 1:17-cv-02952DETAILS: Case transferred from New York Easternhas been opened in Northern District of New York - Main Office (Syracuse) [LIVE - Version 6.1.1]as case 1:17-cv-00659, filed 06/19/2017. (Marziliano, August) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order(Other) Case Transferred Out - District Transfer
Fri 06/16 3:41 PM
ORDER: Case transferred to District of Northern District of New York. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. SO Ordered by Judge Raymond J. Dearie on 6/16/2017. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Thursday, June 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/15 10:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yan Fu on behalf of New York State Police, Julie Pizziketti, Ray Wickenheiser (aty to be noticed) (Fu, Yan) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/14 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce A. Barket on behalf of Oral Nicholas Hillary (aty to be noticed) (Barket, Bruce) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Wed 06/14 10:38 AM
Letter in Response to Request for a Pre-motion Conference by Oral Nicholas Hillary (Marion, Amy) |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/12 3:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Ray Wickenheiser. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 06/12 12:35 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Oral Nicholas Hillary (Marion, Amy) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Fri 06/09 2:30 PM
Letter Request requesting pre-motion conference for leave to serve motion pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(3) by Kevin M Bates, Mark Murray, Edward Tischler, Unidentified Jane/John Doe Village Of Potsdam Employees #31-40, Village Of Potsdam, Village Of Potsdam Police Department (Mortati, Thomas) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/09 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Joseph Mortati on behalf of Kevin M Bates, Mark Murray, Edward Tischler, Unidentified Jane/John Doe Village Of Potsdam Employees #31-40, Village Of Potsdam, Village Of Potsdam Police Department (aty to be noticed) (Mortati, Thomas) |
|
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/30 3:23 PM
Summons Issued as to St. Lawrence County Sheriff's Office. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/30 3:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Julie Pizziketti. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 05/30 3:05 PM
Summons Issued as to Kevin M Bates, william Fitzpatrick, John E Jones, Theodore Levinson, Mark Murray, New York State Police, Onondaga County, Tim Peets, Mary E. Rain, St. Lawrence County, St. Lawrence County District Attorneys Office, Edward Tischler, Village Of Potsdam, Village Of Potsdam Police Department, Kevin M Wells, gary snell. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Att: 1 St. Lawrence County District Attorney's Office, | ||
Att: 2 Mary E. Rain, | ||
Att: 3 Edward Tischler, | ||
Att: 4 Gary Snell, | ||
Att: 5 John E. Jones, JR., | ||
Att: 6 Julie Pizziketti, | ||
Att: 7 Kevin M. Bates, | ||
Att: 8 Kevin M. Wells, | ||
Att: 9 Mark Murray, | ||
Att: 10 New York State Police, | ||
Att: 11 Onondaga County, | ||
Att: 12 Theodore Levinson, | ||
Att: 13 Tim Peets, | ||
Att: 14 Village of Potsdam Police Department, | ||
Att: 15 Village of Potsdam, | ||
Att: 16 William Fitzpatrick | ||
Monday, May 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 05/22 2:38 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Oral Nicholas Hillary (Marion, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 16 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 17 Proposed Summons | ||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically
Wed 05/17 3:06 PM
2 Application for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Approved by August Marziliano, Operations Manager on 5/17/2017. (Marziliano, August) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 05/17 2:46 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 05/17 2:45 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 05/17 2:45 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Steven M. Gold. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Refund of Fees Paid Electronically
Tue 05/16 11:29 AM
Letter MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Oral Nicholas Hillary. (Marion, Amy) |
|
Monday, May 15, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
41
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 05/15 10:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Oral Nicholas Hillary filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9529164 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Oral Nicholas Hillary. (Marion, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit K, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit L, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit M, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit N, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit O, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit P, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Q, | ||
Att: 18 Civil Cover Sheet |