Doe v. Baylor University
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert Pitman |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00125 |
Nature of Suit | 448 Civil Rights - Education |
Cause | 20:1681 Title IX of the Education Amendment of 1972 |
Case Filed: | May 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 12, 2017 2:46 AM CST |
Defendant
Baylor University
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
1. | Baylor University Faces another sexual assault lawsuit, plaintiff alleges she was gang raped (dfw.cbslocal.com) |
Submitted Wed 05/17/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 02, 2018 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 10/02 1:23 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (mc5) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 09/26 11:29 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Jane Doe. (Aziz, Muhammad) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Fri 07/13 4:44 PM
ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint stipulation of dismissal on or before October 11, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any pending motions, settings, and deadlines in this case are abated pending further order from this Court. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jch) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Settlement Agreement
Fri 07/13 1:50 PM
SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Joint Notice of Settlement by Baylor University. (McIntush, Holly) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Advisory to the Court
Mon 05/21 10:19 AM
ADVISORY BY THE COURT regarding City of Wacos Nonparty Objections tothe Subpoena to Produce Documents (Dkt. 28). (jgb) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
13
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Confidentiality and Protective Order
Fri 05/18 2:24 PM
ORDER GRANTING25 Motion for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jgb) |
|
28 | 28
respoth
Miscellaneous Objection
Fri 05/18 9:30 AM
CITY OF WACO'S NONPARTY OBJECTIONS TO THE SUBPOENA TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS by City of Waco. (jgb) |
|
Thursday, May 17, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation
Thu 05/17 3:16 PM
STIPULATION of Agreement to Extend Expert Designation Deadlines by Jane Doe. (Aziz, Muhammad) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Status Report
Tue 05/01 2:01 PM
STATUS REPORT on Alternative Dispute Resolution by Jane Doe. (Aziz, Muhammad) |
|
Monday, April 16, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Confidentiality and Protective Order
Mon 04/16 6:04 AM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order by Baylor University.(McIntush, Holly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1, A & B | ||
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
9
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 03/19 4:08 PM
ORDER GRANTING9 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Partial Motion to Dismiss, (Dkt. 9), is GRANTED. Any post-reporting claims specific to Plaintiff are DISMISSED. Plaintiffs claim for injunctive relief is also DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jgb) |
|
23 | 23
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 03/19 3:53 PM
Defendant's First Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint by Baylor University.(McIntush, Holly) |
|
Monday, March 05, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 03/05 10:18 AM
ORDER DENYING9 Motion to Strike Immaterial and Inflammatory Allegations. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jgb) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Non-Consent to Trial by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/18 7:24 PM
NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Jane Doe. (Aziz, Muhammad) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 09/29 9:24 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Consent to Trial by Magistrate due by 1/18/2018, Jury Selection set for 1/14/2019 09:00AM before Judge Robert Pitman, Jury Trial set for 1/14/2019 09:00 AM before Judge Robert Pitman, ADR Report Deadline due by 5/1/2018, Amended Pleadings due by 4/2/2018, Discovery due by 8/17/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 4/2/2018 and Motions due by 10/2/2018. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jgb) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Pretrial Conference
Fri 09/29 9:05 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert Pitman: Pretrial Conference held by Telephone in Austin on 9/28/2017. Parties announce ready. Jury trial set for January 14, 2019. Scheduling order discussed. Written order forthcoming. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Pamela Andasola.)(jgb) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Thu 09/21 2:15 PM
ORDER Setting Initial Telephone Pretrial Conference for 9/28/2017 03:30 PM before Judge Robert Pitman. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. Counsel for Plaintiff shall be responsible for coordinating the call and providing dial-in information at least 24 hours prior to the hearing to the Courtroom Deputy.(jgb) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order
Fri 09/15 4:20 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order (Joint) by Baylor University. |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A (Agreed Scheduling Order)(Brown, Lisa | ||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Sched Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Thu 09/07 10:12 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order. Plaintiff shall submit a scheduling recommendations/proposed scheduling order to the Court within sixty (60) days after the appearance of any defendant. ( Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/15/2017). Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jgb) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
8
pgs
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Tue 07/18 3:24 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Baylor University, re9 MOTION to Dismiss and Defendant's Motion to Strike Immaterial and Inflammatory Allegations filed by Defendant Baylor University (McIntush, Holly) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Wed 07/12 4:28 PM
RESPONSE in Support, filed by Baylor University, re9 MOTION to Dismiss and Defendant's Motion to Strike Immaterial and Inflammatory Allegations filed by Defendant Baylor University (McIntush, Holly) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
17
pgs
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 07/11 10:39 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jane Doe, re9 MOTION to Dismiss and Defendant's Motion to Strike Immaterial and Inflammatory Allegations filed by Defendant Baylor University(Aziz, Muhammad) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 07/05 10:15 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Jane Doe, re9 MOTION to Dismiss and Defendant's Motion to Strike Immaterial and Inflammatory Allegations filed by Defendant Baylor University(Aziz, Muhammad) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Wed 06/28 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Holly Gene McIntush on behalf of Baylor University. Attorney Holly Gene McIntush added to party Baylor University(pty:dft) (McIntush, Holly) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/28/2017) (jgb) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 06/27 6:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Baylor University.(Brown, Lisa) |
|
9 | 9
20
pgs
motion
Dismiss
Tue 06/27 6:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Defendant's Motion to Strike Immaterial and Inflammatory Allegations by Baylor University.(Brown, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 13, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Tue 06/13 8:08 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Baylor University answer due 6/27/2017. (jgb) |
||
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Mon 06/12 5:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jane Doe. Baylor University served on 6/6/2017, answer due 8/7/2017. (Aziz, Muhammad) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Sealed Document
Mon 06/12 3:34 PM
Sealed Document filed. (jgb) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
Mon 06/12 10:37 AM
Text Order GRANTING6 Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document entered by Judge Robert Pitman. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ra) |
||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Motion for Leave to File Sealed Document
Fri 06/09 3:30 PM
Motion for leave to File Sealed Document (Aziz, Muhammad) |
|
Att: 1 Sealed Document, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 06/06 10:45 AM
ORDER GRANTING4 Motion to Proceed under Pseudonym. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (jgb) |
|
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 06/05 2:55 PM
MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym by Jane Doe.(Aziz, Muhammad) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/17 10:39 AM
Summons Issued as to Baylor University. (jgb) |
|
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 05/16 9:44 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Jane Doe. (Aziz, Muhammad) |
|
1 | 1
40
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 05/16 9:43 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-9593632), filed by Jane Doe.(Aziz, Muhammad) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 05/17 10:36 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jgb) |