Fyffe v. Bridgeport et al
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Vanessa L Bryant |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-00804 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | May 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 12, 2017 4:19 AM EST |
Defendant
James Boulay
|
|
Defendant
City of Bridgeport
|
|
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Armando Perez
|
|
Plaintiff
Julian Fyffe
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw
Thu 08/17 10:44 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion to Withdraw. This case is DISMISSED pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i) without prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees awarded to any party. The Clerk is directed to close this file. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/17/2017. (Hoffman, S) |
|
notice
Judicial Evaluation Program Survey
Thu 08/17 10:52 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Shafer, J.) |
||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Withdraw
Wed 08/16 6:20 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Case Without Prejudice by Julian Fyffe. (Stratton, Michael) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 05/18 5:14 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *James Boulay, City of Bridgeport, Armando Perez* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael A. Stratton* *Stratton Trial P.C.* *117 River St.* *Milford, CT 06460*. (Hushin, Z.) |
|
Wednesday, May 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Electronic Service Documents
Wed 05/17 11:16 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/PRO SE PARTIES : Counsel or pro se parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of4 Standing Protective Order,3 Electronic Filing Order,2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,1 Complaint filed by Julian Fyffe, and5 Order Re: Chambers Practices. Signed by Clerk on 5/17/2017.(Bozek, M.) |
|
service
Request to Issue Summons
Wed 05/17 12:34 PM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Stratton, Michael) |
||
Tuesday, May 16, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Re: Chambers Practices
Wed 05/17 11:15 AM
ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/16/2017.(Bozek, M.) |
|
4 | 4
order
Protective Order
Wed 05/17 11:14 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/16/2017.(Bozek, M.) |
|
3 | 3
order
Electronic Filing Order
Wed 05/17 11:13 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/16/2017.(Bozek, M.) |
|
2 | 2
order
Order on Pretrial Deadlines
Wed 05/17 11:12 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 8/16/2017. Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2017. Discovery due by 11/15/2017. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Clerk on 5/16/2017.(Bozek, M.) |
|
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0205-4404933.), filed by Julian Fyffe.(Stratton, Michael) | |
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 05/17 10:19 AM
Judge Vanessa L. Bryant added. (Walker, A) |