7
|
|
7
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 09/20 12:28 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 9/20/2017. (jbry, )
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case 60 Day Settlement Order
Mon 08/28 3:40 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 8/28/2017. (jbry, )
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Acceptance of Service - Complaint Served
Mon 07/24 4:40 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF COMPLAINT by Harbour Town Yacht Club Boat Slip Owner's Association Inc. ACE American Insurance Company served on 7/21/2017, answer due 8/11/2017.(Waring, Bradish)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Acceptance of Service
|
3
|
|
3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 05/17 7:51 AM
Summons Issued as to ACE American Insurance Company. (jbry, )
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
discov
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories
Wed 05/17 7:50 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Harbour Town Yacht Club Boat Slip Owner's Association Inc.(jbry, )
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/17 7:47 AM
COMPLAINT against ACE American Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7156645.), filed by Harbour Town Yacht Club Boat Slip Owner's Association Inc. Service due by 8/14/2017(jbry, )
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Exhibit A - Policy,
|
| |
Att: 2
Exhibit B - Proof of Loss,
|
| |
Att: 3
Exhibit C - Denial Letter,
|
| |
Att: 4
Exhibit D - SC Code Section 38-75-40
|