Waizman v. TD Bank, N.A. et al
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Carlos E Mendoza |
Referred: | Gregory J Kelly |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-00902 |
Nature of Suit | 140 Contract - Negotiable Instrument |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 14, 2017 4:47 AM EST |
Defendant
Gina Brookshire
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TD Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meir Waizman
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order dismissing case
Fri 07/21 11:14 AM
ORDER dismissing case with prejudice subject to the right of any party, within sixty days from the date of this Order, to move the Court to enter a stipulated form of final order or judgment, or, on good cause shown, to reopen the case for further proceedings. All pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk is directed to close this file - re 23 Notice of settlement. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 7/21/2017. (DJD) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of settlement
Tue 07/18 4:34 PM
NOTICE of settlement by Gina Brookshire, TD Bank, N.A. (Burns, Danielle) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 07/06 1:25 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 20 Motion for Rule 16 Conference. If Defendants are requesting relief from the Court, then they must file a motion pursuant to Local Rule 3.01. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 7/6/2017. (MB) |
|
21 | 21
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 07/06 10:02 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Rule 16 Conference filed by Meir Waizman. (Bitman, Ronnie) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 07/05 2:07 PM
MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Rule 16 Conference by All Defendants. (Burns, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Wed 06/28 11:06 AM
ENDORSED ORDER denying 16 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(d) ("A motion requesting leave to file... a reply... shall not include, as an attachment or otherwise, the proposed... reply"). Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 6/28/2017. (KMS) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Case Management Report
Tue 06/20 10:38 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bitman, Ronnie) |
|
Saturday, June 17, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Sat 06/17 12:53 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re16 MOTION for leave to file Reply Memorandum filed by Meir Waizman. (Bitman, Ronnie) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 06/16 5:08 PM
MOTION for leave to file Reply Memorandum by TD Bank, N.A.. (Burns, Danielle) |
|
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Fri 06/09 12:12 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Lynne E. Evans, appearing on behalf of Gina Brookshire, TD Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $150 receipt number Orl-64284.) (SPM) |
||
Wednesday, June 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically
Wed 06/07 2:53 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 13 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference, provided the parties agree on the essentials of the case management report. Otherwise, the parties shall meet in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/7/2017. (MB) |
|
14 | 14
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Wed 06/07 2:45 PM
ORDER granting 12 Defendants' Motion for Permission of Lynne E. Evans to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Evans is ordered to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing and register for a login name and password for CMECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 6/7/2017. (MB) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Appear telephonically
Wed 06/07 10:28 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference by Gina Brookshire, TD Bank, N.A.. (Burns, Danielle) |
|
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 06/06 5:17 PM
MOTION for Lynne E. Evans to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants.(Burns, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Lynne E. Evans in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Special Admission Attorney Certification | ||
11 | 11
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Tue 06/06 2:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Interested persons order by Gina Brookshire, TD Bank, N.A.(Burns, Danielle) Modified on 6/6/2017 (SPM) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Tue 06/06 2:37 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gina Brookshire, TD Bank, N.A.. Related case(s): no (Burns, Danielle) |
|
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Thu 06/01 5:55 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Meir Waizman. (Bitman, Ronnie) |
|
Wednesday, May 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 05/31 10:03 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Interested persons order by Meir Waizman. (Bitman, Ronnie) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Wed 05/31 10:00 AM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Meir Waizman. Related case(s): no (Bitman, Ronnie) |
|
Friday, May 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Interested persons order
Fri 05/26 3:44 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/9/2017. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 5/26/2017. ctp(DJD) |
|
5 | 5
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Fri 05/26 3:44 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/9/2017. Signed by D. Darley/Deputy Clerk on 5/26/2017. (DJD) |
|
Thursday, May 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss
Thu 05/25 5:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Gina Brookshire, TD Bank, N.A..(Burns, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate disclosure statement
Thu 05/18 4:22 PM
Rule 7.1 CORPORATE disclosure statement by TD Bank, N.A. (SPM) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/18 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Gina Brookshire, TD Bank, N.A. with Jury Demand filed in Orange County on 4/11/17 by Meir Waizman.(SPM) |
|
Att: 1 State Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 05/18 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County, case number 2017-CA-003339-O filed in State Court on 04/11/2017. Filing fee $400, receipt number ORL-63719 filed by TD Bank, N.A..(SPM) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B |