HUMBLE v. CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC.
Georgia Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Marc Thomas Treadwell |
Case #: | 5:17-cv-00192 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination) |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 31, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 14, 2017 4:20 AM EST |
Defendant
CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DIANA R HUMBLE
|
Represented By
|
1. | Special ed teacher files lawsuit alleging she suffered discrimination and harassment due to race after filing a report with the state agency (macon.com) |
Submitted Mon 05/22/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago |
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 06/01 8:55 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by DIANA R HUMBLE (BARTON, KENNETH) |
|
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
1
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/30 1:51 PM
SETTLEMENT ORDER . Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 5/30/2018. (tlh) |
|
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
discov
Discovery Order Memorandum
Tue 04/17 2:19 PM
Discovery Order Memorandum(tlf) |
|
Wednesday, January 03, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Wed 01/03 4:31 PM
ORDER DENYING15 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 1/3/2018. (tlh) |
|
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 01/02 12:13 PM
ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint by CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC.. Related document:16 Amended Complaint filed by DIANA R HUMBLE.(Cole, David) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 12/26 3:16 PM
RESPONSE filed by CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. re15 MOTION for Reconsideration re12 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, (Cole, David) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling/Discovery Order
Tue 12/19 1:56 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER : Discovery to be complete by 6/17/2018. Dispositive and Daubert motions due by 7/17/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 12/19/2017. (tlh) |
|
17 | 17
minutes
Scheduling Conference Status Conference
Tue 12/19 1:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL: Scheduling Conference held on 12/19/2017, Status Conference held on 12/19/2017. Court Reporter: Darlene Fuller. (tlh) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 12/18 4:42 PM
AMENDED1 Complaint, against CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. by DIANA R HUMBLE (BARTON, KENNETH) |
|
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 12/18 9:43 AM
NOTICE OF SETTING Status Conference set for 12/19/2017 at 10:00 AM in Macon before US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL. (tlh) |
||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Reconsideration
Tue 12/12 5:29 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re12 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, by DIANA R HUMBLE filed by KENNETH E BARTON, III.(BARTON, KENNETH) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Reconsideration, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit Affidavit of Diana Humble | ||
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Wed 12/06 2:55 PM
STIPULATION (Joint) Extending Time for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint) by CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. (Cole, David) |
|
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
5
pgs
order
Order - Rules 16/26
Tue 12/05 9:04 AM
RULES 16/26 ORDER : Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/5/2018. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 12/5/2017. (tlh) |
|
Att: 1 Required Form | ||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
15
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 12/04 4:38 PM
ORDER GRANTING in part and DENYING in part7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Cirrus Academy's motion to dismiss Humble's Title VII claims of disparate treatment and pay discrimination is GRANTED because Humble has failed to exhaust her administrative remedies as to those claims. However, Cirrus Academy's motion to dismiss Humble's Title VII hostile work environment claim is DENIED because it is administratively exhausted and sufficiently pled. Cirrus Academy's motion to dismiss Humble's retaliation claim under the Georgia Whistleblower Act is GRANTED. However, the Court grants Humble leave to amend her complaint within 14 days of the date of this Order to allege in Count II the facts supporting her retaliation claim. The motion to strike is DENIED. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE MARC THOMAS TREADWELL on 12/4/2017. (tlh) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Mon 09/11 2:40 PM
REPLY to Response filed by CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike (Cole, David) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension
Fri 08/25 8:58 AM
Notice of Clerk's Granting of Extension re:7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike filed by CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. (ggs) |
||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 08/24 5:14 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File REPLY TO RESPONSE by CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. filed by David Alan Cole.(Cole, David) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respm
Response to Motion
Mon 08/14 10:41 PM
RESPONSE filed by DIANA R HUMBLE re7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike (BARTON, KENNETH) |
|
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/01 4:55 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. (Cole, David) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Mon 07/24 5:15 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Motion to Strike by CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. filed by David Alan Cole.(Cole, David) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - EEOC Charge | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/24 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by AMY COMBS BENDER on behalf of CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. Attorney AMY COMBS BENDER added to party CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC.(pty:dft) (BENDER, AMY) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/24 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Alan Cole on behalf of CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. Attorney David Alan Cole added to party CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC.(pty:dft) (Cole, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 06/14 2:28 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DIANA R HUMBLE. as to CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. (BARTON, KENNETH) |
|
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent Form (28 USC 636) Sent
Thu 05/18 4:50 PM
Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to DIANA R HUMBLE (cma) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 05/18 4:49 PM
Summons Issued as to DIANA R HUMBLE. (cma) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
misc
Complaint
Thu 05/18 4:15 PM
COMPLAINT against CIRRUS EDUCATION GROUP, INC. Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2615179, $400 filed by DIANA R HUMBLE(BARTON, KENNETH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons |