Nicholl v. Brokelyn, LLC. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Louis L Stanton |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03774 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 26, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 14, 2017 4:43 AM EST |
Defendant
Brokelyn, LLC.
|
|
Defendant
Does 1-5
|
|
Defendant
Schneps Communications
|
|
Defendant
Schneps NY Media, LLC.
|
|
Defendant
Schneps Publications, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Nicholl
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Terminated - Submitted
Fri 10/13 1:21 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE TERMINATED- SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 9/26/2017 in a court action filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (ap) |
|
Att: 1 ORDER | ||
21 | 21
4
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal
Tue 09/26 4:29 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i): The Court having considered Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice, orders as follows: The action is dismissed with prejudice as to all Defendants pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. All relief not expressly granted herein is denied. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 9/26/2017) (ap) |
|
misc
Note to Attorney to E-Mail PDF
Tue 09/26 8:33 AM
***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Rayminh Ngo for noncompliance with Section 18.3 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document 20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to: judgments@nysd.uscourts.gov. (km) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/25 8:35 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, With prejudice against the defendant(s) Brokelyn, LLC., Schneps Communications, Schneps NY Media, LLC., Schneps Publications, Inc.. Document filed by Jeremy Nicholl.(Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 08/01 5:51 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Brokelyn, LLC. served on 7/18/2017, answer due 8/8/2017. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam, Process Specialist c/o National Registered Agents. Document filed by Jeremy Nicholl. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 06/20 1:57 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Schneps NY Media, LLC., re:8 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jeremy Nicholl. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
11 | 11
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 06/20 1:56 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Schneps Publications, inc., re:8 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jeremy Nicholl. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
10 | 10
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 06/20 1:55 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Schneps Communications, re:8 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jeremy Nicholl. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
9 | 9
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 06/20 1:54 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brokelyn, LLC., re:8 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Jeremy Nicholl. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 06/20 1:51 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Brokelyn, LLC., Does 1-5, Schneps NY Media, LLC., Schneps Publications, Inc., Schneps Communications with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Jeremy Nicholl. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Jeremy Nicholl.(Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B | ||
Tuesday, May 23, 2017 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction
Tue 05/23 8:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Rayminh L Ngo. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 17:504. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 17:101. (pc) |
||
Friday, May 19, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Case Opening - Submitted
Fri 05/19 10:27 AM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/19 10:23 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brokelyn, LLC.. (pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Fri 05/19 10:18 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Fri 05/19 10:18 AM
Magistrate Judge James C. Francis IV is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Fri 05/19 10:18 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
AO 121 Form Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney
Thu 05/18 8:33 PM
AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 05/18 8:30 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate ImageRights International, Inc. for Jeremy Nicholl. Document filed by Jeremy Nicholl.(Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Thu 05/18 8:28 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Brokelyn, LLC. d/b/a www.Brokelyn.com, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeremy Nicholl. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 05/18 8:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 05/18 8:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Brokelyn, LLC., Does 1-5. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-13683237)Document filed by Jeremy Nicholl.(Ngo, Rayminh) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A-B |